REPSOL OIL & GAS USA, LLC v. BKV CHAFFEE CORNERS, LLC
Petitioner: REPSOL OIL & GAS USA, LLC
Respondent: BKV CHAFFEE CORNERS, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01377
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Peter J Phipps
Referring Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER OF COURT. In light of the filing of #27 Notice of Withdrawal of Respondent BKV Chaffee Corners LLCs Motion to Stay Pending the Resolution of a Final Arbitration Award, #7 Motion to Stay Pending the Resolution of a Final Arbitration Award is terminated. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 12/12/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
December 11, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Respondent BKV Chaffee Corners, LLC's Motion to Stay Pending the Resolution of a Final Arbitration Award by BKV CHAFFEE CORNERS, LLC re #7 Motion to Stay (Streelman, John)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Petition. BKV CHAFFEE CORNERS, LLC shall have until 2/18/2019 to provide its response to the Petition. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 12/11/18. (eca)
December 10, 2018 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Petition by BKV CHAFFEE CORNERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Streelman, John)
December 4, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by David V. Weicht on behalf of REPSOL OIL & GAS USA, LLC. (Weicht, David)
November 29, 2018 Filing 23 SEALED DOCUMENT (Exhibit 1 to Petitioner's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Stay) by REPSOL OIL & GAS USA, LLC. This document Sealed pursuant to #21 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. (ksa)
November 29, 2018 Filing 22 REDACTION to #20 Brief in Opposition to Motion (Exhibit 1) by REPSOL OIL & GAS USA, LLC. (Gisleson, John)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion for Leave to File Arbitration Award Under Seal. After receiving notice of the order of court, you must provide the sealed document to the Clerk of Courts both on paper and on disk, in pdf format. In the alternative, you may contact the Intake Section and make arrangements to email the pdf to the Clerk of Courts. The sealed version of the document WILL NOT be docketed by the Clerk of Court until the party electronically files the redacted version of the documents (using Redacted Document event located under Other Documents), unless otherwise ordered by the Court. You would be required to serve the sealed document on counsel using traditional service methods. Document Sealed Permanently. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 11/29/18. (eca)
November 27, 2018 Filing 20 BRIEF in Opposition re #7 Motion to Stay filed by REPSOL OIL & GAS USA, LLC. (Gisleson, John)
November 27, 2018 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by REPSOL OIL & GAS USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gisleson, John)
November 20, 2018 Filing 18 EXHIBITS in Support of #8 Brief in Support of Motion by BKV CHAFFEE CORNERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Stang, William)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Briefing Schedule re #7 Motion to Stay Brief in Opposition, not to exceed 12 pages, due by 11/27/2018; Reply brief, not to exceed 6 pages, due by 12/11/2018. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 11/13/2018. (cw)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Blake A. Gansborg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 11/13/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cw)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Motion for John P. Streelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 11/13/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cw)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Mark T. Clouatre to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 11/13/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cw)
November 12, 2018 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by REPSOL OIL & GAS USA, LLC. BKV CHAFFEE CORNERS, LLC waiver sent on 10/17/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Gisleson, John)
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by BKV CHAFFEE CORNERS, LLC. (Stang, William)
November 9, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Blake A. Gansborg to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4929238) by BKV CHAFFEE CORNERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Gansborg, Blake )
November 9, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney John P. Streelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4929224) by BKV CHAFFEE CORNERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Streelman, John )
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Mark T. Clouatre to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4929208) by BKV CHAFFEE CORNERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Clouatre, Mark )
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 BRIEF in Support re #7 Motion to Stay / Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay Pending the Resolution of a Final Arbitration Award filed by BKV CHAFFEE CORNERS, LLC. (Stang, William)
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay Pending the Resolution of a Final Arbitration Award by BKV CHAFFEE CORNERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stang, William)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Peter J. Phipps for all further proceedings. Judge Arthur J. Schwab no longer assigned to case. All previously scheduled deadlines and proceedings shall remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. See order at 2:18-mc-1060. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 10/31/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (admin1, )
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to BKV Chaffee Corners, LLC c/o William Stang, Fox Rothschild, 1225 17th Street, Suite 2200, Denver, CO 80202 on 10/17/2018 by REPSOL OIL & GAS USA, LLC. Waiver of Service due by 11/16/2018 (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service of Summons) (Gisleson, John)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BKV CHAFFEE CORNERS, LLC (nll)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by REPSOL OIL & GAS USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons (BKV Chaffee Corners)) (Gisleson, John)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying REPSOL, S.A. as corporate parent and Repsol Petroleo, S.A. as other affilliate, by REPSOL OIL & GAS USA, LLC. (ksa) Modified on 10/17/2018 to edit docket text. (ksa)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD against BKV CHAFFEE CORNERS, LLC Filing fee $400, Receipt # 0315-4897166), filed by REPSOL OIL & GAS USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ksa) Modified on 10/16/2018 to add receipt number. (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REPSOL OIL & GAS USA, LLC v. BKV CHAFFEE CORNERS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: REPSOL OIL & GAS USA, LLC
Represented By: John K. Gisleson
Represented By: David V. Weicht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BKV CHAFFEE CORNERS, LLC
Represented By: Mark Clouatre
Represented By: John P. Streelman
Represented By: William L. Stang
Represented By: Blake Gansborg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?