KINGFLY SPIRITS et al v. RAGGHIANTI et al
Plaintiff: KINGFLY SPIRITS formerly doing business as PORT OF PITTSBURGH DISTILLERY, LLC, MARK WILLSON and EBBREZZA, INC.
Defendant: BLAKE RAGGHIANTI, DAVID S. KLETT, JUSTINA TUSHAK, DANIELLE RAGGHIANTI, MD PhD JORG GERLACH, ECHT, LLC, GREGG THRELKELD, MARK ZINI, THE AGING ROOM, LLC, ERIE YACHT CLUB and JOHN DOES (1-10)
Case Number: 1:2022cv00050
Filed: February 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony E. Patterson on behalf of DAVID S. KLETT. (Patterson, Anthony)
March 31, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Kushal N. Dave on behalf of JUSTINA TUSHAK. (Dave, Kushal)
March 31, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Trisha A. Gill on behalf of JUSTINA TUSHAK. (Gill, Trisha)
March 28, 2022 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KINGFLY SPIRITS. JUSTINA TUSHAK waiver sent on 2/22/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (Farneth, George)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Order of Court Requiring all Parties to Preserve All Electronically Stored Information, Documentation, and Other Materials. The proposed Order has been approved, with slight modification. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/22/22. (dcd)
March 15, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Ralph M. Monico on behalf of BLAKE RAGGHIANTI, DANIELLE RAGGHIANTI. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Monico, Ralph)
March 15, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott R. Eberle on behalf of BLAKE RAGGHIANTI, DANIELLE RAGGHIANTI. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Eberle, Scott)
February 28, 2022 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #13 Motion for Order of Court Requiring all Parties to Preserve All Electronically Stored Information, Documentation, and Other Materials. ERROR: Proposed Order was made part of main document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that in future proposed orders are to be made attachments to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only. (lyk)
February 25, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Order of Court Requiring all Parties to Preserve All Electronically Stored Information, Documentation, and Other Materials by KINGFLY SPIRITS. (Farneth, George)
February 25, 2022 Filing 12 RICO Case Statement by EBBREZZA, INC., KINGFLY SPIRITS. (Farneth, George)
February 17, 2022 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by EBBREZZA, INC.. (Miller, Nicholas)
February 17, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas A Miller on behalf of EBBREZZA, INC., MARK WILLSON. (Miller, Nicholas)
February 17, 2022 Filing 9 Errata re #5 Errata re #2 Summons Issued by KINGFLY SPIRITS. Reason for Correction: Adding corrected case number to all documents. (pak)
February 16, 2022 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by KINGFLY SPIRITS. (Farneth, George)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 2/15/22. (jhi)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Susan Paradise Baxter recused. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 2/15/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
February 15, 2022 Filing 5 Errata re #2 Summons Issued by EBBREZZA, INC., KINGFLY SPIRITS, MARK WILLSON. Reason for Correction: Adding corrected case number to documents. (pak)
February 15, 2022 Filing 4 Errata re #1 Complaint, by EBBREZZA, INC., KINGFLY SPIRITS, MARK WILLSON. Reason for Correction: Adding corrected case number to documents.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (pak)
February 15, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Cathy Bissoon. (elt)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Arthur J. Schwab recused. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 2/14/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ms)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ECHT, LLC, ERIE YACHT CLUB, JORG GERLACH, DAVID S. KELTT, BLAKE RAGGHIANTI, DANIELLE RAGGHIANTI, THE AGING ROOM, LLC, GREGG THRELKELD, JUSTINA TUSHAK, MARK ZINI (pak) Errata adding corrected case number to documents filed at #5 . Modified text on 2/15/2022. (pak)
February 14, 2022 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 2/22/2022. (pak)
February 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ECHT, LLC, ERIE YACHT CLUB, JORG GERLACH MD PhD, JOHN DOES (1-10), DAVID S. KLETT, BLAKE RAGGHIANTI, DANIELLE RAGGHIANTI, THE AGING ROOM, LLC, GREGG THRELKELD, JUSTINA TUSHAK, MARK ZINI (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6948161), filed by EBBREZZA, INC., KINGFLY SPIRITS, MARK WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit A) (pak) Errata adding corrected case number to documents filed at #4 . Modified text on 2/15/2022. (pak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KINGFLY SPIRITS et al v. RAGGHIANTI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KINGFLY SPIRITS formerly doing business as PORT OF PITTSBURGH DISTILLERY, LLC
Represented By: George R. Farneth, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK WILLSON
Represented By: Nicholas A Miller
Represented By: Nicholas A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EBBREZZA, INC.
Represented By: Nicholas A Miller
Represented By: Nicholas A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLAKE RAGGHIANTI
Represented By: Ralph M. Monico
Represented By: Scott R. Eberle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID S. KLETT
Represented By: Anthony E. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUSTINA TUSHAK
Represented By: Trisha A. Gill
Represented By: Kushal N. Dave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIELLE RAGGHIANTI
Represented By: Ralph M. Monico
Represented By: Scott R. Eberle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD PhD JORG GERLACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECHT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGG THRELKELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK ZINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE AGING ROOM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIE YACHT CLUB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?