IZZY AND GAB LLC v. ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Plaintiff: IZZY AND GAB LLC
Defendant: ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY doing business as ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE
Case Number: 1:2020cv00266
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Filing 33 Errata re #31 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint by IZZY AND GAB LLC. Reason for Correction: Typed Name on E-Signature. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Ballard, Daniel) Modified on 11/9/2020 (lar).
November 6, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #31 Motion for Leave to File. ERROR: Typed name omitted by s/. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit with signature, using Errata event. CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE. ERROR: Proposed Order was made part of main document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that in future proposed orders are to be made attachments to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only. (bgs)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Kristin A. Shepard to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 11/6/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
November 5, 2020 Filing 31 First MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint by IZZY AND GAB LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Ballard, Daniel) Modified on 11/6/2020 (bgs). Modified on 11/9/2020 to add a link to #33 Errata (lar).
November 5, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for attorney Kristin A. Shepard to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6056363) by ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Kristin A. Shepard, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Shepard, Kristin)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 11/3/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/24/2020. Because of the limitations caused by the COVID-19 pandemic, in lieu of an Initial Case Management Conference, the Court will enter a Case Management Order based upon the deadlines agreed to by the parties in the Rule 26(f) report. The Court is available for a conference upon motion by any party at any point prior to one being set by the Court following resumption of a regular Court schedule. Early ADR deadlines are extended until a conference is held unless the parties wish to proceed in the interim. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/13/2020. (esa)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: All counsel of record in this case must read the attached article on mediation prior to the initial Case Management Conference, and share the same with their client(s). The attached article is being disseminated with permission of the author and The Pennsylvania Lawyer. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Article) (esa)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) Pursuant to LCvR 16.1.D. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/13/2020. (esa)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/13/2020. (esa)
October 9, 2020 Filing 25 Defendant's ANSWER to #2 Complaint, with Separate Defenses and Certificate of Service by ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Malamud, Matthew)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer filed by ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY. Answer due 10/9/2020. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/7/2020. (esa)
September 22, 2020 Filing 23 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY Answer due from ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY on 10/9/2020. (Malamud, Matthew)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Adam J. Kaiser to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 9/21/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Tiffany L. Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 9/21/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
September 18, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel W. Ballard on behalf of IZZY AND GAB LLC. (Ballard, Daniel)
September 18, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for attorney Adam J. Kaiser to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-5922071) by ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Adam J. Kaiser, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Kaiser, Adam)
September 17, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for attorney Tiffany L. Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-5921726) by ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Tiffany L. Powers, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Powers, Tiffany)
September 17, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason H. Peck on behalf of ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Peck, Jason)
September 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul K. Geer on behalf of ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Geer, Paul)
September 17, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara L. Maczuzak on behalf of ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Maczuzak, Tara)
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:20-cv-08208. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (cel) Modified on 9/18/2020 (cel).
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #6 Joint Stipulation; this action is transferred to the Western District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/09/2020. (jem)
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and/or Transfer by IZZY AND GAB LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FARRELL, RYAN)
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT T. HORST on behalf of ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY (HORST, ROBERT)
August 21, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and/or Transfer. Motion reset for 9/21/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER ORDER granting the request #9 for a one cycle adjournment of the #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and/or Transfer to 9/21/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 8/21/2020. (jem)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from Counsel for Plaintiffs RE: Adjournment Request re Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and/or Transfer. (FARRELL, RYAN)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY identifying Erie Insurance Exchange as Corporate Parent.. (MALAMUD, MATTHEW)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IZZY AND GAB LLC. (FARRELL, RYAN)
August 12, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and/or Transfer. Motion set for 9/8/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and/or Transfer by ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY. Responses due by 8/25/2020 (Attachments: #1 Motion, #2 Brief in Support, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Proposed Order in the Alternative, #6 Certificate of Service)(MALAMUD, MATTHEW)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN J. REILLY on behalf of IZZY AND GAB LLC (REILLY, JOHN)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by LAWRENCE E. BATHGATE, II on behalf of IZZY AND GAB LLC (BATHGATE, LAWRENCE)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
July 2, 2020 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mg)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY D/B/A ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11026059) with JURY DEMAND, filed by IZZY AND GAB LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Summons)(FARRELL, RYAN)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY D/B/A ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11025851) with JURY DEMAND, filed by IZZY AND GAB LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A)(FARRELL, RYAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IZZY AND GAB LLC v. ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IZZY AND GAB LLC
Represented By: HOWARD M. BUSHMAN
Represented By: LAWRENCE E. BATHGATE, II
Represented By: ADAM M. MOSKOWITZ
Represented By: WILLIAM F. MERLIN, JR.
Represented By: RYAN M. FARRELL
Represented By: JOHN J. REILLY
Represented By: Daniel W. Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY doing business as ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE
Represented By: Matthew B. Malamud
Represented By: ROBERT T. HORST
Represented By: Kristin Ann Shepard
Represented By: Tiffany L Powers
Represented By: Adam J. Kaiser
Represented By: Tara L. Maczuzak
Represented By: Jason H. Peck
Represented By: Paul K. Geer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?