84 LUMBER COMPANY, L.P. v. GREGORY MORTIMER BUILDERS et al
Plaintiff: 84 LUMBER COMPANY, L.P.
Defendant: GREGORY MORTIMER BUILDERS and GREGORY MORTIMER
Counter_claimant: GREGORY MORTIMER and M&M DEVELOPMENT, LLC
Counter_defendant: 84 LUMBER COMPANY, L.P.
Case Number: 2:2011cv00548
Filed: April 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Presiding Judge: Terrence F. McVerry
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 303 MEMORANDUM OPINION ON THE 275 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Preclude Testimony of William Weissgerber filed by 84 LUMBER COMPANY, L.P. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/14/2017. (jmb)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 301 MEMORANDUM OPINION on 271 Plaintiff's MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony and Evidence of Defendants' Direct and Incidental Damages filed by 84 LUMBER COMPANY, L.P. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/08/2017. (jmb)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 234 MOTION for Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 52(c)filed by 84 LUMBER COMPANY, L.P. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 02/23/17. (jer)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 236 MEMORANDUM OPINION on Defendants' Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 01/03/17. (jer)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MEMORANDUM OPINION ON CONTRACTUAL DAMAGE LIMATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 10/11/16. (jer)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MEMORANDUM OPINION ON THE MULTIPLE MOTIONS AND CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 03/30/2016. (jmb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 84 LUMBER COMPANY, L.P. v. GREGORY MORTIMER BUILDERS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 84 LUMBER COMPANY, L.P.
Represented By: S. Manoj Jegasothy
Represented By: Patrick R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY MORTIMER BUILDERS
Represented By: James W. Bentz
Represented By: David D. Gilliss
Represented By: Eric G. Korphage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY MORTIMER
Represented By: James W. Bentz
Represented By: David D. Gilliss
Represented By: Eric G. Korphage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: GREGORY MORTIMER
Represented By: James W. Bentz
Represented By: David D. Gilliss
Represented By: Eric G. Korphage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: M&M DEVELOPMENT, LLC
Represented By: James W. Bentz
Represented By: David D. Gilliss
Represented By: Eric G. Korphage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: 84 LUMBER COMPANY, L.P.
Represented By: S. Manoj Jegasothy
Represented By: Patrick R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?