ANGLE v. MONTAG
Plaintiff: BRIAN ANGLE, II and BRYAN ANGLE, II
Defendant: DR. MONTAG
Case Number: 1:2021cv00252
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Richard A Lanzillo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING #7 Plaintiff's "objection to change of venue", construed as a motion to remand. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 10/29/2021. (mdb) Modified text on 10/29/2021. (dm)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Plaintiff Bryan Angle II has filed an objection to change of venue (ECF No. 7), which the Court construes as a motion to remand this case to the Court of Common Pleas of Forest County, Pennsylvania. For the following reasons stated in the Court's Opinion, Angle's motion will be denied. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 10/29/2021. (mdb) Modified text on 10/29/2021 to change title of document. (dm)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by BRYAN ANGLE, II. (Attachments: #1 letter, #2 Envelope) (sdp)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Forest County Docket Sheet and Documents (dm)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by MONTAG. (Raymond, Phillip)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: In accordance with the case management system in place in this district, this case has been assigned to the undersigned for all pretrial matters. Therefore, it is ORDERED that on or before 11/2/2021, the parties shall complete an election form either consenting to jurisdiction by the Magistrate Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned to the case, and shall file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of the form can be found on this Court's website at: http://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. A copy will also be provided to Plaintiff with this Order. Consent to Jurisdiction by Mag. Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned due by 11/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 10/19/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dm)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #6 Plaintiff's Motion for Telephonic Conference re: Settlement. The Court will consider requesting a pro bono neutral to conduct mediation only if all parties agree and jointly request mediation. Although the Court will not schedule a teleconference for this purpose, the parties may correspond on their own about whether to pursue mediation. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 10/18/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mdb)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Objection to Change of Venue filed by BRYAN ANGLE, II. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jd) Modified text on 10/29/2021. (dm)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Telephonic Conference re: Settlement by BRYAN ANGLE, II. (jd)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #3 Notice of Intent filed by BRYAN ANGLE, II. (jd)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER FOR PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 9/29/2021. (dm)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO PA R.C.P. 1042.7 by MONTAG (Raymond, Phillip)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by MONTAG. (Raymond, Phillip)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Forest county, case number 105 of 2020 with jury demand Copies attached: state court record (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6701130), filed by MONTAG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANGLE v. MONTAG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN ANGLE, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYAN ANGLE, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. MONTAG
Represented By: Phillip E Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?