PEREZ v. WPN CORPORATION ET AL
Plaintiff: THOMAS E. PEREZ
Defendant: WPN CORPORATION, RONALD LABOW, SEVERSTAL WHEELING, INC. RETIREMENT COMMITTEE, MICHAEL DiCLEMENTE, DENNIS HALPIN, WHEELING CORRUGATING COMPANY RETIREMENT SECURITY PLAN and SALARIED EMPLOYEES' PENSION PLAN OF SEVERSTAL WHEELING, INC.
Case Number: 2:2014cv01494
Filed: October 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MEMORANDUM OPINION indicating that, for reasons more fully stated within, DiClemente, Halpin, and the Retirement Committee's Motion for Summary Judgment 179 is granted and the Plaintiff's cross motion 182 is denied, as moot. An appropriate Order follows. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 9/30/19. (jg)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER indicating that in accordance with the standard governing motions for summary judgment and upon consideration of the motion for summary judgment filed by Plaintiff 178 , its brief in support thereof 185 , its concise statement of material fac ts with appendix (Docket Nos. 178 , 186 ), and the lack of response by Defendants Ronald LaBow and WPN Corporation, for the reasons stated within, it is hereby ordered that said Motion 178 is granted; that the Plaintiff file a supplemental brief clearly establishing the legal and factual basis for any award of damages no later than 7/30/19. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 7/16/19. (jg)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MEMORANDUM OPINION indicating that, for reasons stated within, Defendants' Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff;s Expert Witness, Dr. Susan Mangiero 166 is denied; An appropriate Order follows. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 8/3/18. (jg)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MEMORANDUM OPINION indicating that, for reasons more fully stated within, the Court finds that the Third Amendment to the Severstal Wheeling, Inc. Investment Management Agreement is effective as of 11/1/2008. Accordingly, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 124 will be granted as to Plaintiff's failure to invest claim. Plaintiffs will be permitted leave to amend the Amended Complaint consistent with this Opinion. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 124 will be granted as to Plaintiff&# 039;s co-fiduciary liability claim. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 124 will be denied as to Plaintiff's failure to monitor claim. Defendants' alternative Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. An appropriate Order will be entered. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 6/7/17. (jg)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that, for the reasons more fully stated within, Defendants Michael DiClemente, Dennis Halpin, and Severstal Wheeling, Inc. Retirement Committee's Motion to Compel 116 shall be granted to the extent that Defendants M ichael DiClemente and Dennis Halpin, their underwriter, if any, and their counsel of record, are permitted to view the contents of the Agreement; that the Motion shall be denied to the extent Defendants may wish to disseminate the Agreement beyond M ichael DiClemente and Dennis Halpin, their underwriter, if any, and their counsel of record; the Agreement shall not be filed on the docket and shall not be disclosed to anyone other than Michael DiClemente and Dennis Halpin, their underwriter, if any, and their counsel of record, or be used for any purpose other than the present litigation, without leave of this Court. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 11/9/16. (jg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PEREZ v. WPN CORPORATION ET AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS E. PEREZ
Represented By: Michael A. Comber
Represented By: John M. Strawn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WPN CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD LABOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEVERSTAL WHEELING, INC. RETIREMENT COMMITTEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL DiCLEMENTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENNIS HALPIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHEELING CORRUGATING COMPANY RETIREMENT SECURITY PLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALARIED EMPLOYEES' PENSION PLAN OF SEVERSTAL WHEELING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?