MILLER v. SOUTH CONNELLSVILLE BOROUGH et al
Plaintiff: RUSSELL P. MILLER
Defendant: SOUTH CONNELLSVILLE BOROUGH, DON RINGER, JERRY REAGAN, GEORGE JAY and MARY RILEY
Case Number: 2:2018cv00919
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Fayette
Presiding Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2018 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT to the Court Regarding Cell Phone Data Collection by GEORGE JAY, JERRY REAGAN, MARY RILEY, DON RINGER, SOUTH CONNELLSVILLE BOROUGH. (Collura, Elizabeth)
August 7, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Tuttle on behalf of RUSSELL P. MILLER. (Tuttle, Elizabeth)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER GRANTING #6 Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Plaintiff's Cell Phone(s). Effective at 10:15 AM, August 3, 2018, Plaintiff is ORDERED to preserve all data on the cellular phone(s) or any backups thereof. Plaintiff shall produce his cellular phone presently in use, and any other cell phone he used on January 22, 2018, to bit-x-bit for data collection by 12:00 PM (noon) on Monday, August 6, 2018. Plaintiff's Counsel and Defense Counsel shall meet and confer regarding the data search parameters by 12:00 PM (noon) on Tuesday, August 7, 2018. The Parties shall file a joint status update regarding the meet and confer by 12:00 PM (noon) on Wednesday, August 8, 2018. The cost of the data collection by bit-x-bit shall be split 50% to Plaintiff and 50% to Defendants. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 8/3/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eet)
August 2, 2018 Filing 7 Errata re #6 Motion to Compel, by GEORGE JAY, JERRY REAGAN, MARY RILEY, DON RINGER, SOUTH CONNELLSVILLE BOROUGH. Reason for Correction: Incorrect Proposed Order attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order) (Collura, Elizabeth)
August 2, 2018 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION to Compel Production of Plaintiff's Cell Phone(s) for Data Collection by GEORGE JAY, JERRY REAGAN, MARY RILEY, DON RINGER, SOUTH CONNELLSVILLE BOROUGH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order) (Collura, Elizabeth)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING Initial Case Management Conference for 10/18/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7C before Judge Arthur J. Schwab. 26(f) Report, Proposed Case Management Order, and ADR Stipulation are due on 10/8/18. Defendants shall file an answer on or before September 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 7/31/18. (lck)
July 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Farina Collura on behalf of GEORGE JAY, JERRY REAGAN, MARY RILEY, DON RINGER, SOUTH CONNELLSVILLE BOROUGH. (Collura, Elizabeth)
July 27, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RUSSELL P. MILLER. GEORGE JAY waiver sent on 7/25/2018, answer due 9/24/2018; JERRY REAGAN waiver sent on 7/25/2018, answer due 9/24/2018; MARY RILEY waiver sent on 7/25/2018, answer due 9/24/2018; DON RINGER waiver sent on 7/25/2018, answer due 9/24/2018; SOUTH CONNELLSVILLE BOROUGH waiver sent on 7/25/2018, answer due 9/24/2018. (Sansone, Joel)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GEORGE JAY, JERRY REAGAN, MARY RILEY, DON RINGER, SOUTH CONNELLSVILLE BOROUGH (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4794398), filed by RUSSELL P. MILLER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILLER v. SOUTH CONNELLSVILLE BOROUGH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTH CONNELLSVILLE BOROUGH
Represented By: Elizabeth Farina Collura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DON RINGER
Represented By: Elizabeth Farina Collura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERRY REAGAN
Represented By: Elizabeth Farina Collura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE JAY
Represented By: Elizabeth Farina Collura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY RILEY
Represented By: Elizabeth Farina Collura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSSELL P. MILLER
Represented By: Joel S. Sansone
Represented By: Elizabeth Tuttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?