CARBONE v. THE NEW CASTLE POLICE DEPARTMENT et al

Plaintiff: KIMBERLEE RAE CARBONE
Defendant: THE NEW CASTLE POLICE DEPARTMENT, ROBERT SALEM, DAVID MAIELLA, TERRY DOLQUIST, SHEILA PANELLA, LAWRENCE COUNTY JAIL, APRIL BRIGHTSHUE, NIESHA SAVAGE, MARK KEYSER, LAWRENCE COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, JOSHUA LAMANCUSA, JAMESON HEALTH SYSTEMS, BERNARD GEISER and KIM FEE
Case Number: 2:2015cv01175
Filed: September 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Lawrence
Presiding Judge: Terrence F. McVerry
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting 137 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 139 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 141 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 145 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 149 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 153 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 156 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 160 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 11/20/17. (bb)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 131 Motion to Compel Discovery Directed to Defendant April Brightsue. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 3/9/17. (bb)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 30 Motion to Dismiss; granting 34 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion to Dismiss. Counts IV, VI, VII, VIII, IX , and XII are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Defendants shall file Answers to Counts IV, VI, VII, VIII, IX, and XII in the Amended Complaint on or before February 22, 2016. The parties shall confer as necessary and file their Stipulation Selecting ADR Process and their Rule 26(f) Report on or before February 29, 2016. The Initial Case Management Conference is hereby SCHEDULED on March 11, 2016, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 6C.Signed by Judge Terrence F. McVerry on 2/3/2016. (rjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARBONE v. THE NEW CASTLE POLICE DEPARTMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLEE RAE CARBONE
Represented By: Stanley T. Booker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE NEW CASTLE POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Mark R. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT SALEM
Represented By: Mark R. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID MAIELLA
Represented By: Mark R. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRY DOLQUIST
Represented By: Mark R. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHEILA PANELLA
Represented By: Mark R. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWRENCE COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APRIL BRIGHTSHUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIESHA SAVAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK KEYSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWRENCE COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA LAMANCUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMESON HEALTH SYSTEMS
Represented By: Grant W. Cannon
Represented By: Terry C. Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERNARD GEISER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIM FEE
Represented By: Grant W. Cannon
Represented By: Terry C. Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?