EMPLOYER TRUSTEES OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA TEAMSTERS AND EMPLOYERS WELFARE FUND et al v. UNION TRUSTEES OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA TEAMSTERS AND EMPLOYERS WELFARE FUND et al
Plaintiff: EMPLOYER TRUSTEES OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA TEAMSTERS AND EMPLOYERS WELFARE FUND, WILLIAM J. DILLNER, ROBERT JACKSON, M.E. DOUTT, RAYMOND MILLER and ROBERT J. PERKINS
Defendant: CHARLES GASTON, KEVIN SCHMITT, SCOTT STANLEY, UNION TRUSTEES OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA TEAMSTERS AND EMPLOYERS WELFARE FUND, JOSEPH A. MOLINERO and KEITH FRANK
Case Number: 2:2018cv01112
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 12 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by WILLIAM J. DILLNER, M.E. DOUTT, EMPLOYER TRUSTEES OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA TEAMSTERS AND EMPLOYERS WELFARE FUND, ROBERT JACKSON, RAYMOND MILLER, ROBERT J. PERKINS. (Prorok, Robert)
October 1, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Carsen N. Ruperto on behalf of WILLIAM J. DILLNER, M.E. DOUTT, EMPLOYER TRUSTEES OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA TEAMSTERS AND EMPLOYERS WELFARE FUND, ROBERT JACKSON, RAYMOND MILLER, ROBERT J. PERKINS. (Ruperto, Carsen)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF COURT. Since this case has been assigned to a Magistrate Judge, each party must execute and file no later than 10/22/18, a form consenting to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge or selecting the option to have the case randomly assigned to a District Judge. The applicable form is available on the Court's website at www.pawd.uscourts.gov in the forms section. If the parties elect to have the case assigned to a Magistrate Judge, Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly will continue to manage the case as provided for in Local Rule 72G. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/01/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERT J. PERKINS, WILLIAM J. DILLNER, ROBERT JACKSON, RAYMOND MILLER, EMPLOYER TRUSTEES OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA TEAMSTERS AND EMPLOYERS WELFARE FUND, M.E. DOUTT. SCOTT STANLEY waiver sent on 8/22/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Prorok, Robert)
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERT J. PERKINS, WILLIAM J. DILLNER, ROBERT JACKSON, RAYMOND MILLER, EMPLOYER TRUSTEES OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA TEAMSTERS AND EMPLOYERS WELFARE FUND, M.E. DOUTT. KEVIN SCHMITT waiver sent on 8/22/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Prorok, Robert)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERT J. PERKINS, WILLIAM J. DILLNER, ROBERT JACKSON, RAYMOND MILLER, EMPLOYER TRUSTEES OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA TEAMSTERS AND EMPLOYERS WELFARE FUND, M.E. DOUTT. JOSEPH A. MOLINERO waiver sent on 8/22/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Prorok, Robert)
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERT J. PERKINS, WILLIAM J. DILLNER, ROBERT JACKSON, RAYMOND MILLER, EMPLOYER TRUSTEES OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA TEAMSTERS AND EMPLOYERS WELFARE FUND, M.E. DOUTT. CHARLES GASTON waiver sent on 8/22/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Prorok, Robert)
September 24, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERT J. PERKINS, WILLIAM J. DILLNER, ROBERT JACKSON, RAYMOND MILLER, EMPLOYER TRUSTEES OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA TEAMSTERS AND EMPLOYERS WELFARE FUND, M.E. DOUTT. KEITH FRANK waiver sent on 8/22/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Prorok, Robert)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERT J. PERKINS, WILLIAM J. DILLNER, ROBERT JACKSON, RAYMOND MILLER, EMPLOYER TRUSTEES OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA TEAMSTERS AND EMPLOYERS WELFARE FUND, M.E. DOUTT. UNION TRUSTEES OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA TEAMSTERS AND EMPLOYERS WELFARE FUND waiver sent on 8/22/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Prorok, Robert)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E. Winslow on behalf of KEITH FRANK, CHARLES GASTON, JOSEPH A. MOLINERO, KEVIN SCHMITT, SCOTT STANLEY, UNION TRUSTEES OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA TEAMSTERS AND EMPLOYERS WELFARE FUND. (Winslow, Steven)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J. Pass on behalf of KEITH FRANK, CHARLES GASTON, JOSEPH A. MOLINERO, KEVIN SCHMITT, SCOTT STANLEY, UNION TRUSTEES OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA TEAMSTERS AND EMPLOYERS WELFARE FUND. (Pass, Joseph)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KEITH FRANK, CHARLES GASTON, JOSEPH A. MOLINERO, KEVIN SCHMITT, SCOTT STANLEY, UNION TRUSTEES OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA TEAMSTERS AND EMPLOYERS WELFARE FUND (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315-4835330), filed by ROBERT J. PERKINS, WILLIAM J. DILLNER, ROBERT JACKSON, RAYMOND MILLER, EMPLOYER TRUSTEES OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA TEAMSTERS AND EMPLOYERS WELFARE FUND, M.E. DOUTT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EMPLOYER TRUSTEES OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA TEAMSTERS AND EMPLOYERS WELFARE FUND et al v. UNION TRUSTEES OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA TEAMSTERS AND EMPLOYERS WELFARE FUND et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES GASTON
Represented By: Steven E. Winslow
Represented By: Joseph J. Pass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN SCHMITT
Represented By: Steven E. Winslow
Represented By: Joseph J. Pass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT STANLEY
Represented By: Steven E. Winslow
Represented By: Joseph J. Pass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION TRUSTEES OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA TEAMSTERS AND EMPLOYERS WELFARE FUND
Represented By: Steven E. Winslow
Represented By: Joseph J. Pass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH A. MOLINERO
Represented By: Steven E. Winslow
Represented By: Joseph J. Pass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEITH FRANK
Represented By: Steven E. Winslow
Represented By: Joseph J. Pass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMPLOYER TRUSTEES OF WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA TEAMSTERS AND EMPLOYERS WELFARE FUND
Represented By: Robert F. Prorok
Represented By: Carsen N. Ruperto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM J. DILLNER
Represented By: Robert F. Prorok
Represented By: Carsen N. Ruperto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT JACKSON
Represented By: Robert F. Prorok
Represented By: Carsen N. Ruperto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.E. DOUTT
Represented By: Robert F. Prorok
Represented By: Carsen N. Ruperto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND MILLER
Represented By: Robert F. Prorok
Represented By: Carsen N. Ruperto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT J. PERKINS
Represented By: Robert F. Prorok
Represented By: Carsen N. Ruperto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?