TAYLOR v. INDIGO PARTNERS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: YANCEY D. TAYLOR
Defendant: FRONTIER AIRLINES, INC, FRONTIER AIRLINES HOLDINGS, INC, FRONTIER GROUP HOLDINGS, INC and INDIGO PARTNERS, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01148
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #21 Motion to Extend Time to Complete ADR. ENE to be completed by 01/15/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/17/18. (eca)
October 16, 2018 Filing 22 Proposed Order re #21 Motion to Extend Time to Complete ADR by FRONTIER AIRLINES, INC. (Shelke, Tara)
October 16, 2018 Filing 21 Joint MOTION to Extend Time to Complete ADR by FRONTIER AIRLINES, INC. (Shelke, Tara)
October 16, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Shelke on behalf of FRONTIER AIRLINES, INC. (Shelke, Tara)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Early Neutral Evaluation. Honorable Gary Caruso is appointed as an early neutral evaluator. ENE to be conducted by 12/09/18. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/09/18. (eca)
October 9, 2018 Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Disclosures required by Rule 26(a) due by 10/22/2018; Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2018; Discovery due by 4/30/2019. Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 5/2/2019 at 9:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/09/18. (eca)
October 9, 2018 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/9/2018. (Court Reporter: None) (eca)
October 5, 2018 Filing 16 AMENDED DOCUMENT Stipulation Selecting ADR Process by FRONTIER AIRLINES, INC. Amendment to #10 Stipulation Selecting ADR process. (McNally, James)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER IMPLEMENTING Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/03/18. (eca)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF COURT. Upon review of #10 Stipulation selecting ADR process, the parties are directed to file an amended stipulation by 10/05/18, setting forth the type of mediation, name of mediator, and attendees. The Court will discuss the timing of the mediation with counsel at the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/03/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
October 2, 2018 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) by FRONTIER AIRLINES, INC (McNally, James) Modified on 10/3/2018. (eca)
October 2, 2018 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McNally, James)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference previously scheduled for 10/09/18 at 1:45 PM is hereby RESCHEDULED to 10/09/18 at 03:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/02/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
October 2, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by FRONTIER AIRLINES, INC. (McNally, James)
September 26, 2018 Filing 9 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by FRONTIER AIRLINES, INC. (McNally, James)
September 20, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by YANCEY D. TAYLOR. (Burger, Kevin)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF COURT. In light of the filing of #6 Stipulation of Dismissal, Defendants INDIGO PARTNERS, LLC, FRONTIER GROUP HOLDINGS, INC, and FRONTIER AIRLINES HOLDINGS, INC are DISMISSED. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 09/07/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
September 7, 2018 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #6 Stipulation of Dismissal. ERROR: Incorrect filer selected. CORRECTION: Correct filers FRONTIER AIRLINES HOLDINGS, INC., FRONTIER GROUP HOLDINGS INC, INDIGO PARTNERS LLC properly linked to document. This message is for informational purposes only. (ksa)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal by FRONTIER AIRLINES, INC. FRONTIER AIRLINES HOLDINGS, INC. FRONTIER GROUP HOLDINGS, INC, INDIGO PARTNERS, LLC. (McNally, James) Modified on 9/7/2018 filers modified. (ksa)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement identifying Frontier Airlines Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FRONTIER AIRLINES, INC. (McNally, James)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The parties shall confer no later than 09/25/18 to arrange for the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). A Rule 26(f) Report and either the Stipulation Selecting ADR Process or the Expedited Docket Stipulation due on or before 10/02/18. The Initial Case Management Conference is scheduled for 10/09/18 at 1:45 p.m. in the Chambers of Chief United States Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 09/05/18. (eca)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF COURT. Since this case has been assigned to a Magistrate Judge, each party must execute and file no later than 09/26/18, a form consenting to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge or selecting the option to have the case randomly assigned to a District Judge. The applicable form is available on the Court's website at www.pawd.uscourts.gov in the forms section. If the parties elect to have the case assigned to a Magistrate Judge, Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly will continue to manage the case as provided for in Local Rule 72G. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 09/05/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to Complaint by FRONTIER AIRLINES HOLDINGS, INC, FRONTIER AIRLINES, INC, FRONTIER GROUP HOLDINGS, INC, INDIGO PARTNERS, LLC. (McNally, James) Modified on 9/5/2018 to edit docket text. (ksa)
August 30, 2018 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Parties did not file disclosure statements as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney McNally advised to file statements within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statements due by 9/6/2018. (ksa)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD 18-009982 Copies attached: State Court Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4843066), filed by FRONTIER AIRLINES HOLDINGS, INC, INDIGO PARTNERS, LLC, FRONTIER AIRLINES, INC, FRONTIER GROUP HOLDINGS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAYLOR v. INDIGO PARTNERS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRONTIER AIRLINES, INC
Represented By: James McNally
Represented By: Tara Shelke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRONTIER AIRLINES HOLDINGS, INC
Represented By: James McNally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRONTIER GROUP HOLDINGS, INC
Represented By: James McNally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIGO PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By: James McNally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YANCEY D. TAYLOR
Represented By: Kevin S. Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?