ANTONUCCI et al v. BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION
Plaintiff: SUSAN ANTONUCCI and CARL C. ANTONUCCI
Defendant: BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv00115
Filed: May 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 37 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-16364. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 11, 2020 Filing 36 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon)
May 11, 2020 Filing 35 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 01 - ECF 161 - BSC PTO-11 - Stipulated Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit 02 - ECF 184 - BSC PTO-13 - Stipulation for the Production of Docs and Electronically Stored Info, # 3 Exhibit 03 - ECF 196 - BSC PTO-14 - New Direct Filing Order, Master Complaint, SF Complaint, # 4 Exhibit 04 - ECF 197 - Master Long Form Complaint, # 5 Exhibit 05 - ECF 200 - BSC_s Master Answer to Master Long Form Complaint, # 6 Exhibit 06 - ECF 4955 - BSC PTO-175 - Docket Control Order - BSC Wave 4 Cases, # 7 Exhibit 07 - ECF 4987 - BSC PTO-176 (Notice of Correction of Error in PTO-175 - Wave 4 Cases), # 8 Exhibit 08 - ECF 6100 - BSC PTO-187 - Amended Docket Control Order - BSC Wave 4 Cases, # 9 Exhibit 09 - ECF 4826 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo in Support of MTE Badylak, # 10 Exhibit 10 - ECF 4976 - BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, # 11 Exhibit 11 - ECF 5033 - Pltf_s Reply to Dft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, # 12 Exhibit 12 - ECF 6984 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Badylak, # 13 Exhibit 13 - ECF 7067 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Badylak, # 14 Exhibit 14 - ECF 6041 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Badylak, # 15 Exhibit 15 - ECF 7004 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo to MTE Spiegelberg, # 16 Exhibit 16 - ECF 7088 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, # 17 Exhibit 17 - ECF 7160 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, # 18 Exhibit 18 - ECF 4825 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo in Support of Their MTE Little - Part 1, # 19 Exhibit 18 - ECF 4825 - Exh 1 - Part 2, # 20 Exhibit 18 - ECF 4825 - Exh 2 - Part 3, # 21 Exhibit 18 - ECF 4825 - Exh 3 - Part 4, # 22 Exhibit 18 - ECF 4825 - Exh 4 - Part 5, # 23 Exhibit 18 - ECF 4825 - Exh 5 - Part 6, # 24 Exhibit 19 - ECF 4979 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Little, # 25 Exhibit 20 - ECF 5034 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Little, # 26 Exhibit 21 - ECF 6995 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Little, # 27 Exhibit 22 - ECF 7066 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Little, # 28 Exhibit 23 - ECF 6044 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Little, # 29 Exhibit 24 - ECF 6987 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Davies, # 30 Exhibit 25 - ECF 4824 - Pltf_s Combined Motion and Memo to MTE Davies, # 31 Exhibit 26 - ECF 5032 - Pltf_s Reply Memo in Support of MTE Davies, # 32 Exhibit 27 - ECF 7052 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Davies, # 33 Exhibit 28 - ECF 4975 - BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Davies, # 34 Exhibit 29 - ECF 4833 - Pltf's Motion to Exclude Rosenblatt, # 35 Exhibit 30 - ECF 4978 - BSC_s Memo in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Rosenblatt, # 36 Exhibit 31 - ECF 5039 - Pltf_s Reply Brief in Support of MTE Rosenblatt, # 37 Exhibit 32 - ECF 6047 - Memo Opinion and Order re Rosenblatt, # 38 Exhibit 33 - ECF 6986 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Rosenblatt, # 39 Exhibit 34 - ECF 7061 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Rosenblatt, # 40 Exhibit 35 - ECF 7011 - BSC_s MTE Rosenzweig and Memo in Support, # 41 Exhibit 36 - ECF 7037 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Rosenzweig, # 42 Exhibit 37 - ECF 7085 - Pltf_s Response and Memo to BSC_s MTE Rosenzweig, # 43 Exhibit 38 - ECF 7175 - BSC_s Reply in Support of MTE Rosenzweig, # 44 Exhibit 39 - ECF 4822 - BSC_s Motion and Memo in Support of MTE Blaivas, # 45 Exhibit 40 - ECF 4962 - Pltf_s Opp to MTE Blaivas, # 46 Exhibit 41 - ECF 7002 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Blaivas, # 47 Exhibit 42 - ECF 7028 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Blaivas, # 48 Exhibit 43 - ECF 7042 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Blaivas, # 49 Exhibit 44 - ECF 4810 - BSC_s Motion and Memo to Exclude Shull, # 50 Exhibit 45 - ECF 4966 - Pltf's Opp to Motion and Memo to Limit Testimony of Shull, # 51 Exhibit 46 - ECF 6048 - Memo Opinion and Order re Shull, # 52 Exhibit 47 - ECF 7013 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Shull, # 53 Exhibit 48 - ECF 7038 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Shull, # 54 Exhibit 49 - ECF 7044 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Shull, # 55 Exhibit 50 - ECF 4819 - BSC_s Motion to Strike and Exclude Iakovlev, # 56 Exhibit 51 - ECF 4959 - Pltf_s Response to BSC_s MTE Iakovlev, # 57 Exhibit 52 - ECF 6033 - Memo Opinion and Order re Iakovlev, # 58 Exhibit 53 - ECF 7015 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Iakovlev, # 59 Exhibit 54 - ECF 7050 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Iakovlev, # 60 Exhibit 55 - ECF 7009 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Guelcher, # 61 Exhibit 56 - ECF 7030 - Pltf's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Guelcher, # 62 Exhibit 57 - ECF 7057 - Pltf's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Guelcher, # 63 Exhibit 58 - ECF 8177 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Reply in Support of MTE Guelcher, # 64 Exhibit 59 - ECF 4805 - BSC_s Memo in Support of MTE Mays, # 65 Exhibit 60 - ECF 4972 - Pltf_s Memo in Opp MTE Mays - Part 1, # 66 Exhibit 60 - ECF 4972 - Exh 1 - Part 2, # 67 Exhibit 60 - ECF 4972 - Exh 2 - Part 3, # 68 Exhibit 60 - ECF 4972 - Exh 3 - Part 4, # 69 Exhibit 60 - ECF 4972 - Exh 4 - Part 5, # 70 Exhibit 60 - ECF 4972 - Exh 5 - Part 6, # 71 Exhibit 60 - ECF 4972 - Exh 6 - Part 7, # 72 Exhibit 60 - ECF 4972 - Exh 7 - Part 8, # 73 Exhibit 60 - ECF 4972 - Exh 8 - Part 9, # 74 Exhibit 60 - ECF 4972 - Exh 9 - Part 10, # 75 Exhibit 60 - ECF 4972 - Exh 10 - Part 11, # 76 Exhibit 61 - ECF 7010 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Mays, # 77 Exhibit 62 - ECF 7033 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Mays, # 78 Exhibit 63 - ECF 7065 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Mays, # 79 Exhibit 64 - ECF 6036 - Memo Opinion and Order re Mays, # 80 Exhibit 65 - ECF 7007 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Dunn, # 81 Exhibit 66 - ECF 7058 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Dunn, # 82 Exhibit 67 - ECF 7165 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Reply in Support of MTE Dunn, # 83 Exhibit 68 - ECF 4807 - BSC_s Motion and Memo to Limit Testimony Veronikis, # 84 Exhibit 69 - ECF 4964 - Pltf_s Response and Memo in Opp to MTE Veronikis, # 85 Exhibit 70 - ECF 6051 - Memo Opinion and Order re Veronikis, # 86 Exhibit 71 - ECF 7012 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Veronikis, # 87 Exhibit 72 - ECF 7039 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Veronikis, # 88 Exhibit 73 - ECF 7045 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Veronikis, # 89 Exhibit 74 - ECF 4804 - BSC_s Motion and Memo to MTE Margolis - Part 1, # 90 Exhibit 74 - ECF 4804 - Exh A - Part 2, # 91 Exhibit 74 - ECF 4804 - Exh B - Part 3, # 92 Exhibit 74 - ECF 4804 - Exh C - Part 4, # 93 Exhibit 74 - ECF 4804 - Exh D - Part 5, # 94 Exhibit 74 - ECF 4804 - Exh E - Part 6, # 95 Exhibit 74 - ECF 4804 - Exh F - Part 7, # 96 Exhibit 74 - ECF 4804 - Exh G - Part 8, # 97 Exhibit 74 - ECF 4804 - Exh H - Part 9, # 98 Exhibit 74 - ECF 4804 - Exh I - Part 10, # 99 Exhibit 74 - ECF 4804 - Exh J - Part 11, # 100 Exhibit 75 - ECF 4960 - Pltf_s Response in Opp to BSC_s MTE Margolis, # 101 Exhibit 76 - ECF 7017 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Margolis, # 102 Exhibit 77 - ECF 7032 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Margolis, # 103 Exhibit 78 - ECF 7046 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Margolis, # 104 Exhibit 79 - ECF 6035 - Memo Opinion and Order re Margolis, # 105 Exhibit 80 - ECF 4821 - BSC_s Motion and Memo to Exclude Ostergard, # 106 Exhibit 81 - ECF 4961 - Pltf_s Response to BSC_s MTE Ostergard, # 107 Exhibit 82 - ECF 7016 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Ostergard, # 108 Exhibit 83 - ECF 7035 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Ostergard, # 109 Exhibit 84 - ECF 7051 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Ostergard, # 110 Exhibit 85 - ECF 6037 - Memo Opinion and Order re Ostergard, # 111 Exhibit 86 - ECF 4815 - BSC_s Motion and Memo to Exclude Pence, # 112 Exhibit 87 - ECF 4968 - Pltf_s Response in Opp to BSC_s MTE Pence, # 113 Exhibit 88 - ECF 5038 - BSC_s Reply Memo in Support of MTE Pence, # 114 Exhibit 89 - ECF 7018 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Pence, # 115 Exhibit 90 - ECF 7036 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Pence, # 116 Exhibit 91 - ECF 7047 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Pence, # 117 Exhibit 92 - ECF 6038 - Memo Opinion and Order re Pence, # 118 Exhibit 93 - ECF 4818 - BSC_s Motion and Memo to Exclude Galloway, # 119 Exhibit 94 - ECF 4958 - Pltf_s Opp to MTE Galloway, # 120 Exhibit 95 - ECF 7048 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Galloway, # 121 Exhibit 96 - ECF 7008 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Galloway, # 122 Exhibit 97 - ECF 6031 - Memo Opinion and Order re Galloway, # 123 Exhibit 98 - ECF 4811 - BSC_s Motion and Memo to Exclude Trepeta, # 124 Exhibit 99 - ECF 4963 - Pltf_s Response in Opp to BSC_s MTE Trepeta, # 125 Exhibit 100 - ECF 7005 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Trepeta, # 126 Exhibit 101 - ECF 7049 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Trepeta, # 127 Exhibit 102 - ECF 6050 - Memo Opinion and Order re Trepeta, # 128 Exhibit 103 - ECF 2890 - Pltf_s Response in Opp to Def_s MTE Veronikis, # 129 Exhibit 104 - ECF 2950 - Pltf_s Response to Ethicon_s MTE Ostergard, # 130 Exhibit 105 - ECF 2949 - Pltf_s Memo in Opp to Ethicon_s MTE Pence, # 131 Exhibit 106 - ECF 3758 - Pltf_s Opp to Deft_s Memo in Support of MTE Blaivas, # 132 Exhibit 107 - ECF 3751 - Pltf_s Response to Deft_s MTE Mays, # 133 Exhibit 108 - ECF 4675 - Pltf_s Memo in Opp to Def_s MTE Guelcher, # 134 Exhibit 109 - ECF 5482 - Pltf_s Memo in Opp to Deft_s MTE Rosenzweig, # 135 Exhibit 110 - ECF 2169 - Pltf's Opp to Def's MTE Margolis, # 136 Exhibit 111 - ECF 2904 - Pltf_s Memo in Opp to Deft_s Suppl MTE re Margolis, # 137 Exhibit 112 - ECF 52 - BSC's Memo in Support of MTE Guelcher, # 138 Exhibit 113 - ECF 74 - Pltf_s Opp to Deft_s MTE
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 5/12/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 5/11/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/28/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mms)
October 4, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of All friends and family members identified in the Plaintiff Fact Sheet, including section VI. Fact Witnesses, and/or identified during the Plaintiff's deposition including but not limited to Carl Antonucci, Robyn Kurdyla, April Hood and Rebecca Schuffele on dates and at times to be determined. (Keale, James)
October 3, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPE DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. on October 17, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Strongman, Jon)
August 14, 2018 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Rule 26 Designation and Disclosure of Expert Witnesses. (Strongman, Jon)
July 12, 2018 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carl C. Antonucci, Susan Antonucci for Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
July 9, 2018 Filing 29 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Carl C. Antonucci, Susan Antonucci of Dr. Pamela Moalli on 07/19/2018 at 8:30 AM EDT (Haberman, Jeffrey)
July 6, 2018 Filing 28 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Carl C. Antonucci, Susan Antonucci of Dr. Adam Holzberg on July 17, 2018 at 3:00 PM EDT (Haberman, Jeffrey)
July 5, 2018 Filing 27 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Carl C. Antonucci, Susan Antonucci of Dr. Jerry Lowder on August 21, 2018 at 10:00 AM CDT/11:00 AM EDT (Haberman, Jeffrey)
June 25, 2018 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carl C. Antonucci, Susan Antonucci for Objections and Responses to Defendant's Interrogatories and Requests for Production. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PRETRIAL ORDER # 187 (Amended Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 175. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 4 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases) (klc) (ADI)
June 4, 2018 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carl C. Antonucci, Susan Antonucci for Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
May 25, 2018 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Interrogatories and Request for Production. (Keale, James)
May 18, 2018 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carl C. Antonucci, Susan Antonucci for Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admissions. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
May 15, 2018 Filing 21 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Carl C. Antonucci, Susan Antonucci of Dr. Pamela Moalli on 07/19/2018 at 8:30 a.m. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
May 4, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kevin Lloyd Morrow on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Morrow, Kevin)
April 30, 2018 Filing 19 CROSS-NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION of Carl Antonucci on 5/8/2018 at 1:30 p.m., by Carl C. Antonucci, Susan Antonucci. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
April 30, 2018 Filing 18 CROSS-NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION of Susan Antonucci on 5/8/2018 at 9:00 a.m., by Carl C. Antonucci, Susan Antonucci. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
April 24, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Susan Antonucci on May 8, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Keale, James)
April 24, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Carl Antonucci on May 8, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (Keale, James)
April 23, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bryan Scott Hofeld on behalf of Carl C. Antonucci, Susan Antonucci. (Hofeld, Bryan)
April 13, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by James H. Keale on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Keale, James)
March 22, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE TO TAKE VIDEO DEPOSITION by Carl C. Antonucci, Susan Antonucci of Dr. Pamela Moalli on 06/12/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carl C. Antonucci, Susan Antonucci for Plaintiff Fact Sheet. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
February 9, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Carl C. Antonucci, Susan Antonucci of Dr. Jerry Lowder on 5/31/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
February 9, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Carl C. Antonucci, Susan Antonucci of Dr. Adam Holzberg on 05/30/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL ORDER # 175 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 4 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 4 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 4 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kp) (ADI)
June 21, 2017 Filing 8 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Carl C. Antonucci, Susan Antonucci. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Haberman, Jeffrey)
January 19, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon)
January 29, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jeffrey L. Haberman on behalf of Susan Antonucci. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
July 23, 2013 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Boston Scientific Corporation, re: #2 Electronic Summons Issued,. Boston Scientific Corporation served on 7/9/2013, answer due 7/30/2013. (Patrick, Charles)
July 17, 2013 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bonasso, Michael)
July 2, 2013 Filing 3 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 49 (Order re: Termination of parties no longer named in Short Form and Amended Short Form Complaints) entered on 06/10/2013 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (jap)
July 1, 2013 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Boston Scientific Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (jws)
June 28, 2013 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2508561. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jws)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANTONUCCI et al v. BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION
Represented By: Michael Bonasso
Represented By: Jon A. Strongman
Represented By: Kevin Lloyd Morrow
Represented By: James H. Keale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN ANTONUCCI
Represented By: Bryan Scott Hofeld
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Haberman
Represented By: Charles Bland Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARL C. ANTONUCCI
Represented By: Bryan Scott Hofeld
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Haberman
Represented By: Charles Bland Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?