PONDEXTER v. THE ALLEGHENY COUNTY et al
Plaintiff: |
EARL A. PONDEXTER |
Defendant: |
JOHN JOYCE, THOMAS MCPOYLE, FRANK AGGAZIO, JAMES T. ZAPF, THE ALLEGHENY COUNTY, THE ALLEGHENY COUNTY HOUSING AUTHORITY and DAN ONORATO |
Case Number: |
2:2011cv00857 |
Filed: |
June 28, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania |
Office: |
Pittsburgh Office |
County: |
Allegheny |
Presiding Judge: |
Nora Barry Fischer |
Nature of Suit: |
Housing/Accommodations |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 405 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 2, 2012 |
Filing
121
ORDER indicating that, for reasons more fully stated within 115 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration is denied. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 10/2/12. (jg)
|
August 21, 2012 |
Filing
112
MEMORANDUM OPINION indicating that, for reasons more fully stated within, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, (Docket No. 100 ), is granted, and Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, (Docket No. 98 ), is denied, with prejudice. An appropriate Order follows. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 8/21/12. (jg)
|
May 9, 2012 |
Filing
92
MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that, for reasons more fully stated within, Plaintiff's Motion for Disqualification of Federal District Judge Nora Barry Fischer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 455(a) 79 is denied, with prejudice; that the Telephonic Post Fact Discovery Status Conference is rescheduled for 5/14/12 at 2:00 P.M. The Court will address the parties' previously submitted agendas (Docket Nos. 88 , 90 ), at said conference. The conference will be by telephone and the Court's Clerk will initiate the call. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 5/9/12. (jg) Modified on 5/9/2012. (jg, )
|
February 27, 2012 |
Filing
65
MEMORANDUM OPINION indicating that, for reasons stated more fully within, the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Civil Action Complaint 4 under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendants Allegheny County and Allegheny County Chief Executive Dan Onorato (Defendants) 60 is granted and that said Defendants be stricken from the caption in this matter. An appropriate Order follows. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 2/24/12. (jg)
|
November 4, 2011 |
Filing
51
MEMORANDUM OPINION indicating that, for reasons stated within, Defendant's oral Motion to enjoin Plaintiff from filing further claims prior to receiving certification of those claims from a Magistrate Judge (See 14 ) and Defendant's Supplemental Motion to Enjoin Plaintiff from Proceeding with Claims Prior to Receiving Certification 26 are denied. An appropriate Order follows.Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 11/4/11. (jg)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?