YOUNG v. PA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Plaintiff: LEONARD YOUNG and JI'HAAD HARRISON
Defendant: PA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, SUPERINTENDENT LONNIE J. OLIVER, DEPUTY PATRICIA THOMPSON, CHCA MIKE EDWARDS, DR. CRAIG RUSH, DR. GODESMAN, DR. EVANS, DR. LUCAS, LT. BASHER, CCPM KURT SUESSER, C. GIDDINGS and CPT JOHNSON
Case Number: 1:2022cv00327
Filed: October 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Referring Judge: Richard A Lanzillo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting ECF No. #19 Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification. The Court clarifies that it received the amended complaint and the term "effectuate service" means to start the process of serving the amended complaint on the defendants. Additionally, The Clerk of Court is directed to remove page three from the instant motion (Young's verification of her motion for injunctive relief) and re-docket it with the MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. 15). Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on December 22, 2022. (rlh)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 IT IS ORDERED that the United States Marshal is directed to mail a copy of the complaint, notice of lawsuit and request for waiver of service of summons, and waiver and this order to each defendant as directed by plaintiff. Costs shall be advanced by the United States. The defendants are requested to waive service pursuant to Rule 4(d). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 12/15/2022. (dlh)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and the Clerk is instructed to file the Complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 12/15/2022. (dlh)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Clarification as to #18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION in re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by LEONARD YOUNG. Motion(s) referred to Richard A. Lanzillo. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jma)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge Susan Paradise Baxter, presiding, and Chief Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo, referral. (dlh)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re ECF No. #15 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by LEONARD YOUNG. It is respectfully recommended that Plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief (ECF No. 59) be DENIED in part and DEFERRED in part. Specifically, Plaintiff's request for a temporary restraining order should be DENIED, and her request for a preliminary injunction should be deferred pending service of Plaintiff's amended complaint and motion for injunctive relief upon the Defendants and, if determined to be necessary, a hearing on the motion. Defendants' objections to the R&R are due by 12/19/2022. Plaintiff's objections to the R&R are due by 12/22/2022. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on December 5, 2022. (rlh)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying ECF No. #16 Plaintiff's Motion for Settlement Agreement, Motion for Mediation. The Court will entertain the scheduling of a mediation or settlement conference only upon the joint request of the Plaintiff and one or more defendants. Only the Plaintiff has requested a mediation or settlement conference. Accordingly, the motion is denied. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on December 2, 2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rlh)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Settlement Agreement, MOTION for Mediation by LEONARD YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jma)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by LEONARD YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-A, #2 Envelope) (jma)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BASHER, MIKE EDWARDS, EVANS, C. GIDDINGS, GODESMAN, JOHNSON, LUCAS, LONNIE J. OLIVER, PA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CRAIG RUSH, KURT SUESSER, PATRICIA THOMPSON, filed by LEONARD YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-A, #2 Envelope) (jma)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by LEONARD YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jma)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER. The Court will sever Harrison's claims pursuant to Rules 20 and 21 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the following instructions: 1. Young may proceed with her claims in the instant lawsuit (case number l:22-cv-327). Her motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis will be granted by separate order. 2. Before her pleading can be served, Young must file an Amended Complaint that states only her own claims under this case number (1:22-cv-327) on or before December 1, 2022. Young is reminded that her amended pleading "must be complete in all respects. It is a new pleading which stands by itself as an adequate complaint without reference to the complaint already filed." To proceed with her own claims, Harrison is instructed to file an Amended Complaint (subject to the same instructions set forth above) on or before December 19, 2022, under case number 1:22-cv-00105. A separate order has been issued in the 105 Action that further addresses the Court's reason for ordering an amended complaint and with additional instructions for filing the complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 11/2/2022. (dlh)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying ECF No. #8 Plaintiffs' motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on October 31, 2022. (rlh)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying ECF No. #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiffs' motion for appointment of counsel, ECF no. #7 , is denied without prejudice. Local Civil Rule 10.C provides that [a]bsent special circumstances, no motions for the appointment of counsel will be granted until after dispositive motions have been resolved. The local rule reflects the experience-based judgment of the District Court that, given the few attorneys who have expressed willingness to represent inmates pro bono, counsel should be reserved for cases pending trial. This case has not reached the applicable stage and there no special circumstances exist. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on October 31, 2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rlh)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER FOR PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 10/31/2022. (dlh)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by JI'HAAD HARRISON, LEONARD YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jma)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JI'HAAD HARRISON, LEONARD YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jma)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by JI'HAAD HARRISON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jma)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by LEONARD YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jma)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by JI'HAAD HARRISON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jma)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by LEONARD YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jma)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JI'HAAD HARRISON. (Attachments: #1 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Affidavit, #4 Envelope) (jma)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LEONARD YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Affidavit) (jma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YOUNG v. PA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEONARD YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JI'HAAD HARRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUPERINTENDENT LONNIE J. OLIVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUTY PATRICIA THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHCA MIKE EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. CRAIG RUSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. GODESMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. LUCAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. BASHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCPM KURT SUESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. GIDDINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPT JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?