TAYLOR v. MESSMER et al

Plaintiff: CAROLE L. TAYLOR
Defendant: MARGARET MESSMER, PATRICIA O'KANE, THERESA FLATI, NEGLEY PARK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION COUNCIL and MARJI DUNN
Case Number: 2:2009cv01116
Filed: August 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Allegheny
Presiding Judge: Terrence F. McVerry
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Public Accommodations)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER denying 63 Motion for Reconsideration and Modification filed by CAROLE L. TAYLOR. Signed by Judge Terrence F. McVerry on 0/07/2011. (bsc)
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER LIFTING STAY and vacating Memorandum Order of September 12, 2011 to the extent that the Motion for Reconsideration was deemed moot. Defendants Margaret Messmer; Martha Messmer, Executrix of the Estate of Patricia OKane; and Anthony Flati and Richard Flati, Executors of the Estate of Theresa Flati, are hereby ORDERED to file their Response to the Motion for Reconsideration filed by Plaintiff on or before October 3, 2011.Signed by Judge Terrence F. McVerry on 09/20/2011. (bsc, )
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER STAYING CASE. Due to Plaintiff's filing of notice of appeal, the pending motion for reconsideration is moot and the case is hereby stayed. The Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Attorney Marvin Leibowitz is granted.Signed by Judge Terrence F. McVerry on 09/12/2011. (bsc)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 56 Negley Park Homeowners Association Counsel'S Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 57 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Margaret Messmer; Martha Messmer, Executrix of the Estate of Patricia OKane; Anthony J. Flati and Richard A. Flati, co-executors of the Estate of Theresa Flati. Signed by Judge Terrence F. McVerry on 08/09/2011. (bsc, )
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Motions for Rule 11 Sanctions filed by Defendants 20 , 25 , 31 , 41 , and 44 . Defendants request for reasonable attorneys fees is GRANTED. Accordingly, on or before March 2, 2010, counsel for Defendant s, including counsel for Marija Dunn, shall file a Petition for Reasonable Attorneys Fees. Plaintiff shall file, if she so desires, any response in opposition to the request for attorneys fees on or before March 30, 2010. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Terrence F. McVerry on 02/09/2010. (bsc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAYLOR v. MESSMER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLE L. TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARGARET MESSMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICIA O'KANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THERESA FLATI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEGLEY PARK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION COUNCIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARJI DUNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?