SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. HVIZDZAK CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC et al
Plaintiff: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Defendant: HIGH STREET CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC, SHANE HVIZDZAK, HIGH STREET CAPITAL LLC, SEAN HVIZDZAK and HVIZDZAK CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00154
Filed: June 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Referring Judge: W Scott Hardy
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE Of Related Case Filing by SEAN HVIZDZAK, SHANE HVIZDZAK (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Grail, Efrem)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER indicating that all parties have fourteen (14) days within which to object to the transfer of United States v. Hvizdzak, 1:21-cr-30, which currently is assigned to the Honorable Susan Paradise Baxter, to the undersigned judicial officer. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 9/10/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lwp)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Remark: Registry Funds in the amount of $45,102.61 payable to DeForest, Koscelnik and Beradinelli, Finance PQC Number PAWCCA21-00073 on 09/03/2021, per Order of Court signed by U.S. District Judge W. Scott Hardy on 8/18/2021 at Document Number #98 and upon receipt of W-9 by payee. (kss)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED IN THIS DISTRICT (JUDGE BAXTER) by SEAN HVIZDZAK, SHANE HVIZDZAK (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Grail, Efrem)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #96 Unopposed Motion to Access and Use $45,102.61 Currently Held in the Court's Registry Per the Order at Docket No. #26 to Assist in Paying for His Counsel of Choice in the Criminal Action Filed at Docket No. 1:21-cr-00030. Disbursement information is more specifically set forth in the Court's order. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 8/18/2021. (kas)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #95 Unopposed Motion to Lift the Asset Freeze to Permit Sean Hvizdzak to Trade in a Car to Reduce His Monthly Expenses. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 8/17/2021. (kas)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Unopposed MOTION to Access and Use $45,102.61 Currently Held in the Court's Registry Per the Order at Doc. 26 to Assist in Paying for His Counsel of Choice in the Criminal Action Filed at Docket No. 1:21-cr-00030 re #26 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by SEAN HVIZDZAK. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Berardinelli, David)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Unopposed MOTION to Lift the Asset Freeze to Permit Sean Hvizdzak to Trade in a Car to Reduce His Monthly Expenses re 7 Order,, Set Hearings, by SEAN HVIZDZAK. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Berardinelli, David)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER OF COURT indicating that #80 the Motion to Stay filed by Defendants Shane Hvizdzak, Hvizdzak Capital Management, LLP, High Street Capital LLP, and High Street Capital Partners, LLC, and joined in by Defendant Sean Hvizdzak (Docket No. 82), is granted in part and denied in part for the reasons set forth in the Court's accompanying Memorandum Opinion; that these proceedings are hereby stayed solely in relation to Shane Hvizdzak's deposition, but the discovery period is enlarged so that the SEC may continue to utilize appropriate discovery devices to search for, locate, and preserve relevant missing investor funds, and so that the parties may pursue expert discovery; that a status conference will be scheduled within 90 days, at which point the Court will re-evaluate the efficacy of this partial stay, and will decide whether to lift, modify, or extend it; and that prior to this status conference, the parties may move to lift, modify, or extend the stay based upon a change of circumstances or other good cause. See Order of Court for further details. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 8/11/21. (lwp)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MEMORANDUM OPINION indicating that #80 the Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by Defendants Shane Hvizdzak, Hvizdzak Capital Management, LLP, High Street Capital LLP, and High Street Capital Partners, LLC, and joined in by Defendant Sean Hvizdzak (Docket No. 82), is granted in part and denied in part, and that the Court will stay these proceedings solely in relation to Shane Hvizdzak's deposition, but will enlarge the discovery period so that the SEC may continue to search for, locate, and preserve relevant missing investor funds, and so that the parties may pursue expert discovery. See Memorandum Opinion for further details. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 8/11/21. (lwp)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE OF FILING OF INDICTMENT RE #80 PENDING MOTION FOR STAY by SHANE HVIZDZAK (Grail, Efrem) Modified text on 8/12/2021 to add document linkage. (kss)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge W. Scott Hardy: An Oral Argument was held on 7/21/2021. (Court Reporter: Deborah Betzler) (kas)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 JOINT STATUS REPORT by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Scarlato, Matthew)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 REPLY Declaration of Efrem M. Grail to #81 Brief in Support of Motion, #80 Motion to Stay, filed by HIGH STREET CAPITAL LLC, HIGH STREET CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC, SHANE HVIZDZAK, HVIZDZAK CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Grail, Efrem)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 REPLY to Response to Motion re #80 Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by SEAN HVIZDZAK. (Booker, Daniel)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER indicating that #85 Defendant Sean Hvizdzak's Motion to Reschedule Oral Argument on Motion to Stay Proceedings is GRANTED, and the Oral Argument previously scheduled for 7/21/21 at 11:00 am is rescheduled for THAT SAME DATE, 7/21/21 at 3:00 pm via video teleconference before Judge W. Scott Hardy. The Court will circulate Zoom log-in information to the parties in advance. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 7/1/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lwp)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Errata re #85 Motion to Reschedule Oral Argument on Motion to Stay Proceedings by SEAN HVIZDZAK. Reason for Correction: Attaching Exhibit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Berardinelli, David)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION to Reschedule Oral Argument on Motion to Stay Proceedings by SEAN HVIZDZAK. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Berardinelli, David)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER indicating that this case is stayed for a period of 45 days, until 8/13/21. Oral Argument on Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings (Docket No. 80) will be held on 7/21/21 at 11:00 AM via video teleconference before Judge W. Scott Hardy, and the Court will circulate Zoom log-in information to the parties in advance. The Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference previously set for 7/13/21 at 10:00 AM is canceled and will be rescheduled. A Joint Status Report outlining the discovery that remains outstanding in this matter is due by 7/16/2021. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 6/29/21. (lwp)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 BRIEF in Opposition re #80 Motion to Stay proceedings filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Smith, James)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 JOINDER of SEAN HVIZDZAK to #80 Motion to Stay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Booker, Daniel)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 BRIEF in Support re #80 Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by HIGH STREET CAPITAL LLC, HIGH STREET CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC, SHANE HVIZDZAK, HVIZDZAK CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Bevan, Brian)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by HIGH STREET CAPITAL LLC, HIGH STREET CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC, SHANE HVIZDZAK, HVIZDZAK CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bevan, Brian)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HIGH STREET CAPITAL LLC, HIGH STREET CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC, HVIZDZAK CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Grail, Efrem)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order SECOND CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #42 Answer to Complaint, #77 Answer to Amended Complaint (First for amended complaint). ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 4/15/2021. (jv)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ANSWER to #74 Amended Complaint by SHANE HVIZDZAK. (Grail, Efrem)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ANSWER to #74 Amended Complaint by HIGH STREET CAPITAL LLC, HIGH STREET CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC, HVIZDZAK CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Grail, Efrem)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ANSWER to #74 Amended Complaint by SEAN HVIZDZAK. (Berardinelli, David)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #72 Unopposed Motion to Enter Consent Order Regarding the Operation of Sean Hvidzak's Law Practice. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 3/25/21. (kas)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against HIGH STREET CAPITAL LLC, HIGH STREET CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC, SEAN HVIZDZAK, SHANE HVIZDZAK, HVIZDZAK CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC, filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Smith, James)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #71 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amended Its Complaint. It is further ordered that Plaintiff is given leave to file his Second Amended Complaint by 4/2/21, and Defendants shall file their responses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint within 14 days after service of such amended pleading. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 3/24/21. (kas)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Unopposed MOTION to Enter Consent Order Regarding the Operation of Sean Hvizdzak's Law Practice by SEAN HVIZDZAK. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Berardinelli, David)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order) (Smith, James)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for File Amended Complaint. Amended Pleadings due by 3/19/2021. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 2/19/21. (kas)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File A Motion To Amend Complaint by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Scarlato, Matthew)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #67 Uncontested Motion to Amend Court Order at Doc. #66 . See order for further details. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 2/17/21. (kas)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION to Amend #66 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by HIGH STREET CAPITAL LLC, HIGH STREET CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC, SEAN HVIZDZAK, SHANE HVIZDZAK, HVIZDZAK CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Grail, Efrem)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #63 Defendants' Request for Leave of Court for Temporary Relief From Freeze Order. See order for further details. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 2/8/21. (kas)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #62 Plaintiff's Unopposed MOTION To Lift The Asset Freeze To Remedy A Violation Of The Court's Preliminary Injunction Order. See order for further details. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 2/8/21. (kas)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Proposed Order re #62 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief To Lift The Court's Asset Freeze To Remedy A Violation Of The Court's Preliminary Injunction Order by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Scarlato, Matthew)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF FROM FREEZE ORDER by HIGH STREET CAPITAL LLC, HIGH STREET CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC, SEAN HVIZDZAK, SHANE HVIZDZAK, HVIZDZAK CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Grail, Efrem)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Unopposed MOTION To Lift The Asset Freeze To Remedy A Violation Of The Court's Preliminary Injunction Order by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Scarlato, Matthew)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER indicating that having been jointly notified by counsel that the Status Conference scheduled for 1/21/21 at 11am is no longer necessary due to the parties anticipating submitting one or more uncontested/consent motions in the near future, the Status Conference is hereby canceled. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 1/15/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kas)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Remark: Correspondence received from Public. (kas)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel McArdle Booker on behalf of SEAN HVIZDZAK. (Booker, Daniel)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER setting a Telephonic Status Conference for 1/21/2021 11:00 AM before Judge W. Scott Hardy. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 12/17/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kas)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings/Parties due by 2/26/2021; Fact Discovery ends 6/30/2021. A Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 7/13/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge W. Scott Hardy. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 12/17/20. (kas)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER entered pursuant to Rule 502(d) of the Federal Rules of Evidence. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 12/17/20. (kas)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge W. Scott Hardy: Video Case Management Conference held on 12/17/2020. Appropriate Orders to Follow. (Court Reporter: Deborah Betzler) (kas)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Jan M. Folena to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 12/10/20. (kas)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Smith, James)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Smith, James)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE Of Related Proceeding by SHANE HVIZDZAK (Grail, Efrem)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION for attorney Jan M. Folena to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70 by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Cert. Good Stnd., #3 Proposed Order) (Folena, Jan)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this document. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (dms)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (dms)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER:Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge W. Scott Hardy. Rule 26 Meeting Report and ADR Stipulation due by 12/10/2020 as more fully stated in the attached order. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 11/13/20. (kas)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #35 Uncontested Motion to Lift the Asset Freeze to Permit Change of Custodian of One of Defendant Sean Hvizdzak's Investment Accounts and for Related Relief. See order for further detail. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 11/5/20. (kas)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to W. Scott Hardy for all further proceedings. Judge Susan Paradise Baxter no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/26/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #42 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days for all three filing parties. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 10/30/2020. (jv)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by James E Smith on behalf of SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Smith, James)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, and Defenses, by SEAN HVIZDZAK. (Berardinelli, David)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by HIGH STREET CAPITAL LLC, HIGH STREET CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC, HVIZDZAK CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Grail, Efrem)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by SHANE HVIZDZAK. (Grail, Efrem)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #38 Motion to Continue. Defendants Shane Hvizdzak, Hvizdzak Capital Management, LLC, High Street Capital LLC, And High Street Capital Partners, LLLC, must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this case on or before October 13, 2020. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 9/30/2020. (esa)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Sean Hvizdzak's Motion is GRANTED and that his response to the Complaint is now due on October 13, 2020. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 9/30/2020. (esa)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Date on Which to Answer, etc. by HIGH STREET CAPITAL LLC, HIGH STREET CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC, SHANE HVIZDZAK, HVIZDZAK CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Grail, Efrem)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by SEAN HVIZDZAK. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Berardinelli, David)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Shane Hvizdzak, an individual, and Hvizdzak Capital Management, LLC; High Street Capital LLC; and High Street Capital Partners, LLC; shall provide a Preliminary and final Sworn Accounting, and shall conduct an Asset Repatriation, as called for in this Courts Consent Order Granting Preliminary Injunction, Maintaining Asset Freeze, And Enlarging Defendants Time To Provide Court Ordered Information, on or before Monday, September 14, 2020, and shall answer the S.E.C.'s Complaint in this case no later than Monday, October 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 8/20/2020. (esa)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION to Lift the Asset Freeze to Permit Change of Custodian of One of Defendant Sean Hvizdzak's Investment Accounts and for Related Relief by SEAN HVIZDZAK. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Berardinelli, David)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C. Bevan on behalf of HIGH STREET CAPITAL LLC, HIGH STREET CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC, SHANE HVIZDZAK, HVIZDZAK CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Bevan, Brian)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re #32 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to September 15, 2020and MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Scarlato, Matthew)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to September 14, 2020, and MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by HIGH STREET CAPITAL LLC, HIGH STREET CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC, SHANE HVIZDZAK, HVIZDZAK CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Grail, Efrem) Modified on 8/19/2020 to change extension date(jv).
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Efrem M. Grail on behalf of HIGH STREET CAPITAL LLC, HIGH STREET CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC, SHANE HVIZDZAK, HVIZDZAK CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Grail, Efrem)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint, SEAN HVIZDZAK answer due 10/5/2020. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 08/19/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (fcf)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer To The Complaint Under Rule 12 by SEAN HVIZDZAK. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Berardinelli, David)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re Motion Hearing held on June 26, 2020 before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janis Ferguson, Telephone number 814-464-9613. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 8/20/2020. Redaction Request due 9/3/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/14/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/12/2020. (jlf)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Remark: Funds to be deposited into Court Registry per order of court signed by U.S. District Judge Susan Paradise Baxter at entry #26 Order on 7/9/2020 (jv)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 MOTION TO LIFT THE ASSET FREEZE ASTO CERTAIN OF DEFENDANTS' BANK ACCOUNTS AND FOR RELATED RELIEF. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 7/9/2020. (esa)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Consent MOTION To Lift The Asset Freeze As To Certain of Defendants' Bank Accounts And For Related Relief by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Scarlato, Matthew)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from HIGH STREET CAPITAL LLC, HIGH STREET CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC, SEAN HVIZDZAK, SHANE HVIZDZAK, HVIZDZAK CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC (sdp)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by SEAN HVIZDZAK Answer due from All Defendants. (Berardinelli, David)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE Pursuant to Local Rule 7(E) filed by SEAN HVIZDZAK. (Berardinelli, David)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE Cancelling Hearing: Motion Hearing scheduled for 06/30/2020 at 11:00 a.m. via videoconference is cancelled. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 06/26/2020. (esa)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Exhibit A) (Scarlato, Matthew)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/26/2020 at 03:30 PM before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Court staff will contact the parties with call-in information. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 06/26/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Berardinelli on behalf of SEAN HVIZDZAK. (Berardinelli, David)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/26/2020. Discussion of proposed consent Order and cancellation of hearing scheduled for 6/30/2020. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: Janis Ferguson) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. SEAN HVIZDZAK served on 6/17/2020, answer due 7/8/2020. (Smith, James)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. SHANE HVIZDZAK served on 6/17/2020, answer due 7/8/2020. (Smith, James)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. HIGH STREET CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC served on 6/17/2020, answer due 7/8/2020. (Smith, James)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. HIGH STREET CAPITAL LLC served on 6/17/2020, answer due 7/8/2020. (Smith, James)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. HVIZDZAK CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC served on 6/17/2020, answer due 7/8/2020. (Smith, James)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Unseal Case. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 06/19/2020. (esa)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Unseal Case by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (jv)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #1 Motion to Seal Case. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 06/17/2020. (esa)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Asset Freeze. Motion Hearing set for 6/30/2020 at 11:00 AM in Video Conference before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 06/16/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for TRO; Motion for Asset Freeze filed by the Securities and Exchange Commission.Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 06/16/2020. (esa)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #3 Motion for TRO, Motion for Asset Freeze filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. Motion Hearing set for 6/16/2020 at 02:30 PM via videoconference before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 06/16/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Errata re #5 Summons Issued, Reason for Correction: Issued summons for Hvizdzak Capital Management, LLC. (jv)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to SHANE HVIZDZAK (Main Documents) HIGH STREET CAPITAL LLC, HIGH STREET CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC, SEAN HVIZDZAK, HVIZDZAK CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Sean Hvizdzak, #2 Summons Issued as to High Street Capital LLC, #3 Summons issud as to High Street Capital Partners, LLC, #4 Summons issued as to Hvizdzak Capital Management, LLC) (jv) Attachment #4 removed from view and redocketed as an errata at #6 . Modified on 6/19/2020 (ept).
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 BRIEF in Support re #3 Motion for TRO, Motion for Asset Freeze, filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (jv)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION Asset Freeze by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Rule 65 Cerfificate, #3 Declaration of Andrew Shoenthal, #4 Appendix list and Exhibits 1 and 2, #5 Exhibits 3 to 8, #6 Exhibits 9-12, #7 Exhibits 13 -15, #8 Exhibit 16, #9 Exhibit 17-1, #10 Exhibit 17-2, #11 Exhibit 17-3, #12 Exhibit 17-4, #13 Exhibit 17-5 and 18, #14 Exhibit 19-1, #15 Exhibit 19-2, #16 Exhibit 19-3, #17 Exhibit 19-4, #18 Exhibit 19-5, #19 Exhibit 19-6, #20 Exhibit 19-7, #21 Exhibit 19-8, #22 Exhibits 20-33) (jv)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against HIGH STREET CAPITAL LLC, HIGH STREET CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC, SEAN HVIZDZAK, SHANE HVIZDZAK, HVIZDZAK CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC, filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Shane Hvizdzak, #3 Summons as to Sean Hvizdzak, #4 Summons as to Hvizdzak Capital Management Company, #5 Summons as to High Street Capital LLC, #6 Summons as to High Street Capital Partners LLC) (jv)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION to Seal Case by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (jv)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Motion Hearing held on 6/16/2020 re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order; MOTION Asset Freeze filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Court Reporter: Janis Ferguson) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. HVIZDZAK CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIGH STREET CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC
Represented By: Efrem M. Grail
Represented By: Brian C. Bevan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANE HVIZDZAK
Represented By: Efrem M. Grail
Represented By: Brian C. Bevan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIGH STREET CAPITAL LLC
Represented By: Efrem M. Grail
Represented By: Brian C. Bevan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEAN HVIZDZAK
Represented By: David J. Berardinelli
Represented By: Daniel McArdle Booker
Represented By: Efrem M. Grail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HVIZDZAK CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: Efrem M. Grail
Represented By: Brian C. Bevan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By: Matthew Scarlato
Represented By: James E Smith
Represented By: Jan Folena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?