POLITICAL PRISONER NO. DL-4686 v. WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: POLITICAL PRISONER NO. DL-4686
Defendant: WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC., CORIZON HEALTH, INC., CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC, BYUNGHAK JIN, ELON MWAURA, PAUL DASCANI, JAWAD A. SALAMEN, ESTHER L. MATTES, JOHN N. ROBINSON, TYSON D. GILLMEN, CHRISTINA B. DOLL, RONALD A. LONG, DEB CUTSHALL, W. A. MYERS, P. HALLWORTH, FELIPE ARIAS, JULIE KNAVER, MYRON STANSHESKI, M. MCDONALD, R. BLATT, RICHARD STEFANIC, V. CAPONE, LISA GONZALEZ, PARK, J. BEABOUT, SUSAN LIGHTBOURN, JACK ZIMMERLY, J. DEFRANGESCO, RAY MACHAK, C. AGRA, STEPHEN KAMINSKY and C. KEPHART
Case Number: 2:2016cv01680
Filed: November 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 289 OPINION and ORDER adopting 279 Report and Recommendation. Dr. Santos's and Dr. Valley's Motions to Dismiss, or in the alternative for Summary Judgment, 236 and 239 , are GRANTED in part, and DENIED in part, as stated in detail in the Order. This matter will proceed upon the claims and against the Defendants who have survived following the 171 June 28, 2018 Memorandum Opinion and Order and the 279 November 13, 2020 Report and Recommendation. This matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 3/15/21. (rtw)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 OPINION and ORDER adopting 192 Report and Recommendation as supplemented by Opinion. Court finds that Plaintiff's objections do not undermine the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff's request for injunctive relief is DENIED. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 3/11/19. (rtw)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER. The DOC Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 82 ) will be granted in part and denied in part. The Motion will be granted (i) as to all claims against Defendants Wolf, Beard, and Wetzel; (ii) all claims against the H epatitis C Treatment Committee; (iii) all state law tort claims (Counts X XVIII, inclusive); (iv) all retaliation claims (Count VI); and (v) all claims alleging denial of access to courts(Counts VIII and IX). The Motion will be denied as to (i) any supervisory claims against Defendants Gordon, Guth, Vihlidal and Knauer; (ii) any claims against The Bureau of HealthCare Services Assistant Medical Director and the Bureau of Health Care Services Infection Control Coordinator; (iii) all official cap acity claims; and (iv) all Eighth Amendment claims pertaining to Plaintiffs alleged deficient diet (Count II). Any additional Eighth Amendment claims alleging the DOC Defendants are deliberately indifferent to Plaintiffs serious medical needs will al so proceed (Counts I, III, IV, and V). The Corizon Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 100 and 143 ) will be granted in their entirety. Medical Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 104 ) will be GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Spe cifically, the Motion will be granted as to (i) all state court tort claims; (ii) all retaliation claims (Count VI; (iii) all access to court claims (Counts VIII and IX); (iv) all professional negligence claims (Counts X, XI, XVII); (v) the negligenc e claims (Counts XII and XV); (vi) the breach of contract claim (Count XIII); and (vii) the equitable estoppel claim (Count XVI). The Motion is denied as to (i) all deliberate indifference to serious medical needs (Counts I, II, III, IV, and V); (ii ) the Monel claim alleged against Wexford Health and Correct Care Solutions (Count X); and (iii) the intentional infliction of emotional distress and assault and battery claims (Counts XIV and XVIII). Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 06/28/2018. (alj)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Magistrate Judge Eddy's Orders dated January 31, 2018 (Doc. 147) and February 26, 2018 (Docs. 163 and 164) were neither clearly erroneous nor contrary to law. See generally Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) (reciting standards of review governing magistrate judges' non-dispositive rulings). Accordingly, Plaintiff's Appeal (Doc. 168) is DENIED, and Judge Eddy's ruling is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 04/24/18. (alj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POLITICAL PRISONER NO. DL-4686 v. WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POLITICAL PRISONER NO. DL-4686
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC.
Represented By: Meghan K. Adkins
Represented By: Samuel H. Foreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORIZON HEALTH, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By: Meghan K. Adkins
Represented By: Samuel H. Foreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BYUNGHAK JIN
Represented By: Meghan K. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELON MWAURA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL DASCANI
Represented By: Meghan K. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAWAD A. SALAMEN
Represented By: Meghan K. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESTHER L. MATTES
Represented By: Meghan K. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN N. ROBINSON
Represented By: Meghan K. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TYSON D. GILLMEN
Represented By: Meghan K. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINA B. DOLL
Represented By: Meghan K. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD A. LONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEB CUTSHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. A. MYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. HALLWORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FELIPE ARIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIE KNAVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYRON STANSHESKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. BLATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD STEFANIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. CAPONE
Represented By: Meghan K. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA GONZALEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. BEABOUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN LIGHTBOURN
Represented By: Meghan K. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACK ZIMMERLY
Represented By: Meghan K. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. DEFRANGESCO
Represented By: Meghan K. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAY MACHAK
Represented By: Meghan K. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. AGRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN KAMINSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. KEPHART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?