REDMAN v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: DEBORAH A. REDMAN
Defendant: CHARLES RETTIG, MARJORIE GALLAGHER, HECKSCHER, TEILLON, TERRIL AND SAGER PC, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, LUCINDA COMEGYS, JANET YELLEN and STEVEN MNUCHIN
Case Number: 1:2021cv00124
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Filing 13 COMPLAINT against LUCINDA COMEGYS, MARJORIE GALLAGHER, HECKSCHER, TEILLON, TERRIL AND SAGER PC, STEVEN MNUCHIN, CHARLES RETTIG, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, JANET YELLEN, filed by DEBORAH A. REDMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-6) (jv)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to provide to the Court completed USM-285 forms for each defendant listed in her complaint so that they may be properly served. USM-285 forms due on or before July 6, 2021. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 6/14/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend complaint and dismissing #9 Motion for Summary Judgment as premature, as Defendants have not even been served in this case. The Clerk is directed to detach the proposed amendment attached to ECF No. 8 and to re-docket it as Plaintiff's amended complaint. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 06/14/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (fcf)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order: In light of the #6 supplement filed by Plaintiff, this Court's 3 Order denying Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is hereby VACATED and Plaintiff's #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to file the Complaint in this matter. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 06/14/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (fcf)
May 24, 2021 Filing 9 Emergency MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEBORAH A. REDMAN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Envelope) (jv)
May 6, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend Complaint by DEBORAH A. REDMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit of letter to Deborah Redman from Adam Gusdorff, #2 Proposed Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Envelope) (jv)
April 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Intent to move to amend complaint to drop Defendant Heckscher Teillon by DEBORAH A. REDMAN (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv)
April 26, 2021 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT by DEBORAH A. REDMAN to #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: In light of the denial of Plaintiff's #1 motion to proceed in forma pauperis, Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to pay the filing fee of $400.00 to the Clerk of Courts by May 10, 2021, or suffer dismissal of this case for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 04/20/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (fcf)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, as Plaintiff's stated income is more than sufficient to provide for payment of the filing fee in light of her reported expenses. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 04/20/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (fcf)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 Errata re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DEBORAH A. REDMAN. Reason for Correction: Envelope. (jv)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DEBORAH A. REDMAN. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1-6, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REDMAN v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES RETTIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARJORIE GALLAGHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HECKSCHER, TEILLON, TERRIL AND SAGER PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUCINDA COMEGYS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANET YELLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN MNUCHIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH A. REDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?