SIMMONS v. GIMORE et al
Plaintiff: AUGUSTUS SIMMONS
Defendant: R. GILMORE, M. ZAKEN, LEGGET, SMITH, SHRADER, LT. KENNEDY, S LONGSTRETCH, YOUNKIN, CHRIOVITTI, D. BENNER, HIMES, D. VARNER, J. DUPONT, T. SHAWLEY, CORE, BROOKS, CARTER, GILLESPIE, HENNESSEY, ALBONDE and IMHOLF
Case Number: 2:2017cv00996
Filed: August 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CHRIOVITTI, HENNESSEY, ALBONDE, CORE, LT. KENNEDY, GILLESPIE, M. ZAKEN, BROOKS, IMHOLF, YOUNKIN, CARTER, R. GILMORE. The motion is DENIED as to Plainti ff's First Amendment retaliation claim against Defendants Carter and Imhoff based on Plaintiff being placed in a "hard cell" with continuous illumination. In all other respects the motion is GRANTED, and all other claims are dismissed. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate all remaining Defendants except Carter and Imhoff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 3/31/2021. (dm)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 99 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on July 16, 2020. (jbh)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER denying 65 Motion to Compel responses to interrogatories; denying 66 Motion to Compel first request for admission of Defendant Chiovitti; denying 67 Motion to Compel production of documents; denying 68 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on August 21, 2019. (jbh)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER on 58 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by AUGUSTUS SIMMONS re 56 Order on Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 07/01/19. (esa)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying 52 Motion to Compel; denying 53 Motion for Conference; denying 55 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on June 26, 2019. (jbh)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 50 Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Answer Interrogatories. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on June 10, 2019. (jbh)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER that Defendants partial motion to dismiss 21 is GRANTED, as follows:1. The First Amendment retaliation claim and the RLUIPA claim atCount II are DISMISSED, without prejudice, against Defendants Albonde, Zaken, and Gilmore. Plaintiff is allowe d to amend his complaint to more clearly define such claims by April 15, 2019; 2. Count IV is DISMISSED, with prejudice, against Defendants Zaken, Leggett, Longstreth, Gilmore, Shawley, and Smith;3. Count V is DISMISSED, with prejudice, against Defen dants Benner, Himes, and Dupont; 4. Count VI is DISMISSED, with prejudice, against DefendantsGilmore, Zaken, Leggett, Smith, Shrader, Kennedy, Longstreth, Younkin, Varner, Dupont, Shawley, and Benner; and 5. The Eighth Amendment sexual harassment cla im at Count VII against Defendants Carter and Imhof is DISMISSED, with prejudice. The report and recommendation of Magistrate Judge Lanzillo, issued October 31, 2018 40 , is adopted as the opinion of the court. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 3/26/19. (lrw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIMMONS v. GIMORE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUGUSTUS SIMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. GILMORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. ZAKEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEGGET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHRADER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. KENNEDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S LONGSTRETCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YOUNKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIOVITTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. BENNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. VARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. DUPONT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. SHAWLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROOKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GILLESPIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENNESSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBONDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMHOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?