HILL v. BARNACLE et al
Plaintiff: DONNA M. HILL
Defendant: JAMES BARNACLE, STEVEN GLUNT, DAVID CLOSE, KENNETH R. HOLLIBAUGH, BRUMBAUGH and HEATHER MOORE
Case Number: 2:2013cv01604
Filed: November 7, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by KENNETH R. HOLLIBAUGH, STEVEN GLUNT, JAMES BARNACLE, DAVID CLOSE, HEATHER MOORE, BRUMBAUGH, and 158 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 135 MOTION for Summary Judgm ent filed by KENNETH R. HOLLIBAUGH, STEVEN GLUNT, JAMES BARNACLE, DAVID CLOSE, HEATHER MOORE, BRUMBAUGH. Based on the memorandum opinion, the Court sustains Plaintiffs Objections, declines to adopt the Report and Recommendation 158 , and Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 135 is denied. Details more fully stated in the opinion. An appropriate Order follows. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 12/21/20. (cjo)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that, for reasons more fully stated within, Plaintiff's Objections to the Report and Recommendation 108 , which the Court has construed as a Motion for Reconsideration, is denied; that pursuant to Rule 4(a)(1) of t he Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure, if any party wishes to appeal from this Order a notice of appeal, as provided in Fed. R. App. P. 3, must be filed with the Clerk of Court, United States District Court, at 700 Grant Street, Room 3110, Pittsburgh, PA 15219, within (30 days. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 6/15/17. (jg)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgement 68 , is granted, and that judgment is entered in favor of Defendants James Barnacle, Steven Glunt, David Close, Kenneth R. Hollibaugh, Captain Brumbaugh, and Heathe r Moore, and against Plaintiff on all claims in this case. The Clerk of Court shall mark this matter as closed. The report and recommendation of Magistrate Judge Mitchell, (Docket No. 103 ), is adopted as the opinion of the Court. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 6/14/17. (jg)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER denying 82 Motion for Recusal and directing Plaintiff to file separate motions and briefs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 2/10/2017. (spc)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that upon consideration of Plaintiff's Objections to Order 63 , which the Court interprets as an appeal of said Order, for the reasons stated within, Plaintiff's appeal 63 is denied. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 9/15/16. (jg)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying 56 Motion for Recusal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 8/18/2016. (spc)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation 40 , which is adopted as the opinion of this Court; that defendants' motion to dismiss 34 is granted; that pursuant to Rule 4(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure if the plaintiff desires to appeal from this Order she must do so within thirty (30) days by filing a notice of appeal as provided in Rule 3, Fed. R. App. P. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 10/28/15. (jg)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER indicating that that the complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(ii). The Magistrate Judge's Amended Report and Recommendation 11 is adopted as the opi nion of this Court, as supplemented herein; that, pursuant to Rule 4(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure, if any party wishes to appeal from this Order a notice of appeal, as provided in Fed. R. App. P. 3, must be filed with the Clerk of Court, United States District Court, at 700 Grant Street, Room 3110, Pittsburgh, PA 15219, within thirty (30) days. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 3/19/14. (jg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HILL v. BARNACLE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA M. HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES BARNACLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN GLUNT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID CLOSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH R. HOLLIBAUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUMBAUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATHER MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?