ASBURY et al v. EQT CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: RONALD AND TRACY LOVRICH, DONALD AND JULIA NEWTON, JOSEPH AND AMY HEBDA, RICHARD BARNA, JAMES AND ELIZABETH DEANOVICH, DONALD AND DEBORAH VOLAND, ROBERT JASKO, SUSAN JOYCE, JACQUELINE DOYLE, JAMES JOHNSTON, PATRICK AND LAUREN CONLEY, BETSY WHITE, ED AND MARY DELENKO, DOANLD AND EILEEN DEGENHARDT, MICHAEL OTTO, JOE AND SANDY UHLYAR, JEFFREY AND JOANN PAISLEY, LES AND JACQUELINE TOTH, JOHN LYTLE, JAMES HRESKO, MARGARET URANKER, LAWRENCE AND KAREN MAPLE, JEFFREY CRAMER, CHRISTOPHER AND MARIA CAPICOTTO, JAMES AND CHARLOTTE SULLIVAN, GEORGE MORESEA, JR., MARY LOU HOHMAN, ROBERT BELLUSO, CRAIG CALDWELL, KEVIN WITHERS, RHONDA AND KEVIN BLAZER, PATRICIA ASBURY, BRAIN AND NANCY GEARY, JASON ZEBROWSKI, RICHARD TOTH, DOMENIC LAUDATO, JR., DONALD R. STANICH, CATHY MALINGOWSKI, CHARLES CRAMER, KEVIN AND PAIGE POLICK, AMY AND JACK MATYAS, ROBERT AND LEAH FINK, ELIZABETH BAPTIST CHURCH, STACEY MONAHAN, THOMAS REESE, JR., WILLIAM TOMOSKY, ROBERT KERNS, JOHN AND CHRISTINA LASLO, JAMES AND REBECCA MESING, BRENDA AND DUANE LASICH, HELENE AND RON PATTERSON, DENNIS CEBASEK, JACQUELINE AND LAWRENCE TEPE, DANIEL AND BRENDA GILLARD, VICKI AND JOHN RUMBAUGH, VITO AND SANDRA LUCI, EDWARD LETENDER, ELMER BEAM, WILLIAM CARSON, DONA CURTI, JAMES AND JANET DURAN, JEFF ROBIS, RON MESING, DENNIS BRAIN, DONALD COVER, CAHD AND LISA BUCZYNSKI, WILLIAM SIEMON, MICHELLE BAVIN, BRIAN WATERKOTTE, RANDY SKRINJORICH, LYNN JANIGA, W. G. SIEMON, MARK AND JOAN COULSON, RONALD JOSEPH YECKEL, LINDA LOSEE, JOSEPH AND CAROLYN UHLYAR, ROGER PATTERSON, RAYMOND AND LYNNETTE ZAJAC, FRED AND DELLA KRESS, JOSEPH AND DARLA SAVKO, AARON AND DEBORAH BUSCH, LOREN AND JANIE JEROME, SHELLEY CALDWELL, WILLIAM MATTES, WAYNE AND LAURA WORTON, BRIGITTZ AND GEORGE MORESEA, III, LORRAINE CHECQUE, BONNIE SWISHER, ANDREW AND BETH GRESE, JOEL NIECGORSKI, NICOLA AND TAMMY DILISCIA, GENE OPLER, RICHARD FINK, JOHN AND KATHIE NEIDERMEYER, NED TRBOVICH, JOSEPH AND NANCY RAPOSKY, RALPH AND PAULA ZIMMERMAN, KEITH POLICK, DAVID BURCIN, WILLIAM AND BETTY PETRE, ALEXANDER HAUPTMANN, KIRK FAZIO and CLAIRE AND CHARLES GIBSON
Defendant: EQT PRODUCTION COMPANY, EQT MIDSTREAM PARTNERS, L.P., EQT CORPORATION and EQUITRANS, L.P.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01005
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER amending #38 Order Setting Initial Scheduling Conference. The Initial Scheduling Conference remains set for 10/2/19 at 10:30 a.m., but this Amended Order contains additional requirements, as relates to Plaintiffs' class-action allegations. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/19/19. (dcd)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER. All counsel of record in this case must read the attached article on mediation prior to the initial Case Management Conference, and share the same with their client(s). The attached article is being disseminated with permission of the author and The Pennsylvania Lawyer. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/12/19. (Attachments: #1 (Exhibit, Article re Mediation) (jhi)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER, setting Case Management Conference in Suite 3250 before Judge Cathy Bissoon, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/12/19. (jhi)
August 9, 2019 Filing 37 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint by EQT CORPORATION, EQT MIDSTREAM PARTNERS, L.P., EQT PRODUCTION COMPANY, EQUITRANS, L.P.. (Snyder Bagnell, Nicolle)
August 9, 2019 Filing 36 Disclosure Statement identifying Equitrans Midstream Holdings, LLC, Equitrans Gathering Holdings, LLC and EQM GP Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by EQT MIDSTREAM PARTNERS, L.P.. (Snyder Bagnell, Nicolle)
August 9, 2019 Filing 35 Disclosure Statement identifying Equitrans Investments, LLC and Equitrans Services, LLC as corporate parent or other affiliate, by EQUITRANS, L.P.. (Snyder Bagnell, Nicolle)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Parcels 1276-C-00120-0000-00 and 1276-D-00002-0000-00. Those parcels, only, are DISMISSED, without prejudice. In the future, counsel shall comply with Local Rule 7.D. See id. ("[a]ll motions shall be accompanied by a proposed order of Court"). Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 7/19/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd)
July 17, 2019 Filing 33 First MOTION to Dismiss Parcels 1276-C-00120-0000-00 AND 1276-D-00002-0000-00 WITHOUT PREJUDICE re #30 Amended Complaint by RICHARD BARNA. (Walker, Jordan)
July 16, 2019 Update Answer Deadline: Answer to Second Amended Complaint (Doc. #30 ) now due from all Defendants by 8/9/19. See text Order entered today. (dcd)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Defendants' unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer the Second Amended Complaint (Doc. #30 ). Defendants now have until 8/9/19 to answer or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 7/16/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by EQT CORPORATION, EQT MIDSTREAM PARTNERS, L.P., EQT PRODUCTION COMPANY, EQUITRANS, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Snyder Bagnell, Nicolle)
July 9, 2019 Filing 30 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT Asbury et al against All Defendants, filed by PATRICIA ASBURY (ALL PLAINTIFFS). (Tarasi, Elizabeth)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #19 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, and Plaintiffs shall file a second amended complaint by 7/9/19. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 6/25/19. (dcd)
November 7, 2018 Filing 28 REPLY BRIEF re #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, Motion to Strike, filed by EQT CORPORATION, EQT MIDSTREAM PARTNERS, L.P., EQT PRODUCTION COMPANY, EQUITRANS, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Snyder Bagnell, Nicolle)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Defendants' Motion for extension of page-limit. The substance of Defendants' reply brief shall not exceed ten pages. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 11/2/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd)
November 2, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Excess of Page Limit by EQT CORPORATION, EQT MIDSTREAM PARTNERS, L.P., EQT PRODUCTION COMPANY, EQUITRANS, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Liben, Lucas)
November 1, 2018 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #24 Response in Opposition. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as Proposed Order. This message is for informational purposes only. (ept)
October 31, 2018 Filing 25 Proposed Order by AARON AND DEBORAH BUSCH, AMY AND JACK MATYAS, ANDREW AND BETH GRESE, PATRICIA ASBURY, RICHARD BARNA, MICHELLE BAVIN, ELMER BEAM, ROBERT BELLUSO, DENNIS BRAIN, BRAIN AND NANCY GEARY, BRENDA AND DUANE LASICH, BRIGITTZ AND GEORGE MORESEA, III, DAVID BURCIN, CAHD AND LISA BUCZYNSKI, CRAIG CALDWELL, SHELLEY CALDWELL, WILLIAM CARSON, DENNIS CEBASEK, LORRAINE CHECQUE, CHRISTOPHER AND MARIA CAPICOTTO, DONALD COVER, CHARLES CRAMER, JEFFREY CRAMER, DONA CURTI, DANIEL AND BRENDA GILLARD, DOANLD AND EILEEN DEGENHARDT, DONALD AND DEBORAH VOLAND, DONALD AND JULIA NEWTON, JACQUELINE DOYLE, ED AND MARY DELENKO, ELIZABETH BAPTIST CHURCH, KIRK FAZIO, RICHARD FINK, FRED AND DELLA KRESS, ALEXANDER HAUPTMANN, HELENE AND RON PATTERSON, MARY LOU HOHMAN, JAMES HRESKO, JACQUELINE AND LAWRENCE TEPE, JAMES AND CHARLOTTE SULLIVAN, JAMES AND ELIZABETH DEANOVICH, JAMES AND JANET DURAN, JAMES AND REBECCA MESING, LYNN JANIGA, ROBERT JASKO, JEFFREY AND JOANN PAISLEY, JOE AND SANDY UHLYAR, JOHN AND CHRISTINA LASLO, JOHN AND KATHIE NEIDERMEYER, JAMES JOHNSTON, JOSEPH AND AMY HEBDA, JOSEPH AND CAROLYN UHLYAR, JOSEPH AND DARLA SAVKO, JOSEPH AND NANCY RAPOSKY, SUSAN JOYCE, ROBERT KERNS, KEVIN AND PAIGE POLICK, DOMENIC LAUDATO, JR, LAWRENCE AND KAREN MAPLE, LES AND JACQUELINE TOTH, EDWARD LETENDER, LOREN AND JANIE JEROME, LINDA LOSEE, JOHN LYTLE, CATHY MALINGOWSKI, MARK AND JOAN COULSON, WILLIAM MATTES, RON MESING, STACEY MONAHAN, GEORGE MORESEA, JR, NICOLA AND TAMMY DILISCIA, JOEL NIECGORSKI, GENE OPLER, MICHAEL OTTO, PATRICK AND LAUREN CONLEY, ROGER PATTERSON, KEITH POLICK, RALPH AND PAULA ZIMMERMAN, RAYMOND AND LYNNETTE ZAJAC, THOMAS REESE, JR, RHONDA AND KEVIN BLAZER, ROBERT AND LEAH FINK, JEFF ROBIS, RONALD AND TRACY LOVRICH, W. G. SIEMON, WILLIAM SIEMON, RANDY SKRINJORICH, DONALD R. STANICH, BONNIE SWISHER, WILLIAM TOMOSKY, RICHARD TOTH, NED TRBOVICH, MARGARET URANKER, VICKI AND JOHN RUMBAUGH, VITO AND SANDRA LUCI, BRIAN WATERKOTTE, WAYNE AND LAURA WORTON, BETSY WHITE, WILLIAM AND BETTY PETRE, KEVIN WITHERS, RONALD JOSEPH YECKEL, JASON ZEBROWSKI. (ept)
October 31, 2018 Filing 24 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION Order of Court to #22 Brief in Opposition to Motion, #23 Response in Opposition, filed by PATRICIA ASBURY. (Tarasi, Elizabeth) Wrong event selected. Document removed from public view and redocketed at #25 . Modified on 11/1/2018. (ept)
October 31, 2018 Filing 23 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Strike filed by AARON AND DEBORAH BUSCH, AMY AND JACK MATYAS, ANDREW AND BETH GRESE, PATRICIA ASBURY, RICHARD BARNA, MICHELLE BAVIN, ELMER BEAM, ROBERT BELLUSO, DENNIS BRAIN, BRAIN AND NANCY GEARY, BRENDA AND DUANE LASICH, BRIGITTZ AND GEORGE MORESEA, III, DAVID BURCIN, CAHD AND LISA BUCZYNSKI, CRAIG CALDWELL, SHELLEY CALDWELL, WILLIAM CARSON, DENNIS CEBASEK, LORRAINE CHECQUE, CHRISTOPHER AND MARIA CAPICOTTO, DONALD COVER, CHARLES CRAMER, JEFFREY CRAMER, DONA CURTI, DANIEL AND BRENDA GILLARD, DOANLD AND EILEEN DEGENHARDT, DONALD AND DEBORAH VOLAND, DONALD AND JULIA NEWTON, JACQUELINE DOYLE, ED AND MARY DELENKO, ELIZABETH BAPTIST CHURCH, KIRK FAZIO, RICHARD FINK, FRED AND DELLA KRESS, ALEXANDER HAUPTMANN, HELENE AND RON PATTERSON, MARY LOU HOHMAN, JAMES HRESKO, JACQUELINE AND LAWRENCE TEPE, JAMES AND CHARLOTTE SULLIVAN, JAMES AND ELIZABETH DEANOVICH, JAMES AND JANET DURAN, JAMES AND REBECCA MESING, LYNN JANIGA, ROBERT JASKO, JEFFREY AND JOANN PAISLEY, JOE AND SANDY UHLYAR, JOHN AND CHRISTINA LASLO, JOHN AND KATHIE NEIDERMEYER, JAMES JOHNSTON, JOSEPH AND AMY HEBDA, JOSEPH AND CAROLYN UHLYAR, JOSEPH AND DARLA SAVKO, JOSEPH AND NANCY RAPOSKY, SUSAN JOYCE, ROBERT KERNS, KEVIN AND PAIGE POLICK, DOMENIC LAUDATO, JR, LAWRENCE AND KAREN MAPLE, LES AND JACQUELINE TOTH, EDWARD LETENDER, LOREN AND JANIE JEROME, LINDA LOSEE, JOHN LYTLE, CATHY MALINGOWSKI, MARK AND JOAN COULSON, WILLIAM MATTES, RON MESING, STACEY MONAHAN, GEORGE MORESEA, JR, NICOLA AND TAMMY DILISCIA, JOEL NIECGORSKI, GENE OPLER, MICHAEL OTTO, PATRICK AND LAUREN CONLEY, ROGER PATTERSON, KEITH POLICK, RALPH AND PAULA ZIMMERMAN, RAYMOND AND LYNNETTE ZAJAC, THOMAS REESE, JR, RHONDA AND KEVIN BLAZER, ROBERT AND LEAH FINK, JEFF ROBIS, RONALD AND TRACY LOVRICH, W. G. SIEMON, WILLIAM SIEMON, RANDY SKRINJORICH, DONALD R. STANICH, BONNIE SWISHER, WILLIAM TOMOSKY, RICHARD TOTH, NED TRBOVICH, MARGARET URANKER, VICKI AND JOHN RUMBAUGH, VITO AND SANDRA LUCI, BRIAN WATERKOTTE, WAYNE AND LAURA WORTON, BETSY WHITE, WILLIAM AND BETTY PETRE, KEVIN WITHERS, RONALD JOSEPH YECKEL, JASON ZEBROWSKI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Tarasi, Elizabeth) Modified on 11/1/2018 to correct document linkage. (ept) Text modified on 11/1/2018. (ept)
October 31, 2018 Filing 22 BRIEF in Opposition re #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Strike, filed by AARON AND DEBORAH BUSCH, AMY AND JACK MATYAS, ANDREW AND BETH GRESE, PATRICIA ASBURY, RICHARD BARNA, MICHELLE BAVIN, ELMER BEAM, ROBERT BELLUSO, DENNIS BRAIN, BRAIN AND NANCY GEARY, BRENDA AND DUANE LASICH, BRIGITTZ AND GEORGE MORESEA, III, DAVID BURCIN, CAHD AND LISA BUCZYNSKI, CRAIG CALDWELL, SHELLEY CALDWELL, WILLIAM CARSON, DENNIS CEBASEK, LORRAINE CHECQUE, CHRISTOPHER AND MARIA CAPICOTTO, DONALD COVER, CHARLES CRAMER, JEFFREY CRAMER, DONA CURTI, DANIEL AND BRENDA GILLARD, DOANLD AND EILEEN DEGENHARDT, DONALD AND DEBORAH VOLAND, DONALD AND JULIA NEWTON, JACQUELINE DOYLE, ED AND MARY DELENKO, ELIZABETH BAPTIST CHURCH, KIRK FAZIO, RICHARD FINK, FRED AND DELLA KRESS, ALEXANDER HAUPTMANN, HELENE AND RON PATTERSON, MARY LOU HOHMAN, JAMES HRESKO, JACQUELINE AND LAWRENCE TEPE, JAMES AND CHARLOTTE SULLIVAN, JAMES AND ELIZABETH DEANOVICH, JAMES AND JANET DURAN, JAMES AND REBECCA MESING, LYNN JANIGA, ROBERT JASKO, JEFFREY AND JOANN PAISLEY, JOE AND SANDY UHLYAR, JOHN AND CHRISTINA LASLO, JOHN AND KATHIE NEIDERMEYER, JAMES JOHNSTON, JOSEPH AND AMY HEBDA, JOSEPH AND CAROLYN UHLYAR, JOSEPH AND DARLA SAVKO, JOSEPH AND NANCY RAPOSKY, SUSAN JOYCE, ROBERT KERNS, KEVIN AND PAIGE POLICK, DOMENIC LAUDATO, JR, LAWRENCE AND KAREN MAPLE, LES AND JACQUELINE TOTH, EDWARD LETENDER, LOREN AND JANIE JEROME, LINDA LOSEE, JOHN LYTLE, CATHY MALINGOWSKI, MARK AND JOAN COULSON, WILLIAM MATTES, RON MESING, STACEY MONAHAN, GEORGE MORESEA, JR, NICOLA AND TAMMY DILISCIA, JOEL NIECGORSKI, GENE OPLER, MICHAEL OTTO, PATRICK AND LAUREN CONLEY, ROGER PATTERSON, KEITH POLICK, RALPH AND PAULA ZIMMERMAN, RAYMOND AND LYNNETTE ZAJAC, THOMAS REESE, JR, RHONDA AND KEVIN BLAZER, ROBERT AND LEAH FINK, JEFF ROBIS, RONALD AND TRACY LOVRICH, W. G. SIEMON, WILLIAM SIEMON, RANDY SKRINJORICH, DONALD R. STANICH, BONNIE SWISHER, WILLIAM TOMOSKY, RICHARD TOTH, NED TRBOVICH, MARGARET URANKER, VICKI AND JOHN RUMBAUGH, VITO AND SANDRA LUCI, BRIAN WATERKOTTE, WAYNE AND LAURA WORTON, BETSY WHITE, WILLIAM AND BETTY PETRE, KEVIN WITHERS, RONALD JOSEPH YECKEL, JASON ZEBROWSKI. (Tarasi, Elizabeth) Text modified on 11/1/2018. (ept)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Response re #19 Motion to Dismiss. Consistent with the undersigned's Practices and Procedures (http://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/content/cathy-bissoon-district-judge), Plaintiffs' response is due by 11/1/18. All future motions in this case will be governed by the undersigned's Practices and Procedures, and no briefing schedule will issue. If the parties consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in this case, the parties must file a stipulation consenting to such jurisdiction on or before 10/22/18. If any party declines to consent, no stipulation or other filing is required. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 10/12/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd)
October 12, 2018 Filing 20 BRIEF in Support re #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, Motion to Strike, filed by EQT CORPORATION, EQT MIDSTREAM PARTNERS, L.P., EQT PRODUCTION COMPANY, EQUITRANS, L.P.. (Snyder Bagnell, Nicolle)
October 12, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and, MOTION to Strike #17 Amended Complaint by EQT CORPORATION, EQT MIDSTREAM PARTNERS, L.P., EQT PRODUCTION COMPANY, EQUITRANS, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Compliance, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2) (Snyder Bagnell, Nicolle)
September 13, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew G. Brouse on behalf of EQT CORPORATION, EQT MIDSTREAM PARTNERS, L.P., EQT PRODUCTION COMPANY, EQUITRANS, L.P.. (Brouse, Matthew)
August 31, 2018 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from EQT CORPORATION on 10/12/2018; EQT MIDSTREAM PARTNERS, L.P. on 10/12/2018; EQT PRODUCTION COMPANY on 10/12/2018; EQUITRANS, L.P. on 10/12/2018, see #9 . (jhi)
August 31, 2018 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from EQT CORPORATION on 9/6/2018; EQT MIDSTREAM PARTNERS, L.P. on 9/6/2018; EQT PRODUCTION COMPANY on 9/6/2018; EQUITRANS, L.P. on 9/6/2018. (ept)
August 30, 2018 Filing 17 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by PATRICIA ASBURY. (Tarasi, Elizabeth) Text modified on 8/31/2018. (ept)
August 22, 2018 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement identifying EQT Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by EQT MIDSTREAM PARTNERS, L.P.. (Snyder Bagnell, Nicolle)
August 22, 2018 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement identifying EQT Midstream Partners, L.P. and EQT Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by EQUITRANS, L.P.. (Snyder Bagnell, Nicolle)
August 22, 2018 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement identifying EQT Investment Holdings, LLC and EQT Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by EQT PRODUCTION COMPANY. (Snyder Bagnell, Nicolle)
August 22, 2018 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by EQT CORPORATION. (Snyder Bagnell, Nicolle)
August 15, 2018 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from EQT CORPORATION, EQT MIDSTREAM PARTNERS, L.P., EQT PRODUCTION COMPANY, EQUITRANS, L.P. (sdp)
August 14, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Thompson on behalf of EQT CORPORATION, EQT MIDSTREAM PARTNERS, L.P., EQT PRODUCTION COMPANY, EQUITRANS, L.P.. (Thompson, Jennifer)
August 14, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas Liben on behalf of EQT CORPORATION, EQT MIDSTREAM PARTNERS, L.P., EQT PRODUCTION COMPANY, EQUITRANS, L.P.. (Liben, Lucas)
August 14, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicolle R. Snyder Bagnell on behalf of EQT CORPORATION, EQT MIDSTREAM PARTNERS, L.P., EQT PRODUCTION COMPANY, EQUITRANS, L.P.. (Snyder Bagnell, Nicolle)
August 14, 2018 Filing 9 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by EQT CORPORATION, EQT MIDSTREAM PARTNERS, L.P., EQT PRODUCTION COMPANY, EQUITRANS, L.P. Answer due from All Defendants. (Snyder Bagnell, Nicolle)
August 11, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by PATRICIA ASBURY. EQT CORPORATION served on 8/9/2018, answer due 8/30/2018. (Tarasi, Elizabeth)
August 11, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by PATRICIA ASBURY. EQT MIDSTREAM PARTNERS, L.P. served on 8/9/2018, answer due 8/30/2018. (Tarasi, Elizabeth)
August 11, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by PATRICIA ASBURY. EQT PRODUCTION COMPANY served on 8/9/2018, answer due 8/30/2018. (Tarasi, Elizabeth)
August 11, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by PATRICIA ASBURY. EQUITRANS, L.P. served on 8/9/2018, answer due 8/30/2018. (Tarasi, Elizabeth)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Jordan H. Walker, Esq., to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/1/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd)
August 1, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Jordan H Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4814204) by PATRICIA ASBURY. (Tarasi, Elizabeth)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 7/31/18. (jhi)
July 30, 2018 Summons Issued as to EQT CORPORATION, EQT MIDSTREAM PARTNERS, L.P., EQT PRODUCTION COMPANY, EQUITRANS, L.P. (ept)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EQT CORPORATION, EQT MIDSTREAM PARTNERS, L.P., EQT PRODUCTION COMPANY, EQUITRANS, L.P. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4809928), filed by AARON AND DEBORAH BUSCH, AMY AND JACK MATYAS, ANDREW AND BETH GRESE, PATRICIA ASBURY, RICHARD BARNA, MICHELLE BAVIN, ELMER BEAM, ROBERT BELLUSO, DENNIS BRAIN, BRAIN AND NANCY GEARY, BRENDA AND DUANE LASICH, BRIGITTZ AND GEORGE MORESEA, III, DAVID BURCIN, CAHD AND LISA BUCZYNSKI, CRAIG CALDWELL, SHELLEY CALDWELL, WILLIAM CARSON, DENNIS CEBASEK, LORRAINE CHECQUE, CHRISTOPHER AND MARIA CAPICOTTO, DONALD COVER, CHARLES CRAMER, JEFFREY CRAMER, DONA CURTI, DANIEL AND BRENDA GILLARD, DOANLD AND EILEEN DEGENHARDT, DONALD AND DEBORAH VOLAND, DONALD AND JULIA NEWTON, JACQUELINE DOYLE, ED AND MARY DELENKO, ELIZABETH BAPTIST CHURCH, KIRK FAZIO, RICHARD FINK, FRED AND DELLA KRESS, ALEXANDER HAUPTMANN, HELENE AND RON PATTERSON, MARY LOU HOHMAN, JAMES HRESKO, JACQUELINE AND LAWRENCE TEPE, JAMES AND CHARLOTTE SULLIVAN, JAMES AND ELIZABETH DEANOVICH, JAMES AND JANET DURAN, JAMES AND REBECCA MESING, LYNN JANIGA, ROBERT JASKO, JEFFREY AND JOANN PAISLEY, JOE AND SANDY UHLYAR, JOHN AND CHRISTINA LASLO, JOHN AND KATHIE NEIDERMEYER, JAMES JOHNSTON, JOSEPH AND AMY HEBDA, JOSEPH AND CAROLYN UHLYAR, JOSEPH AND DARLA SAVKO, JOSEPH AND NANCY RAPOSKY, SUSAN JOYCE, ROBERT KERNS, KEVIN AND PAIGE POLICK, DOMENIC LAUDATO, JR, LAWRENCE AND KAREN MAPLE, LES AND JACQUELINE TOTH, EDWARD LETENDER, LOREN AND JANIE JEROME, LINDA LOSEE, JOHN LYTLE, CATHY MALINGOWSKI, MARK AND JOAN COULSON, WILLIAM MATTES, RON MESING, STACEY MONAHAN, GEORGE MORESEA, JR, NICOLA AND TAMMY DILISCIA, JOEL NIECGORSKI, GENE OPLER, MICHAEL OTTO, PATRICK AND LAUREN CONLEY, ROGER PATTERSON, KEITH POLICK, RALPH AND PAULA ZIMMERMAN, RAYMOND AND LYNNETTE ZAJAC, THOMAS REESE, JR, RHONDA AND KEVIN BLAZER, ROBERT AND LEAH FINK, JEFF ROBIS, RONALD AND TRACY LOVRICH, W. G. SIEMON, WILLIAM SIEMON, RANDY SKRINJORICH, DONALD R. STANICH, BONNIE SWISHER, WILLIAM TOMOSKY, RICHARD TOTH, NED TRBOVICH, MARGARET URANKER, VICKI AND JOHN RUMBAUGH, VITO AND SANDRA LUCI, BRIAN WATERKOTTE, WAYNE AND LAURA WORTON, BETSY WHITE, WILLIAM AND BETTY PETRE, KEVIN WITHERS, RONALD JOSEPH YECKEL, JASON ZEBROWSKI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons EQT Corporation, #3 Summons Equitrans, L.P., #4 Summons EQT Production Company, #5 Summons EQT Midstream Partners) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ASBURY et al v. EQT CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD AND TRACY LOVRICH
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD AND JULIA NEWTON
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH AND AMY HEBDA
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD BARNA
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES AND ELIZABETH DEANOVICH
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD AND DEBORAH VOLAND
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT JASKO
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN JOYCE
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACQUELINE DOYLE
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES JOHNSTON
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK AND LAUREN CONLEY
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETSY WHITE
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ED AND MARY DELENKO
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOANLD AND EILEEN DEGENHARDT
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL OTTO
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOE AND SANDY UHLYAR
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY AND JOANN PAISLEY
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LES AND JACQUELINE TOTH
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN LYTLE
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES HRESKO
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGARET URANKER
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE AND KAREN MAPLE
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY CRAMER
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER AND MARIA CAPICOTTO
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES AND CHARLOTTE SULLIVAN
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE MORESEA, JR.
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY LOU HOHMAN
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT BELLUSO
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRAIG CALDWELL
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN WITHERS
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RHONDA AND KEVIN BLAZER
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA ASBURY
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRAIN AND NANCY GEARY
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON ZEBROWSKI
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD TOTH
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOMENIC LAUDATO, JR.
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD R. STANICH
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHY MALINGOWSKI
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES CRAMER
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN AND PAIGE POLICK
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMY AND JACK MATYAS
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT AND LEAH FINK
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH BAPTIST CHURCH
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACEY MONAHAN
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS REESE, JR.
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM TOMOSKY
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT KERNS
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN AND CHRISTINA LASLO
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES AND REBECCA MESING
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA AND DUANE LASICH
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELENE AND RON PATTERSON
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS CEBASEK
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACQUELINE AND LAWRENCE TEPE
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL AND BRENDA GILLARD
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICKI AND JOHN RUMBAUGH
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VITO AND SANDRA LUCI
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD LETENDER
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELMER BEAM
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM CARSON
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONA CURTI
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES AND JANET DURAN
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFF ROBIS
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RON MESING
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS BRAIN
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD COVER
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAHD AND LISA BUCZYNSKI
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM SIEMON
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE BAVIN
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN WATERKOTTE
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDY SKRINJORICH
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYNN JANIGA
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. G. SIEMON
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK AND JOAN COULSON
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD JOSEPH YECKEL
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA LOSEE
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH AND CAROLYN UHLYAR
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROGER PATTERSON
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND AND LYNNETTE ZAJAC
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRED AND DELLA KRESS
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH AND DARLA SAVKO
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON AND DEBORAH BUSCH
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOREN AND JANIE JEROME
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHELLEY CALDWELL
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM MATTES
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYNE AND LAURA WORTON
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIGITTZ AND GEORGE MORESEA, III
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORRAINE CHECQUE
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BONNIE SWISHER
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW AND BETH GRESE
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOEL NIECGORSKI
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICOLA AND TAMMY DILISCIA
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENE OPLER
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD FINK
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN AND KATHIE NEIDERMEYER
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NED TRBOVICH
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH AND NANCY RAPOSKY
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RALPH AND PAULA ZIMMERMAN
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEITH POLICK
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID BURCIN
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM AND BETTY PETRE
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXANDER HAUPTMANN
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIRK FAZIO
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAIRE AND CHARLES GIBSON
Represented By: Elizabeth Tarasi
Represented By: Jordan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQT PRODUCTION COMPANY
Represented By: Jennifer M. Thompson
Represented By: Matthew G. Brouse
Represented By: Lucas Liben
Represented By: Nicolle R. Snyder Bagnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQT MIDSTREAM PARTNERS, L.P.
Represented By: Jennifer M. Thompson
Represented By: Matthew G. Brouse
Represented By: Lucas Liben
Represented By: Nicolle R. Snyder Bagnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQT CORPORATION
Represented By: Jennifer M. Thompson
Represented By: Matthew G. Brouse
Represented By: Lucas Liben
Represented By: Nicolle R. Snyder Bagnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUITRANS, L.P.
Represented By: Jennifer M. Thompson
Represented By: Matthew G. Brouse
Represented By: Lucas Liben
Represented By: Nicolle R. Snyder Bagnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?