LONERGAN v. KNORR-BREMSE AG et al
Plaintiff: PATRICIA LONERGAN
Defendant: FAIVELEY TRANSPORT NORTH AMERICA INC., NEW YORK AIR BRAKE LLC, KNORR BRAKE COMPANY LLC, WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, FAIVELEY TRANSPORT S.A., KNORR-BREMSE AG and WABTEC PASSENGER TRANSIT
Case Number: 2:2018cv01086
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED ORDER setting forth the MDL procedures and scheduling a status conference for 9/13/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 8/23/2018. (kjm)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER setting forth MDL procedures and scheduling a status conference for 9/13/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 8/22/2018. (kjm) Document removed from public view as it is a duplicate of #18 . Modified on 8/23/2018. (ept)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER setting forth MDL procedures and scheduling a status conference for 9/13/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 8/22/2018. (kjm)
August 17, 2018 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 1:18-cv-01828. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 16, 2018 Filing 16 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER to the Western District of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(krs, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 STIPULATION Extending Defendants' Response Deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/2/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patricia Lonergan. All Defendants.(Saveri, Joseph)
July 2, 2018 Filing 13 QC NOTICE: #12 Certificate of Service filed by Patricia Lonergan was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file documents by selecting Service of Process > Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 27, 2018 Filing 12 -[FILED IN ERROR]- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Patricia Lonergan re #1 Complaint,, #2 Summons Issued, to all Defendants (Saveri, Joseph) Modified on 7/2/2018 (bas, Deputy Clerk).
June 27, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Defendants' Response Deadlines by Faiveley Transport North America, Inc., Faiveley Transport, S.A., Knorr Brake Company LLC, Knorr-Bremse AG, New York Air Brake LLC, Wabtec Passenger Transit, Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, Andrew)
June 26, 2018 Judge Richard D. Bennett reassigned to case. Judge Catherine C. Blake no longer assigned to case. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 26, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. Judge Richard D. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
June 25, 2018 Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of V Oliver Prentice. Directing attorney V Oliver Prentice to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/25/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
June 22, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for V Oliver Prentice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7405499.) by Patricia Lonergan (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attachment A)(Harlan, Eric)
June 22, 2018 Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Steven N Williams. Directing attorney Steven N Williams to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 6/22/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
June 22, 2018 Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joseph Richard Saveri. Directing attorney Joseph Richard Saveri to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 6/22/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
June 22, 2018 Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jiamin Chen. Directing attorney Jiamin Chen to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 6/22/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
June 22, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Steven N. Williams (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7404910.) by Patricia Lonergan (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attachment A)(Harlan, Eric)
June 22, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph R. Saveri (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7404897.) by Patricia Lonergan (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attachment A)(Harlan, Eric)
June 22, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jiamin Chen (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7404869.) by Patricia Lonergan (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attachment A)(Harlan, Eric)
June 20, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Faiveley Transport North America, Inc., Faiveley Transport, S.A., Knorr Brake Company LLC, Knorr-Bremse AG, New York Air Brake LLC, Wabtec Passenger Transit, Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation.(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Class Action), Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7398555.), filed by Patricia Lonergan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summons (Knorr-Bremse AG), #3 Summons Proposed Summons (Knorr Brake Company LLC), #4 Summons Proposed Summons (New York Air Brake LLC), #5 Summons Proposed Summons (WABTEC), #6 Summons Proposed Summons (WABTEC Passenger Transit), #7 Summons Proposed Summons(Faiveley Transport, S.A.), #8 Summons Proposed Summons (Faiveley Transport North America, Inc.))(Sandler, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LONERGAN v. KNORR-BREMSE AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAIVELEY TRANSPORT NORTH AMERICA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW YORK AIR BRAKE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KNORR BRAKE COMPANY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAIVELEY TRANSPORT S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KNORR-BREMSE AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WABTEC PASSENGER TRANSIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA LONERGAN
Represented By: Eric R Harlan
Represented By: V Prentice
Represented By: Joseph Richard Saveri
Represented By: Paul Mark Sandler
Represented By: Jiamin Chen
Represented By: Steven N. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?