HUDSON et al v. McKEESPORT POLICE CHIEFE et al
Case Number: 2:2005cv01611
Filed: November 21, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
Presiding Judge: Gary L. Lancaster
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying 43 Motion for Writ of Mandamus. Signed by Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 1/26/09. (map)
September 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 32 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice to defendants' right to raise these issues under Rule 56 on a properly developed record. Signed by Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 9/16/08. (map)
June 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing plaintiffs to file an amended complaint by 6/30/2006. Signed by Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 6/10/06. (map)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUDSON et al v. McKEESPORT POLICE CHIEFE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?