UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WILLIAMS
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: JOHN C. WILLIAMS
Case Number: 2:2018cv00931
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Allegheny
Presiding Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. JOHN C. WILLIAMS waiver sent on 7/23/2018, answer due 9/21/2018. (Lew, David)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David Lew on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Lew, David)
July 18, 2018 Summons Issued as to JOHN C. WILLIAMS (dm)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN C. WILLIAMS, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (dm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN C. WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Lee J. Karl
Represented By: David Lew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?