COMPTON v. LATORRE et al

Plaintiff: KATHLEEN LATORRE COMPTON
Defendant: LATORRE INVESTMENTS, INC. and MARK LATORRE
Case Number: 2:2018cv01301
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Referring Judge: Peter J Phipps
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KATHLEEN LATORRE COMPTON. MARK LATORRE waiver sent on 10/17/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Lynch, Daniel)
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KATHLEEN LATORRE COMPTON. LATORRE INVESTMENTS, INC. waiver sent on 10/17/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Lynch, Daniel)
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig W. Beil on behalf of MARK LATORRE, LATORRE INVESTMENTS, INC.. (Beil, Craig)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Sean O'Connell on behalf of MARK LATORRE, LATORRE INVESTMENTS, INC.. (O'Connell, R.)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Peter J. Phipps for all further proceedings. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. All previously scheduled deadlines and proceedings shall remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. See order at 2:18-mc-1060. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 10/31/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (admin1, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to LATORRE INVESTMENTS, INC. (jjg)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to MARK LATORRE (jjg)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by KATHLEEN LATORRE COMPTON (Lynch, Daniel)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by KATHLEEN LATORRE COMPTON (Lynch, Daniel)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARK LATORRE, LATORRE INVESTMENTS, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4880091), filed by KATHLEEN LATORRE COMPTON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMPTON v. LATORRE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LATORRE INVESTMENTS, INC.
Represented By: Craig W. Beil
Represented By: R. Sean O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK LATORRE
Represented By: Craig W. Beil
Represented By: R. Sean O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN LATORRE COMPTON
Represented By: Blair T. Preiser
Represented By: Daniel P. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?