WEESE et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Plaintiff: LUCIAN WEESE and JENNIFER WEESE
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Case Number: 2:2018cv01337
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Referring Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Secretary of Veterans Affairs on 11/16/2018, filed by JENNIFER WEESE, LUCIAN WEESE. (George, Michael)
November 21, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip P. O'Connor, Jr on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (O'Connor, Philip)
November 21, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. Colville on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Colville, Michael)
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Attorney General on 11/15/2018, filed by JENNIFER WEESE, LUCIAN WEESE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (George, Michael)
November 16, 2018 Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan added. (mao)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER GRANTING Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 11/16/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 Joint Consent to Proceed before US Mag. Judge by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Colville, Michael)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Attorney General on 10/11/2018, filed by JENNIFER WEESE, LUCIAN WEESE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (George, Michael)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Secretary of Veterans Affairs on 10/11/2018, filed by JENNIFER WEESE, LUCIAN WEESE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (George, Michael)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING Initial Case Management set for 1/24/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7C before Judge Arthur J. Schwab. 26(f) Report, Proposed Case Management Order, and ADR Stipulation are due on 1/11/19. Defendant(s) shall file an answer on or before 12/14/18. Counsel for Plaintiff is hereby directed to immediately serve the Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference together with the Complaint upon Defendant or Counsel for Defendant. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 11/2/18. (lck)
October 18, 2018 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS on 12/14/2018. (ksa)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by LUCIAN WEESE, JENNIFER WEESE. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 10/15/2018, answer due 12/14/2018. (George, Michael) Modified on 10/18/2018 to edit docket text and update answer deadline. (ksa)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 10/10/18. (ms)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms)
October 9, 2018 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (ksa)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with attached Certificate of Merit against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4887738), filed by LUCIAN WEESE, JENNIFER WEESE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Secretary of Veterans Affairs, #3 Summons for US Attorney, #4 Summons for Attorney General) (ksa) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/10/2018) (ksa). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2018: #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E) (ksa). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/10/2018) (ksa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WEESE et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Represented By: Philip P. O'Connor, Jr.
Represented By: Michael C. Colville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUCIAN WEESE
Represented By: Michael C. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER WEESE
Represented By: Michael C. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?