DOUGLAS et al v. REBECCA M. HANIGOSKY, D.O., INC. et al
Plaintiff: TRACY DOUGLAS and VIRGINIA DOUGLAS
Defendant: REBECCA M. HANIGOSKY, D.O., INC. and REBECCA M. HANIGOSKY
Case Number: 2:2018cv01042
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Referring Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Judge Nora Barry Fischer now presiding. (av)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Arthur J. Schwab recused. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 9/17/18. (ms)
September 14, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Schwab on behalf of REBECCA M. HANIGOSKY, REBECCA M. HANIGOSKY, D.O., INC.. (Schwab, John)
September 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Kraus on behalf of REBECCA M. HANIGOSKY, REBECCA M. HANIGOSKY, D.O., INC.. (Kraus, James)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire McGee on behalf of VIRGINIA DOUGLAS and TRACY DOUGLAS. (McGee, Claire)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VIRGINIA DOUGLAS. REBECCA M. HANIGOSKY, D.O., INC. waiver sent on 8/15/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Kontos, George)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VIRGINIA DOUGLAS. REBECCA M. HANIGOSKY waiver sent on 8/15/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Kontos, George)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against REBECCA M. HANIGOSKY, REBECCA M. HANIGOSKY, D.O., INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315-4823573), filed by VIRGINIA DOUGLAS, TRACY DOUGLAS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOUGLAS et al v. REBECCA M. HANIGOSKY, D.O., INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACY DOUGLAS
Represented By: George M. Kontos
Represented By: Claire McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIRGINIA DOUGLAS
Represented By: George M. Kontos
Represented By: Claire McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REBECCA M. HANIGOSKY, D.O., INC.
Represented By: John A. Schwab
Represented By: James W. Kraus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REBECCA M. HANIGOSKY
Represented By: John A. Schwab
Represented By: James W. Kraus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?