GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION v. K & R NUTRITION, INC. et al

Plaintiff: GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION
Defendant: K & R NUTRITION, INC., AMADOR J. COLON and RICHARD R. COLON
Case Number: 2:2018cv01125
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert C Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION re 9 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, (Lee, Gabrielle)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Hearing on #7 MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2018 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell. The Plaintiff is ordered to serve a copy of this notice on all Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 10/5/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lamc)
October 4, 2018 Filing 8 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to AMADOR J. COLON, RICHARD R. COLON, K & R NUTRITION, INC. (ept)
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants by GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Judgment, #2 Affidavit) (Salvatore, Bethany)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Default against AMADOR J. COLON, RICHARD R. COLON, K & R NUTRITION, INC. by GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Entry of Default, #2 Affidavit) (Salvatore, Bethany) Text modified on 10/4/2018. (ept)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION. RICHARD R. COLON served on 9/6/2018, answer due 9/27/2018. (Ennis, Peter)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION. AMADOR J. COLON served on 9/6/2018, answer due 9/27/2018. (Ennis, Peter)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION. K & R NUTRITION, INC. served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (Ennis, Peter)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying GNC Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION. (Ennis, Peter)
August 24, 2018 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant to L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 8/31/2018. (ept)
August 24, 2018 Summons Issued as to AMADOR J. COLON, RICHARD R. COLON, K & R NUTRITION, INC. (ept)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMADOR J. COLON, RICHARD R. COLON, K & R NUTRITION, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4838916), filed by GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Summons Cunningham for K & R, #9 Summons Richard Colon, #10 Summons Richard Colon, #11 Summons Amador Colon) (ept) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2018: #12 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION v. K & R NUTRITION, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K & R NUTRITION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMADOR J. COLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD R. COLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION
Represented By: Peter J. Ennis
Represented By: Bethany C. Salvatore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?