SCHIRNHOFER v. PREMIER COMP SOLUTIONS, LLC
Plaintiff: BETH SCHIRNHOFER
Defendant: PREMIER COMP SOLUTIONS, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00462
Filed: April 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Allegheny
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER re 88 Memorandum Opinion: It is HEREBY ORDERED that the motion for summary judgment filed on behalf of Defendant Premier Comp Solutions (ECF No. 45) is GRANTED as to the plaintiff Beth Schirnhofers Family Medical Leave Act claims, found in counts I and II of the plaintiffs first amended complaint, and otherwise is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/28/2018. (ajt)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying re 75 Motion to Strike filed by BETH SCHIRNHOFER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 10/24/2017. (ajt)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 39 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 6/1/2017. (ajt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHIRNHOFER v. PREMIER COMP SOLUTIONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETH SCHIRNHOFER
Represented By: Maureen Davidson-Welling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PREMIER COMP SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By: Stanley M. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?