SNIDER v. GILMORE et al
Plaintiff: JOEL SNIDER
Defendant: ROBERT GILMORE, PUSHKALAI PILLAI, NEDRA GREGO, JOHN MCANANY, E. VALKO, TRACY SHREEVE, OFFICER LUCACHEK, OFFICER KING, OFFICER HAGGETER, SERGEANT DAVIS, CAPTAIN SCHRADER, JAY GARDNER, GREGORY JOHNSON, SHELLY MANKEY, SUSAN COWAN, CARLA SWARTZ, K. THOMAS, R. MCCOMBIE, TRACY SHAWLEY, MARK DIALESANDRO, L.S. KERNS-BARR, DEB RAND, DAN CARO, JAMIE BOYD, DORINA VARNER, JOHN WETZEL, SCI GREENE, PA DOC, UNITED STATES, US DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA, UNKNOWN DEFENDANT ONE and UNKNOWN DEFENDANT TWO
Case Number: 2:2018cv00735
Filed: June 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Somerset
Presiding Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER denying 274 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of a Psychiatric Expert for Purpose of Obtaining a Certificate of Merit for Professional Liability Claims and denying 275 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of a Medical Expert for Purpose of Obtaining a Certificate of Merit for Professional Liability Claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on October 6, 2020. (kcb)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Stay of Motions to Dismiss and Deadline to Amend Pending Resolution of Appellate Matters and of Action for Injunctive Relief, (Doc. 193 ), is DENIED. See contents of this filing. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 5/28/20. (wss)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate's [sic] Granting of Time Extension for Responsive Filing to Medical Defendants, (Doc. 170 ), are SUSTAINED IN PART and OVERRULED IN PART. Plaintiff's Objections to Docs. 118, 155, 136, 138, 157, and 158, (Doc. 171 ), are OVERRULED. See contents of this filing. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 4/23/20. (wss)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration, (Doc. 122), is DENIED. See contents of this filing. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 2/5/20. (wss)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER denying 115 Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying 115 Motion to Stay; denying as moot 116 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; denying as moot 117 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on January 15, 2020. (kcc)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Plaintiff's Objections, (Doc. 108 ), are SUSTAINED. The Court's Orders dated November 26, 2019 dismissing this action with prejudice and entering final judgment, (Docs. 102 and 103 ), are VACATED and this case is REOPE NED. Plaintiff's Motion to Merge Cases, (Doc. 67 ), is DENIED. The Court's Order dated November 15, 2019, (Doc. 93), is VACATED and Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Leave to Supplement the Complaint, (Doc. 92 ), is GRANTED. The Cler k of Court is DIRECTED to STRIKE the Amended Complaint at Doc. 95 and to FILE the Supplementary Complaint at Doc. 92-1 as a Supplementary Complaint in this matter. The Court's Order dated November 20, 2019, (Doc. 98), is VACATED and Plaintiff&# 039;s Motion to Correct Docket, (Doc. 97 ), is DENIED AS STATED. If Plaintiff wishes to, he may refile his "Notice of Withdrawal of Class Claims," which appears in Civil Action No. 18-703, in this case as well. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court's Order dated December 10, 2019, (Doc. 106), is VACATED and Plaintiff's Nunc Pro Tunc Motion for Reconsideration of Judge Bissoon's Nov. 6, 2019 Memorandum Order Regarding Mental Health Evaluation, (Doc. 104 ), is GRANTED. Plaintiff has, at Doc. 104-1, provided the Court with evidence from his treating providers that a court order is required for Plaintiff's mental health conditions to be evaluated. Therefore, it is HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's current m ental health providers at the facility at which he is housed shall arrange for a mental health evaluation of Mr. Snider to take place. The evaluation should, to the extent possible, memorialize Mr. Snider's current diagnoses, primary symptoms a nd corresponding limitations, and his prescribed medications and the efficacy of those medications. The Court's preference is for this evaluation to be performed by mental health professional at the facility who is familiar with Mr. Snider's care, but an evaluation by an "independent person" would be accepted. This evaluation should be received by the Court within 60 days of this Order. See contents of this filing. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 12/17/19. (wss)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Plaintiff Joel Snider's Objections, (Doc. 89), are OVERRULED. See contents of this filing. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 11/6/19. (wss)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Plaintiff's Objections, (Doc. 80), are OVERRULED in part, and DENIED AS MOOT in part. Plaintiff's Discovery Motion, (Doc. 70), and Stay Motion, (Doc. 71), are DENIED and the Orders at Doc. 73 and 74 are ADOPTED as Opinions of the District Court. Plaintiff's request for additional time to Amend his Complaint is GRANTED, and he shall file an Amended Complaint on or before 11/2/19. See contents of this filing. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 10/3/19. (wss)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Plaintiff's Objections (Doc. 63 ) to Magistrate Judge Lenihan's Memorandum Order (Doc. 59 ) denying Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Doc. 40 ) are OVERRULED. See contents of this filing. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/14/19. (wss)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SNIDER v. GILMORE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOEL SNIDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT GILMORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUSHKALAI PILLAI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEDRA GREGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN MCANANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. VALKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACY SHREEVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER LUCACHEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER HAGGETER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGEANT DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPTAIN SCHRADER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAY GARDNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHELLY MANKEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN COWAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLA SWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. MCCOMBIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACY SHAWLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK DIALESANDRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.S. KERNS-BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEB RAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAN CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMIE BOYD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DORINA VARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN WETZEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI GREENE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PA DOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN DEFENDANT ONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN DEFENDANT TWO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?