BROWN v. ERIE COUNTY et al
Plaintiff: DAWN BROWN
Defendant: MD DAVID PAUL, WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC., GARY L. PETERSON, ERIE COUNTY, DIAGNOSTIC X-RAY SERVICE, INC. and MEDICAL ASSOCIATES OF ERIE, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00251
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Richard A Lanzillo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DAWN BROWN. DIAGNOSTIC X-RAY SERVICE, INC. waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Levine, Richard)
September 24, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DAVID PAUL. DAVID PAUL waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Neal, Cassidy)
September 24, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Cassidy L. Neal on behalf of DAVID PAUL. (Neal, Cassidy)
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Wetzel on behalf of WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC.. (Wetzel, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DAWN BROWN. WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC. waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Levine, Richard)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly B. Cullen on behalf of WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC.. (Cullen, Kelly)
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ERIE COUNTY. ERIE COUNTY waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Carey, Patrick)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by G. Michael Garcia, II on behalf of ERIE COUNTY. (Garcia, G.)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Carey on behalf of ERIE COUNTY. (Carey, Patrick)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DAWN BROWN. MEDICAL ASSOCIATES OF ERIE, INC. waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Levine, Richard)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DAWN BROWN. GARY L. PETERSON waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Levine, Richard)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Janet K. Meub on behalf of MEDICAL ASSOCIATES OF ERIE, INC., GARY L. PETERSON. (Meub, Janet)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 EXHIBITS in Support of #1 Complaint, by DAWN BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Merit to David Paul, MD, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Merit to Diagnostic X-Ray Service, Inc., #3 Exhibit Certificate of Merit to Wexford Health Sources, Inc., #4 Exhibit Certifficate of Merit to Gary Peterson, DO, #5 Exhibit Certificate of Merit to Medical Associates of Erie, Inc.) (Levine, Richard)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to DIAGNOSTIC X-RAY SERVICE, INC., ERIE COUNTY, MEDICAL ASSOCIATES OF ERIE, INC., DAVID PAUL, GARY L. PETERSON, WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC. (jmm)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DIAGNOSTIC X-RAY SERVICE, INC., ERIE COUNTY, MEDICAL ASSOCIATES OF ERIE, INC., DAVID PAUL, GARY L. PETERSON, WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5865125), filed by DAWN BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROWN v. ERIE COUNTY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD DAVID PAUL
Represented By: Cassidy L. Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Wetzel
Represented By: Kelly B. Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY L. PETERSON
Represented By: Janet K. Meub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIE COUNTY
Represented By: Patrick M. Carey
Represented By: G. Michael Garcia, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIAGNOSTIC X-RAY SERVICE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL ASSOCIATES OF ERIE, INC.
Represented By: Janet K. Meub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAWN BROWN
Represented By: Richard C. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?