HARRIS v. VITRAN EXPRESS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DARRELL HARRIS
Defendant: VITRAN EXPRESS, INC., VITRAN EXPRESS CANADA, INC., VITRAN CORPORATION, INC., DATA PROCESSING, LLC, HR-1, CORPORATION and CT TRANSPORT, INC.
Case Number: 2:2014cv00704
Filed: May 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff against Defendants, as more fully set forth in the attached Judgment Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/25/2017. (ajt)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER re 131 Memorandum Opinion & Order granting summary judgment in Plaintiff's favor on his breach of contract and Pennsylvania Wage Payment and Collection Law claims. Plaintiff shall file a separate fee petition and brief his entitlement to attorneys fees, costs, and prejudgment interest by November 30, 2016. VEI shall respond by December 30, 2016. Motion Hearing set for 1/20/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10A before Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/2/2016. (ajt)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING re 65 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by VITRAN CORPORATION, INC., VITRAN EXPRESS, INC., DATA PROCESSING, LLC, HR-1, CORPORATION, CT TRANSPORT, INC., VITRAN EXPRESS CANADA, INC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/31/2016. (ajt)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ADOPTING Report and Recommendations re 29 as the Opinion of the Court; DENYING 12 Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 11/6/14. (lck)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARRIS v. VITRAN EXPRESS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARRELL HARRIS
Represented By: Christopher A. Cafardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VITRAN EXPRESS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VITRAN EXPRESS CANADA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VITRAN CORPORATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DATA PROCESSING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HR-1, CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CT TRANSPORT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?