UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $55,700.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $55,700.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Case Number: 2:2018cv01058
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Allegheny
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 Declaration of Publication filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA posted on Internet Site: www.forfeiture.gov for at least 30 days beginning on September 11, 2018. (Lew, David)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER approving #5 Stipulation. Consistent with the Stipulation, this case is STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 9/10/18. (dcd)
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 STIPULATION by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lew, David)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 US Marshal's Return as to Complaint/Warrant executed on 8/30/2018. (ksa)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 Request to Issue a Warrant for Arrest in Action in Rem by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Lew, David)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE against $55,700.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $55,700.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $55,700.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: David Lew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?