VOGT v. COLEMAN et al
Petitioner: |
STEVEN DAVID VOGT |
Respondent: |
COLEMAN, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA and THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF BUTLER |
Case Number: |
2:2008cv00530 |
Filed: |
April 16, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania |
Office: |
Pittsburgh Office |
County: |
Fayette |
Presiding Judge: |
Lisa Pupo Lenihan |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (General) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 15, 2023 |
Filing
99
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 98 Motion for Rule 60(b) Relief and denying as moot 95 Motion for Discovery, 96 Motion for Judicial Notice of August 23, 2022 Summary Judgment at Civil Action No. 17-1407 and 97 Motion to Appoint Counsel. It is further ORDERED that a Certificate of Appealability is DENIED. Petitioner has thirty days to file a notice of appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on August 15, 2023. (kcb)
|
October 29, 2021 |
Filing
91
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 56 & 57 Petitioner's Motion for Relief from Judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(b); denying 76 Motion for an Evidentiary Hearing; denying 77 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 81 Motion for Corrective Instruction and Sanctions; denying a Certificate of Appealability. Petitioner has thirty (30) days to file a notice of appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on October 29, 2021. (kcb)
|
April 27, 2021 |
Filing
59
ORDER - Respondents are to file a response to Petitioner's Rule 60(b)(6) motion by May 27, 2021, as more fully described in within Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on April 27, 2021. (kcb)
|
June 8, 2017 |
Filing
52
ORDER denying 51 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on June 8, 2017. (kcc)
|
May 25, 2017 |
Filing
50
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 49 Motion for Relief from Judgment and denying a Certificate of Appealability. Petitioner has thirty (30) days in which to file a notice of appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on May 25, 2017. (kcc)
|
December 16, 2013 |
Filing
47
ORDER denying 42 Motion for Relief from Judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(b). It is further ordered that a certificate of appealability is denied. It is further ordered that the Clerk of Court mark this case CLOSED. And it is further ordered that pursuant to Rule 4(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure, Petitioner has thirty (30) days to file a notice of appeal as provided by Rule 3 of the Fed. R. App. P. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on December 16, 2013. (kcc)
|
July 18, 2012 |
Filing
41
ORDER denying 40 Motion for Relief from Judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on July 18, 2012.(kcc)
|
January 8, 2010 |
Filing
24
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION dismissing 4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by STEVEN DAVID VOGT as untimely. FURTHER ORDERED that request for certificate of appealability is denied. ORDER: Clerk is to mark CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on January 7, 2010. (far) Modified on 1/11/2010 (jsp).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?