KAYMARK v. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: DALE KAYMARK
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. and UDREN LAW OFFICES, P.C.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00419
Filed: March 21, 2013
Court: Pennsylvania Western District Court
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Allegheny
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2017 119 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER. For the reasons stated in the Memorandum Order filed herewith, the Court finds that the Magistrate Judge's Orders denying Plaintiff's Motion to Strike the Rule 68 Offer of Judgment (Doc. 111 ) and denying Plaintiff' s Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 116 ) were neither clearly erroneous nor contrary to law. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Objections (Docs. 117 and 118 ) are OVERRULED, and Judge Eddy's ORDERS are AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/27/2017. (kg)
March 22, 2017 116 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMONARDUM ORDER denying 112 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/22/2017. (bap)
March 10, 2017 111 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying Plaintiff's 105 Motion to Strike Defendant's Rule 68 Offer of Judgment. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove Plaintiff's motion, brief in support of the motion, and the attached exhibit of Defendant's Rule 68 Offer (ECF Nos. 105, 106, 106-1) from public view. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/10/2017. (bap)
December 12, 2016 92 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER. For the reasons stated in the Memorandum Order filed herewith, Defendant's Renewed Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (Doc. 75 ) is DENIED. The case is hereby remanded to Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy to conduct all pretrial proceedings in the matter. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 12/12/2016. (kg)
March 31, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation 41 ; granting 24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/31/2014. (acs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KAYMARK v. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DALE KAYMARK
Represented By: Michael P. Malakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Represented By: Thomas L. Allen
Represented By: Jonathan J. Bart
Represented By: Marc A. Goldich
Represented By: Nellie E. Hestin
Represented By: Andrew J. Soven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UDREN LAW OFFICES, P.C.
Represented By: Jonathan J. Bart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?