OSTROSKI et al v. CHESAPEAKE APPALACHIA, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: EDWARD OSTROSKI and KATHLEEN OSTROSKI
Defendant: CHESAPEAKE ENERGY CORPORATION, CHESAPEAKE OPERATING, LLC and CHESAPEAKE APPALACHIA, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00947
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Bradford
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (kak)
August 22, 2018 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #6 Waiver of Service Executed, #4 Waiver of Service Executed, #5 Waiver of Service Executed,. ERROR: Incorrect filer selected. CORRECTION: Correct filer EDWARD OSTROSKI properly linked to documents. This message is for informational purposes only. (ksa)
August 22, 2018 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from CHESAPEAKE APPALACHIA, LLC, CHESAPEAKE ENERGY CORPORATION, CHESAPEAKE OPERATING, LLC on 10/1/2018. (ksa)
August 16, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KATHLEEN OSTROSKI, EDWARD OSTROSKI. CHESAPEAKE OPERATING LLC served on 8/2/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (McGowan, David) Modified on 8/22/2018 to indicate date party was served and date answer is due. (ksa) Modified on 8/22/2018 filers modified. (ksa)
August 16, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KATHLEEN OSTROSKI, EDWARD OSTROSKI. CHESAPEAKE ENERGY CCORPORATION served on 8/2/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (McGowan, David) Modified on 8/22/2018 to indicate date party was served and date answer is due. (ksa) Modified on 8/22/2018 filers modified. (ksa)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KATHLEEN OSTROSKI, EDWARD OSTROSKI. CHESAPEAKE APPALACHIA LLC served on 8/2/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (McGowan, David) Modified on 8/22/2018 to indicate date served and date answer is due. (ksa) Modified on 8/22/2018 filers modified. (ksa)
July 30, 2018 Filing 3 Appendix to #1 Motion to Vacate, by EDWARD OSTROSKI, KATHLEEN OSTROSKI. (ksa)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 BRIEF in Support re #1 Motion to Vacate, filed by EDWARD OSTROSKI, KATHLEEN OSTROSKI. (ksa)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Vacate Arbitration Award (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4814783), by EDWARD OSTROSKI, KATHLEEN OSTROSKI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Summons for Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC, #4 Summons for Chesapeake Operating, LLC, #5 Summons for Chesapeake Energy Corporation) (ksa) Modified on 8/3/2018 to edit docket text. (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OSTROSKI et al v. CHESAPEAKE APPALACHIA, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD OSTROSKI
Represented By: David A. McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN OSTROSKI
Represented By: David A. McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHESAPEAKE ENERGY CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHESAPEAKE OPERATING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHESAPEAKE APPALACHIA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?