DESPOT v. THE BALTIMORE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: DAVID DESPOT
Defendant: THE BALTIMORE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE BALTIMORE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANIES, GOOGLE INC., MICROSOFT CORPORATION/BING, YAHOO! INC., JUSTIA.COM/JUSTIA, INC., LEAGLE.COM/LEAGLE, INC., PACERMONITOR.COM/PACERMONITOR/HARROS, LLC, LAW360.COM/PORTFOLIO MEDIA, INC., CASETEXT, INC. and RFC EXPRESS
Case Number: 2:2015cv01672
Filed: December 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Allegheny
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Defendant's Motion for Attorney's Fees (Doc. 78 ) is GRANTED, and attorney's fees and costs in the total amount of $40,678.57 are awarded, against Plaintiff and in favor of the Baltimore Life Insurance Company, Inc. The Magistrate Judge's Report & Recommendation (Doc. 92 ) is adopted as the Opinion of the District Court. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 12/5/16. (dcd) Staff note: a copy of this Order was sent today, via First-Class U.S. Mail, to Plaintiff's current address of record (4000 Mason Lane, Apt. # 4408, Pittsburgh, PA 15205).
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MEMORANDUM ORDER. The moving-Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 22 , 32 , 35 , 40 , 57 & 62 ) are GRANTED; the claims against the non-moving Defendants are DISMISSED for Plaintiff's failure to timely serve; and the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (Doc. 69 ) hereby is adopted as the Opinion of the District Court. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/4/16. (dcd)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re Response to Motion, filed by DAVID DESPOT, denying request for appointment of counsel, granting in part request for extension of time: Brief in Opposition to motions to dismiss 22 32 35 40 42 due by 4/22/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 3/8/2016. (spc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DESPOT v. THE BALTIMORE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID DESPOT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BALTIMORE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BALTIMORE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOGLE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICROSOFT CORPORATION/BING
Represented By: Richard J. Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YAHOO! INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUSTIA.COM/JUSTIA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEAGLE.COM/LEAGLE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACERMONITOR.COM/PACERMONITOR/HARROS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAW360.COM/PORTFOLIO MEDIA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASETEXT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RFC EXPRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?