VOGT v. COLEMAN et al
Petitioner: STEVEN DAVID VOGT
Respondent: COLEMAN, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA and THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF BUTLER
Case Number: 2:2008cv00530
Filed: April 16, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Fayette
Presiding Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER - Respondents are to file a response to Petitioner's Rule 60(b)(6) motion by May 27, 2021, as more fully described in within Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on April 27, 2021. (kcb)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying 51 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on June 8, 2017. (kcc)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 49 Motion for Relief from Judgment and denying a Certificate of Appealability. Petitioner has thirty (30) days in which to file a notice of appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on May 25, 2017. (kcc)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying 42 Motion for Relief from Judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(b). It is further ordered that a certificate of appealability is denied. It is further ordered that the Clerk of Court mark this case CLOSED. And it is further ordered that pursuant to Rule 4(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure, Petitioner has thirty (30) days to file a notice of appeal as provided by Rule 3 of the Fed. R. App. P. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on December 16, 2013. (kcc)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying 40 Motion for Relief from Judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on July 18, 2012.(kcc)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION dismissing 4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by STEVEN DAVID VOGT as untimely. FURTHER ORDERED that request for certificate of appealability is denied. ORDER: Clerk is to mark CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on January 7, 2010. (far) Modified on 1/11/2010 (jsp).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VOGT v. COLEMAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STEVEN DAVID VOGT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: COLEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?