COULTER v. PAUL LAURENCE DUNBAR COMMUNITY CENTER et al
Plaintiff: JEAN COULTER
Defendant: PAUL LAURENCE DUNBAR COMMUNITY CENTER, GRACE YOUTH AND FAMILY FOUNDATION, CATHERINE DONNELLY, HEATHER D. DOVENSPIKE, WILLIAM M. HALLE, JOHN L. WISE, III, DOUGLAS FROST, LEEANN MEALS, ROBERT PATER, MATTHEW PEROTTI, CLARICE SHAY, ERIC WEIMER, LOUISE BAULDAUF, JENNIFER LINN, THE LINN LAW GROUP, MIN OFFSTEIN, LORRAINE J. DIDOMENICO, JOYCE KLARA, UNKNOWN BOARD MEMBER EMPLOYED BY BUTLER AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT and UNKNOWN BOARD MEMBER
Case Number: 2:2016cv00125
Filed: February 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Arthur J. Schwab
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MEMORANDUM OPINION GRANTING 80 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Remaining Claim for Failure to Prosecute filed by PAUL LAURENCE DUNBAR COMMUNITY CENTER. An Order shall follow. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 9/11/2017. (eet)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER DENYING 77 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct; and DENYING 77 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Recusal. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 8/14/2017. (eet)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 57 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; granting 59 Defendant The Linn Law Group's Renewed Motion to Dismiss. To the extent that Coulter was making a motion for recusal in her Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss 66 , pp. 3-4, the motion is DENIED. This case will proceed on Plaintiff's remaining claim for breach of contract against Defendant Paul Laurence Dunbar Center. All other claims against Defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All other Defendants are dismissed from the lawsuit. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 7/12/2017. (eet)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM ORDER GRANTING 63 Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Compliance with 52 the May 24, 2017 Order. Plaintiff shall meet with Defense Counsel on or before July 19, 2017. Plaintiff shall file the required Rule 26(f) Report, a proposed case management order, and a stipulating selecting ADR process on or before July 21, 2017. The Initial Case Management Conference currently scheduled for July 11, 2017 is rescheduled for August 16, 2017 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 7C. Defendants' Motion for Sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 7/7/2017. (eet)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 45 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Findings Pursuant to Rule 59 and Rule 52 and Renewed Motion for Recusal. This case shall remain CLOSED. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 5/19/16. (eet)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER OF COURT GRANTING Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Doc. Nos. 32 and 34), DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for lack of subject-matter jurisdictions and DENYING AS MOOT Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Recusal and Stay to Permit Discovery (Doc. No. 35). This case shall be marked CLOSED. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 4/15/16. (eet)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING 25 Motion for Recusal and DENYING 26 Motion for Stay of Proceedings. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 3/25/16. (eet)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COULTER v. PAUL LAURENCE DUNBAR COMMUNITY CENTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEAN COULTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL LAURENCE DUNBAR COMMUNITY CENTER
Represented By: C. Leon Sherman
Represented By: John M. Steidle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRACE YOUTH AND FAMILY FOUNDATION
Represented By: C. Leon Sherman
Represented By: John M. Steidle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATHERINE DONNELLY
Represented By: C. Leon Sherman
Represented By: John M. Steidle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATHER D. DOVENSPIKE
Represented By: C. Leon Sherman
Represented By: John M. Steidle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM M. HALLE
Represented By: C. Leon Sherman
Represented By: John M. Steidle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN L. WISE, III
Represented By: C. Leon Sherman
Represented By: John M. Steidle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUGLAS FROST
Represented By: C. Leon Sherman
Represented By: John M. Steidle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEEANN MEALS
Represented By: C. Leon Sherman
Represented By: John M. Steidle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT PATER
Represented By: C. Leon Sherman
Represented By: John M. Steidle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW PEROTTI
Represented By: C. Leon Sherman
Represented By: John M. Steidle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARICE SHAY
Represented By: C. Leon Sherman
Represented By: John M. Steidle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC WEIMER
Represented By: C. Leon Sherman
Represented By: John M. Steidle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUISE BAULDAUF
Represented By: C. Leon Sherman
Represented By: John M. Steidle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER LINN
Represented By: C. Leon Sherman
Represented By: John M. Steidle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE LINN LAW GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIN OFFSTEIN
Represented By: C. Leon Sherman
Represented By: John M. Steidle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORRAINE J. DIDOMENICO
Represented By: C. Leon Sherman
Represented By: John M. Steidle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOYCE KLARA
Represented By: C. Leon Sherman
Represented By: John M. Steidle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN BOARD MEMBER EMPLOYED BY BUTLER AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN BOARD MEMBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?