SNIDER v. WITTIG et al
Plaintiff: JOEL SNIDER
Defendant: ROBERT WITTIG, PUSHKALAI PILLAI, SHELLY MANKEY, TRACY SHREEVE, FREDERICK WAINE, E. VALKO, ROBERT GILMORE, MARK DIALESANDRO, TRACY SHAWLEY, SUSAN COWAN, DARINA VARNER, KERRI MOORE, DAN CARO, MARK WAHL, ULI KLEMM, JABULANI SIBANDA, JAY GARDNER, GREG JOHNSON, DEB RAND, JOHN WETZEL, UNITED STATES, US DISTRICT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA, UNKNOWN DEFENDANT ONE and UNKNOWN DEFENDANT TWO
Case Number: 2:2018cv00703
Filed: May 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Somerset
Presiding Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER denying 94 Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying 94 Motion to Stay; denying as moot 95 Motion for Extension of Time; denying as moot 96 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on January 15, 2020. (kcc)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Plaintiff's Objections 82 are treated as a Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Orders dated November 15, 2019 67 and November 20, 2019 72 and said Motion is GRANTED. The Court's Order dated November 15, 20 19 67 , which granted Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Leave to Supplement the Complaint but docketed the supplement as an Amended Complaint, is VACATED. Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Leave to Supplement the Complaint 66 is GRANTED. The C lerk of Court is DIRECTED to STRIKE the Amended Complaint at ECF No. 71 and to FILE the Supplementary Complaint at ECF No. 66-1 as a Supplement to Complaint. Plaintiff's Supplementary Complaint is not a replacement, but rather an addition, to hi s Complaint at ECF No. 14. The Court's Order dated November 20, 2019 72 , which granted in part and denied in part Plaintiff's Motion to Correct Docket, is VACATED. Plaintiff's Motion to Correct Docket 70 is GRANTED in part and DENI ED in part as follows. The Motion is GRANTED to the extent that the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to STRIKE Plaintiff's Notice of Withdrawal of Class Claims at ECF No. 64. However, the Motion is DENIED to the extent that Plaintiff requests the Cler k to file the Notice of Withdrawal of Class Claims in his other case, 18-735. If Plaintiff wishes to file his Notice in 18-735 then he should refile it in that case. The Partial Motion to Dismiss 77 and Motion to Dismiss 79 are DISMISSED as moot in light of Plaintiff's Supplement. The deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Supplement thereto is stayed until after the remaining Defendants have been served. The Clerk of Court is directed to unterminate/r einstate the following Defendants: Dr. Robert Wittig, Dr. Pushkalai Pillai, Shelly Mankey, Tracy Shreeve, Frederick Waine, Mark Wahl, United States, US District for the Middle District of Pennsylvania and Unknown Defendant Two. The Clerk of Court is directed to have the Complaint and Supplement thereto served on the following unserved Defendants: Dr. Robert Wittig, United States, US District for the Middle District of Pennsylvania, Capt. Schrader, CO Collins, CO King, CO Sanders, CO Adamson, CO Jones, CO McCombie, M. Smith, T. Funk, S. Fazzini, HEX Kerns-Barr, CHEX Dupont, CHEX Boyd, K. Falcione, J. Capra, J. Bert, D. Sacks, R. Alvarez, C. Stevens, C. Wettgen, Counselor Burris, D. Davis, N. Jamison, Dr. Pillai, Dr. Shiehk, A. West, and SCI Greene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on December 18, 2019. (kcc)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that the agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the initial partial filing fee of $46.20. If the initial partial filing fee is not received within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order then this act ion may be dismissed for Plaintiffs failure to prosecute. Plaintiff is required to make monthly payments for the remaining portion of the $350.00 filing fee in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b), as more fully described herein. The Clerk of Court is directed to forward a copy of this Order to the Superintendent/Warden where Plaintiff is currently incarcerated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on March 4, 2019. (kcc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SNIDER v. WITTIG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOEL SNIDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT WITTIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUSHKALAI PILLAI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHELLY MANKEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACY SHREEVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FREDERICK WAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. VALKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT GILMORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK DIALESANDRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACY SHAWLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN COWAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARINA VARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KERRI MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAN CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK WAHL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ULI KLEMM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JABULANI SIBANDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAY GARDNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREG JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEB RAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN WETZEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US DISTRICT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN DEFENDANT ONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN DEFENDANT TWO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?