JEWELL et al v. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: LORI A. JEWELL and DOUGLAS JEWELL, SR.
Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2020cv00188
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY Answer due from STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY on 10/23/2020. (Martini, Mark)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 Errata re 4 Waiver of Service Executed by LORI A. JEWELL. Reason for Correction: Docket Number. (Barnett, Adam)
July 24, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re 4 Waiver of Service Executed. ERROR: Caption and/or Case number of document does not match caption and/or case number of case. CORRECTION: Attorney is directed to file an Errata with corrected caption/and or case number. (ma)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin D. Huber on behalf of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Huber, Kevin)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Martini on behalf of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Martini, Mark)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5747589), filed by LORI A. JEWELL, DOUGLAS JEWELL, SR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JEWELL et al v. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Kevin D. Huber
Represented By: Mark A. Martini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORI A. JEWELL
Represented By: Adam E. Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS JEWELL, SR.
Represented By: Adam E. Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?