ROBERT CARR INSURANCE AGENCY, INC. v. CAREER ADVANTAGE OF MAHONING VALLEY, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT CARR INSURANCE AGENCY, INC.
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-12, CAREER ADVANTAGE OF MAHONING VALLEY, INC., CAREER ADVANTAGE INC. OF LAWRENCE COUNTY, KIMBERLY ANGELO-GABRIEL and CAREER ADVANTAGE INC. OF MERCER COUNT
Case Number: 2:2018cv01393
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Referring Judge: Peter J Phipps
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 23 BRIEF in Support re #22 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6) filed by KIMBERLY ANGELO-GABRIEL. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Manolis, James)
December 14, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6) re #1 Complaint, by KIMBERLY ANGELO-GABRIEL. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Manolis, James)
December 14, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by CAREER ADVANTAGE OF MAHONING VALLEY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Manolis, James)
December 14, 2018 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by CAREER ADVANTAGE INC. OF LAWRENCE COUNTY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Manolis, James)
December 14, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by CAREER ADVANTAGE INC. OF MERCER COUNT. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Manolis, James)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Peter J. Phipps for all further proceedings. Judge Mark R. Hornak no longer assigned to case. All previously scheduled deadlines and proceedings shall remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. See order at 2:18-mc-1060. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 11/20/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (admin1, )
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER APPROVING #15 Joint Motion of the Parties to Extend Time. Any response to a Fed.R.Civ.P 12 Motion shall be filed on or before 1/14/19. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 11/13/18. (bdb)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER APPROVING #14 Joint Stipulation of the Parties to Extend Time. Any response pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12 shall be filed on or before 12/17/18. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 11/13/18. (bdb)
November 12, 2018 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Extend Time to 1-14-19 by KIMBERLY ANGELO-GABRIEL, CAREER ADVANTAGE INC. OF LAWRENCE COUNTY, CAREER ADVANTAGE INC. OF MERCER COUNT, CAREER ADVANTAGE OF MAHONING VALLEY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Manolis, James)
November 12, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO EXTEND TIME PURSUANT TO LCvR7 by KIMBERLY ANGELO-GABRIEL, CAREER ADVANTAGE INC. OF LAWRENCE COUNTY, CAREER ADVANTAGE INC. OF MERCER COUNT, CAREER ADVANTAGE OF MAHONING VALLEY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service) (Manolis, James)
November 12, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Manolis on behalf of KIMBERLY ANGELO-GABRIEL, CAREER ADVANTAGE INC. OF LAWRENCE COUNTY, CAREER ADVANTAGE INC. OF MERCER COUNT, CAREER ADVANTAGE OF MAHONING VALLEY, INC. (Manolis, James)
November 2, 2018 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised that all future motions require a proposed order as an attachment. Since this motion was already ruled upon, NO action is required at this time. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion for Nyran Rose Rasche to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 11/1/18. (jad)
November 1, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Nyran Rose Rasche to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4918411) by ROBERT CARR INSURANCE AGENCY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Rasche, Nyran)
October 31, 2018 Filing 10 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jad)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 10/31/18. (jad)
October 31, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jad)
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ROBERT CARR INSURANCE AGENCY, INC.. KIMBERLY ANGELO-GABRIEL served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018; CAREER ADVANTAGE INC. OF LAWRENCE COUNTY served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/13/2018; CAREER ADVANTAGE INC. OF MERCER COUNT served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/13/2018; CAREER ADVANTAGE OF MAHONING VALLEY, INC. served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. (Kravec, Joseph)
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor E. Gillan on behalf of ROBERT CARR INSURANCE AGENCY, INC. (Gillan, Taylor)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Reissued as to CAREER ADVANTAGE OF MAHONING VALLEY, INC. (nll)
October 24, 2018 Judge Mark R. Hornak presiding. (nll)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Clerk is directed to reassign this case to another member of the Court for all further proceedings. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 10/23/18. (njt)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 Errata re #2 Praecipe to Reissue Summons by ROBERT CARR INSURANCE AGENCY, INC. Reason for Correction: Docket Number. (Attachments: #1 Summons Career Advantage of Mahoning Valley, Inc.) (Kravec, Joseph)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 PRAECIPE to Reissue Summons by ROBERT CARR INSURANCE AGENCY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Career Advantage of Mahoning Valley, Inc.) (Kravec, Joseph)
October 18, 2018 Summons Issued as to KIMBERLY ANGELO-GABRIEL, CAREER ADVANTAGE INC. OF LAWRENCE COUNTY, CAREER ADVANTAGE INC. OF MERCER COUNT, CAREER ADVANTAGE OF MAHONING VALLEY, INC. (jv)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KIMBERLY ANGELO-GABRIEL, CAREER ADVANTAGE INC. OF LAWRENCE COUNTY, CAREER ADVANTAGE INC. OF MERCER COUNT, CAREER ADVANTAGE OF MAHONING VALLEY, INC., JOHN DOES 1-12 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4900407), filed by ROBERT CARR INSURANCE AGENCY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Summons as to Kimberly Angelo-Gabriel at Hillsdale, #4 Summons as to Kimberly Angelo-Gabriel at Career Advantage Inc. Lawrence County, #5 Summons at to Career Advantage Inc. Lawrence County, #6 Summons as to at Career Advantage Inc. Mercer County, #7 Summons as to at Career Advantage of Mahoning Valley, Inc.) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROBERT CARR INSURANCE AGENCY, INC. v. CAREER ADVANTAGE OF MAHONING VALLEY, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAREER ADVANTAGE OF MAHONING VALLEY, INC.
Represented By: James W. Manolis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAREER ADVANTAGE INC. OF LAWRENCE COUNTY
Represented By: James W. Manolis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY ANGELO-GABRIEL
Represented By: James W. Manolis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAREER ADVANTAGE INC. OF MERCER COUNT
Represented By: James W. Manolis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT CARR INSURANCE AGENCY, INC.
Represented By: Joseph N. Kravec, Jr.
Represented By: Taylor E. Gillan
Represented By: Nyran Rose Rasche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?