NATIONWIDE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY v. DYNAMIC BUILDING CORPORATION

Plaintiff: NATIONWIDE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
3Rd Party Plaintiff: DYNAMIC BUILDING CORPORATION
Cross Defendant: KAZMIR CONSTRUCTION, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: ATLAS ELECTRICAL CONTRACTING, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01410
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 26 ANSWER to #24 Crossclaim by DYNAMIC BUILDING CORPORATION. (Bosick, Joseph) Modified text on 12/13/2018. (cel)
December 7, 2018 Filing 25 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ATLAS ELECTRICAL CONTRACTING, INC.. (Geis, Dennis)
December 7, 2018 Filing 24 ANSWER to #9 Third Party Complaint, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM against DYNAMIC BUILDING CORPORATION, KAZMIR CONSTRUCTION, LLC by ATLAS ELECTRICAL CONTRACTING, INC.. (Geis, Dennis)
November 19, 2018 Filing 23 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by KAZMIR CONSTRUCTION, LLC. (Auchey, Adam)
November 16, 2018 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from KAZMIR CONSTRUCTION, LLC on 12/27/2018 (cel)
November 16, 2018 Filing 22 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer #7 Third Party Complaint until December 27, 2018 by KAZMIR CONSTRUCTION, LLC. (Auchey, Adam) Modified text on 11/19/2018. (cel)
November 14, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam S. Auchey, Joseph F. Butcher, and Christopher T. Yoskosky on behalf of KAZMIR CONSTRUCTION, LLC. (Auchey, Adam) Modified on 11/14/2018. (cel)
November 13, 2018 Filing 20 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by ATLAS ELECTRICAL CONTRACTING, INC. Answer due from ATLAS ELECTRICAL CONTRACTING, INC.. (Geis, Dennis)
November 13, 2018 Filing 19 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by ATLAS ELECTRICAL CONTRACTING, INC. Answer due from ATLAS ELECTRICAL CONTRACTING, INC. on 12/14/2018. (Geis, Dennis)
November 13, 2018 Filing 18 STIPULATION by KAZMIR CONSTRUCTION, LLC. (Yoskosky, Christopher)
November 13, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher T. Yoskosky on behalf of KAZMIR CONSTRUCTION, LLC. (Yoskosky, Christopher)
November 12, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Geis, Jr on behalf of ATLAS ELECTRICAL CONTRACTING, INC.. (Geis, Dennis)
November 9, 2018 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Third Party Complaint served on Third Party Defendant Kazmir Construction, LLC on 11/05/2018, filed by DYNAMIC BUILDING CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Bosick, Joseph)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Arthur J. Schwab. 26(f)Report, Proposed Case Management Order and ADR Stipulation are due on 1/7/19. Third Party Defendants shall file an answer on or 11/26/18. Counsel for Third Party Plaintiffs are hereby directed to immediately serve the Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference a together with the Complaint upon all defendants. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 11/6/18. (lck)
November 6, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by DYNAMIC BUILDING CORPORATION. ATLAS ELECTRICAL CONTRACTING, INC. served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Bosick, Joseph)
November 6, 2018 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DYNAMIC BUILDING CORPORATION. (Bosick, Joseph)
November 5, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by NATIONWIDE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. DYNAMIC BUILDING CORPORATION served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. (Utke, Mark)
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to ATLAS ELECTRICAL CONTRACTING, INC. (mao)
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against ATLAS ELECTRICAL CONTRACTING, INC., filed by DYNAMIC BUILDING CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Summons directed to Atlas Electrical Contracting, Inc.) (Bosick, Joseph)
November 2, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to KAZMIR CONSTRUCTION, LLC (mao)
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against KAZMIR CONSTRUCTION, LLC, filed by DYNAMIC BUILDING CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Summons directed to Kazmir Construction, LLC) (Bosick, Joseph)
November 1, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by DYNAMIC BUILDING CORPORATION. (Bosick, Joseph)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J. Bosick on behalf of DYNAMIC BUILDING CORPORATION. (Bosick, Joseph)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against DYNAMIC BUILDING CORPORATION DYNAMIC BUILDING CORPORATION answer due 11/15/2018, filed by NATIONWIDE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Utke, Mark)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 10/23/18. (lck)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (lck)
October 22, 2018 Summons Issued as to DYNAMIC BUILDING CORPORATION (cel)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DYNAMIC BUILDING CORPORATION (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4904098)filed by NATIONWIDE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONWIDE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY v. DYNAMIC BUILDING CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: DYNAMIC BUILDING CORPORATION
Represented By: Joseph J. Bosick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONWIDE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Mark E. Utke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: KAZMIR CONSTRUCTION, LLC
Represented By: Adam S. Auchey
Represented By: Joseph F. Butcher
Represented By: Christopher T. Yoskosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: ATLAS ELECTRICAL CONTRACTING, INC.
Represented By: Dennis J. Geis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?