REGINELLA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LTD v. TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: REGINELLA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LTD
Defendant: TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2012cv01047
Filed: July 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Allegheny
Presiding Judge: Gary L. Lancaster
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 OPINION. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 9/5/13. (bdb)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 OPINION. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 5/30/13. (jad)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 15 Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have until 12/14/2012 to file any Reply to Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 11/30/12. (map)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REGINELLA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LTD v. TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: W. Alan Torrance, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REGINELLA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LTD
Represented By: Joseph L. Luciana, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?