GUCKER v. U.S. STEEL CORPORATION

Plaintiff: ALBERT E. GUCKER
Defendant: U.S. STEEL CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2013cv00583
Filed: April 23, 2013
Court: Pennsylvania Western District Court
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2016 153 Opinion or Order of the Court IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, for the reasons stating herein, that the portion of Defendants Motion (Docket No. 99 ) discussed herein is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion (Docket No. 104 ) is DENIED-IN-PART and GRANTED-IN-PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the portion of Defendants Motion (Docket No. 131 ) discussed herein is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 1/31/2016. (nsc)
January 29, 2016 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER indicating that upon consideration of Defendant's Motion in Limine to exclude Lauren Colters (ne Beausigneur) notes and testimony concerning her investigation of the Plaintiff's EEOC charge 99 , Plaintiff's opposition thereto [1 25], the parties representations and argument at the Final Pretrial Conference that was held 1/26/16 134 , and Ms. Colter's deposition testimony, (Docket No. 44 -2, 44 -3), it is hereby ordered that Defendant's motion in limine is granted-in-part, deferred-in-part, and denied-in-part (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 1/29/16. (jg)
January 27, 2016 140 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that Defendant's Motion in Limine to preclude Mr. Slane from testifying 131 is granted, in part, and deferred, in part. Defendant's motion is granted, in part, to the extent that the Plaintiff shall be preclud ed from offering Stephen Slane, MS, PT, CEAS as a rebuttal witness (details more fully stated in said Order); that Defendant's motion is deferred, in part, to the extent that the Court will rule on whether Tom Amoroso may provide testimony at a later date. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 1/27/16. (jg)
December 11, 2015 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER indicating that, for reasons more fully stated within, that both Plaintiff's Motion in Limine 72 and Defendant's Motion in Limine 77 are denied. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 12/11/15. (jg)
November 23, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 65 Defendant's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Proposed Testimony of Donal F. Kirwan; and that the expert reports will not be admitted into evidence (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 11/23/15. (jg)
June 12, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION indicating that, for reasons more fully stated within, Defendant's motion for summary judgment 35 , is denied. An appropriate Order follows. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 6/12/15. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GUCKER v. U.S. STEEL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERT E. GUCKER
Represented By: Jarrod T. Takah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. STEEL CORPORATION
Represented By: Maria Cristina Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?