UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BANKS
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: CURTIS D. BANKS
Case Number: 2:2018cv01352
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management set for 1/15/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8A before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. (jgb)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 Motion to Continue. The 1/07/2019 10:30 AM Case Management Conference currently scheduled is now RESCHEDULED for 1/15/2019 at 11:00 AM in courtroom 8A before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Plaintiff's request to appear via telephone is DENIED. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 11/19/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jgb)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Continue Status Conference and for Leave to Participate via Telephone by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Musone, Michael)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Musone on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Musone, Michael)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Case Management Conference is now SCHEDULED 01/07/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8A before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 11/9/2018. (jgb)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CURTIS D. BANKS. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (sdp)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. CURTIS D. BANKS served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018. (Claypool, Mark)
October 10, 2018 Summons Issued as to CURTIS D. BANKS in Pgh. (sdp)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CURTIS D. BANKS, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BANKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CURTIS D. BANKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Mark G. Claypool
Represented By: Michael J. Musone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?