BROWN v. MATRIX PROPERTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY
Plaintiff: VERNON L. BROWN
Defendant: MATRIX PROPERTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2016cv01824
Filed: December 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Beaver
Presiding Judge: Maureen P. Kelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation. The Third Amended Complaint (Doc. 63 ) is DISMISSED, with prejudice, for failure to prosecute. The Chief Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (Doc. 81 ) is ADOPTED as the Opinion of the District Court, as augmented by the filing at this docket entry. The Court's Judgment Order will follow. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 9/7/18. (rdl)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER. Consistent with the Memorandum Order filed herewith, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 64 ) is DENIED, and the Chief Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (Doc. 67 ) hereby is ADOPTED as the Opinion of the District Court. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 6/27/18. (rdl)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM ORDER on 57 Report and Recommendations. For the reasons in the Memorandum Order filed at this docket entry, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 53 ) is GRANTED and Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is DISMISSED without prej udice to Plaintiff filing a Third Amended Complaint. The Court cautions Plaintiff that this is the final opportunity to amend the Complaint. If Plaintiff does not file a Third Amended Complaint by February 28, 2018, or if the Third Amended Complaint remains deficient, the Court will dismiss this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 2/14/18. (rdl)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER. Consistent with the Memorandum Order filed herewith, the Court hereby enters the following Order: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 34 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to Plaintiff filin g an Amended Complaint that establishes jurisdiction by alleging a violation of an applicable provision of federal law. Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint on or before September 27, 2017. If Plaintiff does not file an Amended Complaint on or before September 27, 2017, this case will be dismissed with prejudice. The Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (Doc. 43 ) hereby is ADOPTED as the Opinion of the District Court. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 9/6/2017. (jwr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROWN v. MATRIX PROPERTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VERNON L. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATRIX PROPERTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?