KHOGALI et al v. FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, INC. et al

Plaintiff: RAMI KHOGALI and AMAL ELTAIB
Defendant: WABASH NATIONAL CORPORATION and FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01387
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Mark R Hornak
Referring Judge: Peter J Phipps
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Early Neutral Evaluation. Thomas Frampton is appointed as an early neutral evaluator. ENE to be conducted by 01/31/19. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 12/12/18. (eca)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 1/28/2019; Additional Parties shall be joined by 1/28/2019; Disclosures required by Rule 26(a) due by 12/18/2018; Plaintiff Expert Disclosures due by 5/31/2019; Defendant Expert Disclosures due by 6/28/2019; Discovery due by 7/31/2019. Discovery limitations outlined herein. Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 8/13/2019 at 9:00 AM before Judge Peter J. Phipps. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 12/12/18. (eca)
December 12, 2018 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter J. Phipps: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/12/2018. (Court Reporter: None) (eca)
December 5, 2018 Filing 16 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, INC. (Milinski, Claire)
December 5, 2018 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Milinski, Claire)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The above-captioned matter having been reassigned, the Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference previously scheduled for 12/12/18 at 4:15 PM before Judge Hornak is CANCELLED. The Initial Case Management Conference will be held in person on 12/12/18 at 2:45 PM before Judge Phipps in Courtroom 8B. It is not required that lead counsel for the parties attend the Initial Case Management Conference, nor is it required that any party attend. However, counsel and unrepresented parties attending the conference should have authority and be prepared to (i) schedule all future deadlines in the case and (ii) address the possibility of settlement. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 11/26/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Peter J. Phipps for all further proceedings. Judge Mark R. Hornak no longer assigned to case. All previously scheduled deadlines and proceedings shall remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. See order at 2:18-mc-1060. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 11/20/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (admin1, )
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference will be held on 12/12/18 at 4:15 PM. The Conference will be conducted via an AT&T dial-in number, which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. To obtain the information required to participate in the conference, please log-in to ECF No. #5 and use Dial-In No. 2. Rule 26(f) Report and stipulation selecting ADR process due on or before 12/5/18. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 11/8/18. (jad)
November 8, 2018 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WABASH NATIONAL CORPORATION. (Callahan, Dennis)
November 8, 2018 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #10 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney Callahan advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 11/15/2018. (ksa)
November 7, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by WABASH NATIONAL CORPORATION. (Callahan, Dennis)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER APPROVING #8 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Wabash National Corporation ('WNC') is granted an extension of fourteen (14) days within which to answer plaintiffs' complaint in this matter. In accordance with the agreement, WNC's answer is due on or before November 7, 2018. No prior extension has been requested nor granted in this matter. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 10/22/18. (bdb) Modified on 10/23/2018 to correctdate order was signed. (ksa)
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by WABASH NATIONAL CORPORATION Answer due from WABASH NATIONAL CORPORATION on 11/7/2018. (Callahan, Dennis)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis R. Callahan on behalf of WABASH NATIONAL CORPORATION. (Callahan, Dennis)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, INC. (Milinski, Claire)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jad)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 10/18/18. (jad)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jad)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying Federal Express Corporation as corporate parent and FedEx Trade Networks as affiliate, by FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, INC. (ksa)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD 18-12256 Copies attached: Complaint, Affidavit of Service by Mail of Complaint, Entry of Appearance and Consent to Removal (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4899442), filed by FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B Affidavit of Service by Mail of Complaint, #4 Exhibit C Entry of Appearance, #5 Exhibit D Consent to Removal) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KHOGALI et al v. FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WABASH NATIONAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Dennis R. Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, INC.
Represented By: Claire M. Milinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAMI KHOGALI
Represented By: Anthony J. Giannetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMAL ELTAIB
Represented By: Anthony J. Giannetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?