MARSHALL v CORBETT et al
Plaintiff: KERRY X MARSHALL
Defendant: TOM CORBETT, JOHN WETZEL, JOHN DOE #1, ANDREA PRIORI-MEINTEL, ULLI KLEMM, CRAIG COOPER, MARGARET GORDON, MARCIA NOLES, RANDY MCELRAVY, MICHAEL MICHLIN, JEFFREY DITTY, LYDIA HALE, ADEEB RASHEED, JODY SMITH, DORINA VARNER, BRIAN COLEMAN, JOHN DOES #2-7 and DEBRA HAWKINBERRY
Case Number: 2:2014cv01210
Filed: September 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Centre
Presiding Judge: Maureen P. Kelly
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying 56 Motion to Lift Stay for reasons more fully stated in the accompanying Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 06/17/2019. A copy of this notice and Order have been mailed to Plaintiff's address of record this date. (tjw)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying 12 Motion for Reconsideration, Plaintiff is ORDERED to supply the necessary number of copies of the service papers by February 4, 2015. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of the suit for failure to prosecute. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 12-5-2014. A copy of the Order together with this Notice of Electronic Filing are being sent to Plaintiff at his address of record. (tmr)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying without prejudice ECF No. 8 , Motion to obtain service of process without prepayment of Marshal Fees, and denying with prejudice ECF No. 9 Motion to forego service of the complaint to numerous defendants. Plaintiff is ORDERED to provide sufficient numbers of the Complaint and of Form 285s and of Notices of Lawsuit and Requests for Waivers of Service for each defendant no later than December 1, 2014. Failure to comply may result in the dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 11-5-2014. A copy of this Order together with the Notice of Electronic Filing are being sent to Plaintiff at his address of record via first class mail. (tmr)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by KERRY X MARSHALL, ruling on the IFP Motion will be deferred because the Motion is deficient as noted in the accompanying order. Plaintiff is ORDERED to complete the Authorizatio n To be Completed by Prisoner Who Seeks Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, a copy of which is being mailed to Plaintiff with this order, and return it to the Court no later than October 3, 2014. The Inmate Accounts Officer at SCI-Rockiew is ORDERED to complete the portion of the IFP Motion required to be completed by the Records Officer of the Prison (a copy of which is being sent to that Officer) and to promptly send it back to the Court along with a certified copy of the Plaintiff's Inma te Trust Account Statement for the last six months. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 9/24/2014. A copy of the Order together with this Notice of Electronic Filing are being sent to Plaintiff and to the Inmate Accounting Department at SCI-Rockview via first class mail. (tmr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARSHALL v CORBETT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KERRY X MARSHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOM CORBETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN WETZEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREA PRIORI-MEINTEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ULLI KLEMM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAIG COOPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARGARET GORDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARCIA NOLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDY MCELRAVY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL MICHLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY DITTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYDIA HALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADEEB RASHEED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JODY SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DORINA VARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN COLEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES #2-7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBRA HAWKINBERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?