ERWOOD v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: PATRICIA ERWOOD
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA, WELLSTAR HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. and GROUP LIFE INSURANCE PROGRAM
Case Number: 2:2014cv01284
Filed: September 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maureen P. Kelly
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 NON JURY VERDICT in favor of Plaintiff Patricia Erwood in the amount of $750,000.00 plus interest, attorney's fees and costs and against Defendants WellStar Health System, Inc. and Group Life Insurance Program. Plaintiff may file a motion for interest, attorney's fees and costs by April 27, 2017. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 04/13/17. (eca)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 OPINION granting in part and denying in part 87 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 92 Motion for Summary Judgment; and denying 98 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 9/16/16. (ard)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that the Chief Magistrate Judge's Opinion 53 is adopted as the opinion of this Court; that Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America's Motion to Dismiss Count I of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 39 is denied. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 4/23/15. (jg)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 OPINION AND ORDER denying 26 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 1/12/2015. (ndf ) (Main Document 46 replaced on 1/12/2015) (ndf, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ERWOOD v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA ERWOOD
Represented By: Talia Ravis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: James A. Keller
Represented By: Christine M. Pickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLSTAR HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: Suzanne L. DeWalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GROUP LIFE INSURANCE PROGRAM
Represented By: Suzanne L. DeWalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?