TROVY et al v. BAYER U.S. LLC et al
Plaintiff: NORMA RHYMES, AMANDA LAWSON, MARLENE RUIZ, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, STEPHANIE HUFF, ASHELLA MOODY, WENDY MARTINEZ, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, CHRISTI HILLS, TRACY JENKINS, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, EMILY MCLAUGHLIN, MARTA LORENA GARCIA BORJA, CAREENA HUNTER, CRISTINA MOLINA, JOSEFINA PIMENTEL ALANIZ, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, DEANNA BRUCE, STACEY MOSELEY, NANCY CAULEY, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, ERICA COSTA, LINA FLORES, NELSY SIRI, LAORA BEARD, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, YOLANDA ZAVALZA, ANA KIPER, LISSA VINCELETT, ROCHELLE DIAZ, COURTNEY LEWIS, SANDRA GARCIA, BESCERLEE VEGA, JOANNIE SANDERS, FECELITA KINGCADE, CAROLINA LUNA, JOLENE CLINE, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, LYNDA ARRENDALE, KATEY HEADLEY, TABATHA REEVES, OKENNY GONZALEZ, KIMBERLY GRACE, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, ALEYA AHMED, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, NICOLE TROVY, RIA FONTANILLA, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, SARA LYON, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, TARA PENNINGTON, NARMI JUAREZ, ASHLEE CURLE, DORA GOMEZ, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, VALERIE ROSS, NINA JONES, KAYLA MCCURDY, VERONICA LEDEZMA, CONSTANCE GRECO, JENNIFER KING, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, ALECIA MOORE, LORA HALL, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, SHARON BRACE, DONNIELLE WEBER, AMETRIS WILSON, SAMANTHA KACK, MARIA JIMENEZ, MICHELLE WILSON, ALMA MAYORGA, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, WENDY ESPARZA, SIERRA SCOTT, HEATHER LOCHNER and ROBIN DOUGLAS
Defendant: BAYER AG, BAYER U.S. LLC, BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC, BAYER PHARMA AG, CONCEPTUS SAS, BAYER ESSURE INC., BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. and BAYER S.A.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01438
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine L. Pomerleau on behalf of BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER ESSURE INC., BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., BAYER U.S. LLC. (Pomerleau, Katherine)
December 14, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary D. McConnell on behalf of BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER ESSURE INC., BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (McConnell, Gary)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #23 Motion for Jennifer L. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 12/03/18. (eca)
December 3, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for attorney Jennifer L. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4951737) by ALEYA AHMED, JOSEFINA PIMENTEL ALANIZ, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, LYNDA ARRENDALE, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LAORA BEARD, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, MARTA LORENA GARCIA BORJA, SHARON BRACE, DEANNA BRUCE, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, NANCY CAULEY, JOLENE CLINE, ERICA COSTA, ASHLEE CURLE, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, ROCHELLE DIAZ, ROBIN DOUGLAS, WENDY ESPARZA, LINA FLORES, RIA FONTANILLA, SANDRA GARCIA, DORA GOMEZ, OKENNY GONZALEZ, KIMBERLY GRACE, CONSTANCE GRECO, LORA HALL, KATEY HEADLEY, CHRISTI HILLS, STEPHANIE HUFF, CAREENA HUNTER, TRACY JENKINS, MARIA JIMENEZ, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, NINA JONES, NARMI JUAREZ, SAMANTHA KACK, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, JENNIFER KING, FECELITA KINGCADE, ANA KIPER, AMANDA LAWSON, VERONICA LEDEZMA, COURTNEY LEWIS, HEATHER LOCHNER, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, CAROLINA LUNA, SARA LYON, WENDY MARTINEZ, ALMA MAYORGA, KAYLA MCCURDY, EMILY MCLAUGHLIN, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, CRISTINA MOLINA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, STACEY MOSELEY, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, TARA PENNINGTON, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, TABATHA REEVES, NORMA RHYMES, VALERIE ROSS, MARLENE RUIZ, JOANNIE SANDERS, SIERRA SCOTT, NELSY SIRI, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, NICOLE TROVY, BESCERLEE VEGA, LISSA VINCELETT, DONNIELLE WEBER, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, AMETRIS WILSON, MICHELLE WILSON, YOLANDA ZAVALZA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jennifer L. Thompson, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Thompson, Jennifer) Modified text on 12/4/2018. (ksa)
November 20, 2018 Filing 22 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #4 Motion to Remand to State Court,,,,,, filed by BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER ESSURE INC., BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., BAYER U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (McConnell, Gary)
November 12, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by KATEY HEADLEY, ERICA COSTA, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, NARMI JUAREZ, NORMA RHYMES, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, LISSA VINCELETT, JOSEFINA PIMENTEL ALANIZ, EMILY MCLAUGHLIN, VALERIE ROSS, OKENNY GONZALEZ, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, KAYLA MCCURDY, NINA JONES, WENDY MARTINEZ, TABATHA REEVES, NELSY SIRI, CRISTINA MOLINA, STEPHANIE HUFF, LORA HALL, VERONICA LEDEZMA, CHRISTI HILLS, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, DEANNA BRUCE, SARA LYON, BESCERLEE VEGA, JOANNIE SANDERS, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, MARIA JIMENEZ, TRACY JENKINS, LINA FLORES, JENNIFER KING, DORA GOMEZ, YOLANDA ZAVALZA, SHARON BRACE, LAORA BEARD, AMETRIS WILSON, JOLENE CLINE, ROCHELLE DIAZ, CAROLINA LUNA, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, FECELITA KINGCADE, CONSTANCE GRECO, NANCY CAULEY, HEATHER LOCHNER, ROBIN DOUGLAS, NICOLE TROVY, SAMANTHA KACK, AMANDA LAWSON, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, ALEYA AHMED, LYNDA ARRENDALE, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, ANA KIPER, STACEY MOSELEY, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, MARLENE RUIZ, SANDRA GARCIA, MARTA LORENA GARCIA BORJA, COURTNEY LEWIS, WENDY ESPARZA, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, RIA FONTANILLA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, SIERRA SCOTT, ASHLEE CURLE, TARA PENNINGTON, DONNIELLE WEBER, KIMBERLY GRACE, CAREENA HUNTER, MICHELLE WILSON, ALMA MAYORGA, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA. BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt for Bayer Healthcare Pharma Service) (Bubalo, Gregory)
November 12, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by KATEY HEADLEY, ERICA COSTA, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, NARMI JUAREZ, NORMA RHYMES, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, LISSA VINCELETT, JOSEFINA PIMENTEL ALANIZ, EMILY MCLAUGHLIN, VALERIE ROSS, OKENNY GONZALEZ, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, KAYLA MCCURDY, NINA JONES, WENDY MARTINEZ, TABATHA REEVES, NELSY SIRI, CRISTINA MOLINA, STEPHANIE HUFF, LORA HALL, VERONICA LEDEZMA, CHRISTI HILLS, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, DEANNA BRUCE, SARA LYON, BESCERLEE VEGA, JOANNIE SANDERS, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, MARIA JIMENEZ, TRACY JENKINS, LINA FLORES, JENNIFER KING, DORA GOMEZ, YOLANDA ZAVALZA, SHARON BRACE, LAORA BEARD, AMETRIS WILSON, JOLENE CLINE, ROCHELLE DIAZ, CAROLINA LUNA, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, FECELITA KINGCADE, CONSTANCE GRECO, NANCY CAULEY, HEATHER LOCHNER, ROBIN DOUGLAS, NICOLE TROVY, SAMANTHA KACK, AMANDA LAWSON, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, ALEYA AHMED, LYNDA ARRENDALE, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, ANA KIPER, STACEY MOSELEY, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, MARLENE RUIZ, SANDRA GARCIA, MARTA LORENA GARCIA BORJA, COURTNEY LEWIS, WENDY ESPARZA, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, RIA FONTANILLA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, SIERRA SCOTT, ASHLEE CURLE, TARA PENNINGTON, DONNIELLE WEBER, KIMBERLY GRACE, CAREENA HUNTER, MICHELLE WILSON, ALMA MAYORGA, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA. BAYER ESSURE INC. served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt for Bayer Essure Inc. Service) (Bubalo, Gregory)
November 12, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by KATEY HEADLEY, ERICA COSTA, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, NARMI JUAREZ, NORMA RHYMES, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, LISSA VINCELETT, JOSEFINA PIMENTEL ALANIZ, EMILY MCLAUGHLIN, VALERIE ROSS, OKENNY GONZALEZ, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, KAYLA MCCURDY, NINA JONES, WENDY MARTINEZ, TABATHA REEVES, NELSY SIRI, CRISTINA MOLINA, STEPHANIE HUFF, LORA HALL, VERONICA LEDEZMA, CHRISTI HILLS, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, DEANNA BRUCE, SARA LYON, BESCERLEE VEGA, JOANNIE SANDERS, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, MARIA JIMENEZ, TRACY JENKINS, LINA FLORES, JENNIFER KING, DORA GOMEZ, YOLANDA ZAVALZA, SHARON BRACE, LAORA BEARD, AMETRIS WILSON, JOLENE CLINE, ROCHELLE DIAZ, CAROLINA LUNA, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, FECELITA KINGCADE, CONSTANCE GRECO, NANCY CAULEY, HEATHER LOCHNER, ROBIN DOUGLAS, NICOLE TROVY, SAMANTHA KACK, AMANDA LAWSON, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, ALEYA AHMED, LYNDA ARRENDALE, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, ANA KIPER, STACEY MOSELEY, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, MARLENE RUIZ, SANDRA GARCIA, MARTA LORENA GARCIA BORJA, COURTNEY LEWIS, WENDY ESPARZA, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, RIA FONTANILLA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, SIERRA SCOTT, ASHLEE CURLE, TARA PENNINGTON, DONNIELLE WEBER, KIMBERLY GRACE, CAREENA HUNTER, MICHELLE WILSON, ALMA MAYORGA, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA. BAYER CORPORATION served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt for Bayer Corporation Service) (Bubalo, Gregory)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Stay. This matter will be administratively closed pending the ruling on the Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 11/05/18. (eca)
November 2, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Stay filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC, BAYER U.S. LLC. (McConnell, Gary)
November 2, 2018 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement identifying NippoNex Inc., Bayer Medical Care Inc., Bayer West Coast Corporation, Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC, Dr. Scholl's LLC, Coppertone LLC, MiraLAX LLC, Bayer Healthcare US Funding LLC, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Schering Berlin Inc., Bayer HealthCare Holdings LLC, Bayer East Coast LLC, Bayer AG, Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer World Investments B.V., Bayer Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC, BAYER U.S. LLC. (McConnell, Gary)
October 31, 2018 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to BAYER AG, BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER ESSURE INC., BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., BAYER PHARMA AG, BAYER S.A., CONCEPTUS SAS (av)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER. Response to #4 Motion to Remand to State Court due by 11/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/30/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER. Response to #10 Motion to Stay due by 11/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/30/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 Errata re #9 Praecipe to Issue Summons,,,,,, by ALEYA AHMED, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, LYNDA ARRENDALE, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LAORA BEARD, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, LORENA GARCIA BORJA, DEANNA BRUCE, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, NANCY CAULEY, JOLENE CLINE, ERICA COSTA, ASHLEE CURLE, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, ROCHELLE DIAZ, ROBIN DOUGLAS, WENDY ESPARZA, LINA FLORES, RIA FONTANILLA, SANDRA GARCIA, DORA GOMEZ, OKENNY GONZALEZ, LORA HALL, KATEY HEADLEY, CHRISTI HILLS, STEPHANIE HUFF, CAREENA HUNTER, MARIA JIMENEZ, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, NINA JONES, NARMI JUAREZ, SAMANTHA KACK, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, JENNIFER KING, FECELITA KINGCADE, ANA KIPER, EMILY LAUGHLIN, AMANDA LAWSON, VERONICA LEDEZMA, COURTNEY LEWIS, HEATHER LOCHNER, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, CAROLINA LUNA, SARA LYON, WENDY MARTINEZ, ALMA MAYORGA, KAYLA MCCURDY, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, CRISTINA MOLINA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, STACEY MOSELEY, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, TARA PENNINGTON, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, TABATHA REEVES, NORMA RHYMES, VALERIE ROSS, MARLENE RUIZ, JOANNIE SANDERS, SIERRA SCOTT, NELSY SIRI, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, NICOLE TROVY, BESCERLEE VEGA, LISSA VINCELETT, DONNIELLE WEBER, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, MICHELLE WILSON, TAMETRIS WILSON, YOLANDA ZAVALZA. Reason for Correction: Defendant name; Address for Conceptus SAS. (Attachments: #1 Summons Bayer Corporation, #2 Summons Bayer AG, #3 Summons Bayer Essure Inc, #4 Subpoena Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, #5 Summons Bayer Pharma AG, #6 Summons Conceptus SAS, #7 Summons Bayer S.A.) (Bubalo, Gregory)
October 29, 2018 Filing 11 BRIEF in Support re #10 Motion to Stay,,,,, filed by ALEYA AHMED, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, LYNDA ARRENDALE, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LAORA BEARD, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, LORENA GARCIA BORJA, DEANNA BRUCE, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, NANCY CAULEY, JOLENE CLINE, ERICA COSTA, ASHLEE CURLE, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, ROCHELLE DIAZ, ROBIN DOUGLAS, WENDY ESPARZA, LINA FLORES, RIA FONTANILLA, SANDRA GARCIA, DORA GOMEZ, OKENNY GONZALEZ, LORA HALL, KATEY HEADLEY, CHRISTI HILLS, STEPHANIE HUFF, CAREENA HUNTER, MARIA JIMENEZ, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, NINA JONES, NARMI JUAREZ, SAMANTHA KACK, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, JENNIFER KING, FECELITA KINGCADE, ANA KIPER, EMILY LAUGHLIN, AMANDA LAWSON, VERONICA LEDEZMA, COURTNEY LEWIS, HEATHER LOCHNER, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, CAROLINA LUNA, SARA LYON, WENDY MARTINEZ, ALMA MAYORGA, KAYLA MCCURDY, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, CRISTINA MOLINA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, STACEY MOSELEY, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, TARA PENNINGTON, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, TABATHA REEVES, NORMA RHYMES, VALERIE ROSS, MARLENE RUIZ, JOANNIE SANDERS, SIERRA SCOTT, NELSY SIRI, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, NICOLE TROVY, BESCERLEE VEGA, LISSA VINCELETT, DONNIELLE WEBER, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, MICHELLE WILSON, TAMETRIS WILSON, YOLANDA ZAVALZA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Granting P Motion to Stay - Denying D Motion to Dismiss - VAZQUEZ) (Bubalo, Gregory)
October 29, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay by ALEYA AHMED, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, LYNDA ARRENDALE, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LAORA BEARD, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, LORENA GARCIA BORJA, DEANNA BRUCE, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, NANCY CAULEY, JOLENE CLINE, ERICA COSTA, ASHLEE CURLE, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, ROCHELLE DIAZ, ROBIN DOUGLAS, WENDY ESPARZA, LINA FLORES, RIA FONTANILLA, SANDRA GARCIA, DORA GOMEZ, OKENNY GONZALEZ, LORA HALL, KATEY HEADLEY, CHRISTI HILLS, STEPHANIE HUFF, CAREENA HUNTER, MARIA JIMENEZ, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, NINA JONES, NARMI JUAREZ, SAMANTHA KACK, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, JENNIFER KING, FECELITA KINGCADE, ANA KIPER, EMILY LAUGHLIN, AMANDA LAWSON, VERONICA LEDEZMA, COURTNEY LEWIS, HEATHER LOCHNER, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, CAROLINA LUNA, SARA LYON, WENDY MARTINEZ, ALMA MAYORGA, KAYLA MCCURDY, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, CRISTINA MOLINA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, STACEY MOSELEY, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, TARA PENNINGTON, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, TABATHA REEVES, NORMA RHYMES, VALERIE ROSS, MARLENE RUIZ, JOANNIE SANDERS, SIERRA SCOTT, NELSY SIRI, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, NICOLE TROVY, BESCERLEE VEGA, LISSA VINCELETT, DONNIELLE WEBER, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, MICHELLE WILSON, TAMETRIS WILSON, YOLANDA ZAVALZA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Stay) (Bubalo, Gregory)
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by ALEYA AHMED, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, LYNDA ARRENDALE, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LAORA BEARD, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, LORENA GARCIA BORJA, DEANNA BRUCE, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, NANCY CAULEY, JOLENE CLINE, ERICA COSTA, ASHLEE CURLE, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, ROCHELLE DIAZ, ROBIN DOUGLAS, WENDY ESPARZA, LINA FLORES, RIA FONTANILLA, SANDRA GARCIA, DORA GOMEZ, OKENNY GONZALEZ, LORA HALL, KATEY HEADLEY, CHRISTI HILLS, STEPHANIE HUFF, CAREENA HUNTER, MARIA JIMENEZ, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, NINA JONES, NARMI JUAREZ, SAMANTHA KACK, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, JENNIFER KING, FECELITA KINGCADE, ANA KIPER, EMILY LAUGHLIN, AMANDA LAWSON, VERONICA LEDEZMA, COURTNEY LEWIS, HEATHER LOCHNER, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, CAROLINA LUNA, SARA LYON, WENDY MARTINEZ, ALMA MAYORGA, KAYLA MCCURDY, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, CRISTINA MOLINA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, STACEY MOSELEY, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, TARA PENNINGTON, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, TABATHA REEVES, NORMA RHYMES, VALERIE ROSS, MARLENE RUIZ, JOANNIE SANDERS, SIERRA SCOTT, NELSY SIRI, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, NICOLE TROVY, BESCERLEE VEGA, LISSA VINCELETT, DONNIELLE WEBER, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, MICHELLE WILSON, TAMETRIS WILSON, YOLANDA ZAVALZA (Attachments: #1 Summons Bayer AG, #2 Summons Bayer Essure Inc, #3 Summons Bayer Healthcare LLC, #4 Summons Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, #5 Summons Bayer Pharma AG, #6 Summons Bayer S.A., #7 Summons Conceptus SAS) (Bubalo, Gregory)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Amended Complaint by ALEYA AHMED, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, LYNDA ARRENDALE, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LAORA BEARD, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, LORENA GARCIA BORJA, DEANNA BRUCE, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, NANCY CAULEY, JOLENE CLINE, ERICA COSTA, ASHLEE CURLE, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, ROCHELLE DIAZ, ROBIN DOUGLAS, WENDY ESPARZA, LINA FLORES, RIA FONTANILLA, SANDRA GARCIA, DORA GOMEZ, OKENNY GONZALEZ, LORA HALL, KATEY HEADLEY, CHRISTI HILLS, STEPHANIE HUFF, CAREENA HUNTER, MARIA JIMENEZ, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, NINA JONES, NARMI JUAREZ, SAMANTHA KACK, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, JENNIFER KING, FECELITA KINGCADE, ANA KIPER, EMILY LAUGHLIN, AMANDA LAWSON, VERONICA LEDEZMA, COURTNEY LEWIS, HEATHER LOCHNER, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, CAROLINA LUNA, SARA LYON, WENDY MARTINEZ, ALMA MAYORGA, KAYLA MCCURDY, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, CRISTINA MOLINA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, STACEY MOSELEY, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, TARA PENNINGTON, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, TABATHA REEVES, NORMA RHYMES, VALERIE ROSS, MARLENE RUIZ, JOANNIE SANDERS, SIERRA SCOTT, NELSY SIRI, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, NICOLE TROVY, BESCERLEE VEGA, LISSA VINCELETT, DONNIELLE WEBER, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, MICHELLE WILSON, TAMETRIS WILSON, YOLANDA ZAVALZA re #7 Amended Complaint,,,,, (Bubalo, Gregory)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by KATEY HEADLEY, ERICA COSTA, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, NARMI JUAREZ, NORMA RHYMES, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, LISSA VINCELETT, EMILY LAUGHLIN, VALERIE ROSS, OKENNY GONZALEZ, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, KAYLA MCCURDY, NINA JONES, WENDY MARTINEZ, TABATHA REEVES, NELSY SIRI, CRISTINA MOLINA, STEPHANIE HUFF, LORA HALL, VERONICA LEDEZMA, CHRISTI HILLS, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, DEANNA BRUCE, SARA LYON, BESCERLEE VEGA, JOANNIE SANDERS, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, LINA FLORES, MARIA JIMENEZ, JENNIFER KING, DORA GOMEZ, YOLANDA ZAVALZA, LAORA BEARD, TAMETRIS WILSON, JOLENE CLINE, ROCHELLE DIAZ, CAROLINA LUNA, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, FECELITA KINGCADE, NANCY CAULEY, HEATHER LOCHNER, ROBIN DOUGLAS, NICOLE TROVY, SAMANTHA KACK, AMANDA LAWSON, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, ALEYA AHMED, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, LYNDA ARRENDALE, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, ANA KIPER, STACEY MOSELEY, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, MARLENE RUIZ, SANDRA GARCIA, LORENA GARCIA BORJA, COURTNEY LEWIS, WENDY ESPARZA, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, RIA FONTANILLA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, SIERRA SCOTT, ASHLEE CURLE, TARA PENNINGTON, DONNIELLE WEBER, CAREENA HUNTER, MICHELLE WILSON, ALMA MAYORGA, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bayer HQ location - Pittsburgh) (Bubalo, Gregory) Modified on 10/30/2018 to edit docket text. (ksa)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 Errata re #3 Notice of Appearance,,,,, by ALEYA AHMED, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, LYNDA ARRENDALE, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LAORA BEARD, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, LORENA GARCIA BORJA, DEANNA BRUCE, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, NANCY CAULEY, JOLENE CLINE, ERICA COSTA, ASHLEE CURLE, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, ROCHELLE DIAZ, ROBIN DOUGLAS, WENDY ESPARZA, LINA FLORES, RIA FONTANILLA, SANDRA GARCIA, DORA GOMEZ, OKENNY GONZALEZ, LORA HALL, KATEY HEADLEY, CHRISTI HILLS, STEPHANIE HUFF, CAREENA HUNTER, MARIA JIMENEZ, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, NINA JONES, NARMI JUAREZ, SAMANTHA KACK, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, JENNIFER KING, FECELITA KINGCADE, ANA KIPER, EMILY LAUGHLIN, AMANDA LAWSON, VERONICA LEDEZMA, COURTNEY LEWIS, HEATHER LOCHNER, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, CAROLINA LUNA, SARA LYON, WENDY MARTINEZ, ALMA MAYORGA, KAYLA MCCURDY, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, CRISTINA MOLINA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, STACEY MOSELEY, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, TARA PENNINGTON, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, TABATHA REEVES, NORMA RHYMES, VALERIE ROSS, MARLENE RUIZ, JOANNIE SANDERS, SIERRA SCOTT, NELSY SIRI, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, NICOLE TROVY, BESCERLEE VEGA, LISSA VINCELETT, DONNIELLE WEBER, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, MICHELLE WILSON, TAMETRIS WILSON, YOLANDA ZAVALZA. Reason for Correction: Incorrect filing name. (Dunnington, Katherine)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 BRIEF in Support re #4 Motion to Remand to State Court,,,,, filed by ALEYA AHMED, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, LYNDA ARRENDALE, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LAORA BEARD, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, LORENA GARCIA BORJA, DEANNA BRUCE, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, NANCY CAULEY, JOLENE CLINE, ERICA COSTA, ASHLEE CURLE, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, ROCHELLE DIAZ, ROBIN DOUGLAS, WENDY ESPARZA, LINA FLORES, RIA FONTANILLA, SANDRA GARCIA, DORA GOMEZ, OKENNY GONZALEZ, LORA HALL, KATEY HEADLEY, CHRISTI HILLS, STEPHANIE HUFF, CAREENA HUNTER, MARIA JIMENEZ, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, NINA JONES, NARMI JUAREZ, SAMANTHA KACK, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, JENNIFER KING, FECELITA KINGCADE, ANA KIPER, EMILY LAUGHLIN, AMANDA LAWSON, VERONICA LEDEZMA, COURTNEY LEWIS, HEATHER LOCHNER, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, CAROLINA LUNA, SARA LYON, WENDY MARTINEZ, ALMA MAYORGA, KAYLA MCCURDY, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, CRISTINA MOLINA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, STACEY MOSELEY, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, TARA PENNINGTON, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, TABATHA REEVES, NORMA RHYMES, VALERIE ROSS, MARLENE RUIZ, JOANNIE SANDERS, SIERRA SCOTT, NELSY SIRI, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, NICOLE TROVY, BESCERLEE VEGA, LISSA VINCELETT, DONNIELLE WEBER, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, MICHELLE WILSON, TAMETRIS WILSON, YOLANDA ZAVALZA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Huffington Post - This Birth Control Device Kept Making Women Sick 4-1-2018) (Bubalo, Gregory)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by ALEYA AHMED, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, LYNDA ARRENDALE, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LAORA BEARD, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, LORENA GARCIA BORJA, DEANNA BRUCE, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, NANCY CAULEY, JOLENE CLINE, ERICA COSTA, ASHLEE CURLE, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, ROCHELLE DIAZ, ROBIN DOUGLAS, WENDY ESPARZA, LINA FLORES, RIA FONTANILLA, SANDRA GARCIA, DORA GOMEZ, OKENNY GONZALEZ, LORA HALL, KATEY HEADLEY, CHRISTI HILLS, STEPHANIE HUFF, CAREENA HUNTER, MARIA JIMENEZ, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, NINA JONES, NARMI JUAREZ, SAMANTHA KACK, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, JENNIFER KING, FECELITA KINGCADE, ANA KIPER, EMILY LAUGHLIN, AMANDA LAWSON, VERONICA LEDEZMA, COURTNEY LEWIS, HEATHER LOCHNER, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, CAROLINA LUNA, SARA LYON, WENDY MARTINEZ, ALMA MAYORGA, KAYLA MCCURDY, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, CRISTINA MOLINA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, STACEY MOSELEY, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, TARA PENNINGTON, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, TABATHA REEVES, NORMA RHYMES, VALERIE ROSS, MARLENE RUIZ, JOANNIE SANDERS, SIERRA SCOTT, NELSY SIRI, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, NICOLE TROVY, BESCERLEE VEGA, LISSA VINCELETT, DONNIELLE WEBER, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, MICHELLE WILSON, TAMETRIS WILSON, YOLANDA ZAVALZA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Remand) (Bubalo, Gregory)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory J. Bubalo on behalf of ALEYA AHMED, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, LYNDA ARRENDALE, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LAORA BEARD, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, LORENA GARCIA BORJA, DEANNA BRUCE, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, NANCY CAULEY, JOLENE CLINE, ERICA COSTA, ASHLEE CURLE, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, ROCHELLE DIAZ, ROBIN DOUGLAS, WENDY ESPARZA, LINA FLORES, RIA FONTANILLA, SANDRA GARCIA, DORA GOMEZ, OKENNY GONZALEZ, LORA HALL, KATEY HEADLEY, CHRISTI HILLS, STEPHANIE HUFF, CAREENA HUNTER, MARIA JIMENEZ, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, NINA JONES, NARMI JUAREZ, SAMANTHA KACK, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, JENNIFER KING, FECELITA KINGCADE, ANA KIPER, EMILY LAUGHLIN, AMANDA LAWSON, VERONICA LEDEZMA, COURTNEY LEWIS, HEATHER LOCHNER, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, CAROLINA LUNA, SARA LYON, WENDY MARTINEZ, ALMA MAYORGA, KAYLA MCCURDY, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, CRISTINA MOLINA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, STACEY MOSELEY, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, TARA PENNINGTON, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, TABATHA REEVES, NORMA RHYMES, VALERIE ROSS, MARLENE RUIZ, JOANNIE SANDERS, SIERRA SCOTT, NELSY SIRI, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, NICOLE TROVY, BESCERLEE VEGA, LISSA VINCELETT, DONNIELLE WEBER, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, MICHELLE WILSON, TAMETRIS WILSON, YOLANDA ZAVALZA. (Bubalo, Gregory)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory J. Bubalo on behalf of ALEYA AHMED, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, LYNDA ARRENDALE, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LAORA BEARD, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, LORENA GARCIA BORJA, DEANNA BRUCE, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, NANCY CAULEY, JOLENE CLINE, ERICA COSTA, ASHLEE CURLE, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, ROCHELLE DIAZ, ROBIN DOUGLAS, WENDY ESPARZA, LINA FLORES, RIA FONTANILLA, SANDRA GARCIA, DORA GOMEZ, OKENNY GONZALEZ, LORA HALL, KATEY HEADLEY, CHRISTI HILLS, STEPHANIE HUFF, CAREENA HUNTER, MARIA JIMENEZ, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, NINA JONES, NARMI JUAREZ, SAMANTHA KACK, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, JENNIFER KING, FECELITA KINGCADE, ANA KIPER, EMILY LAUGHLIN, AMANDA LAWSON, VERONICA LEDEZMA, COURTNEY LEWIS, HEATHER LOCHNER, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, CAROLINA LUNA, SARA LYON, WENDY MARTINEZ, ALMA MAYORGA, KAYLA MCCURDY, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, CRISTINA MOLINA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, STACEY MOSELEY, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, TARA PENNINGTON, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, TABATHA REEVES, NORMA RHYMES, VALERIE ROSS, MARLENE RUIZ, JOANNIE SANDERS, SIERRA SCOTT, NELSY SIRI, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, NICOLE TROVY, BESCERLEE VEGA, LISSA VINCELETT, DONNIELLE WEBER, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, MICHELLE WILSON, TAMETRIS WILSON, YOLANDA ZAVALZA. (Bubalo, Gregory)
October 29, 2018 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney McConnell advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 11/5/2018. (ksa)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD 18-012845 Copies attached: State Court Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4910829), filed by BAYER U.S. LLC, BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TROVY et al v. BAYER U.S. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORMA RHYMES
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANDA LAWSON
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARLENE RUIZ
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE HUFF
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHELLA MOODY
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WENDY MARTINEZ
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA PEPCORN
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTI HILLS
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACY JENKINS
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMILY MCLAUGHLIN
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTA LORENA GARCIA BORJA
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAREENA HUNTER
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRISTINA MOLINA
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEFINA PIMENTEL ALANIZ
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEANNA BRUCE
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACEY MOSELEY
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY CAULEY
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MISTY BAUMGARDNER
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERICA COSTA
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINA FLORES
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NELSY SIRI
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAORA BEARD
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANTEL WILLIAMS
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YOLANDA ZAVALZA
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANA KIPER
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISSA VINCELETT
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROCHELLE DIAZ
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COURTNEY LEWIS
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA GARCIA
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BESCERLEE VEGA
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOANNIE SANDERS
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FECELITA KINGCADE
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLINA LUNA
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOLENE CLINE
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYNDA ARRENDALE
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATEY HEADLEY
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TABATHA REEVES
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OKENNY GONZALEZ
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY GRACE
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAKEITHA TAYLOR
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEYA AHMED
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICOLE TROVY
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RIA FONTANILLA
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARA LYON
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCESCA JOHNSON
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TARA PENNINGTON
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NARMI JUAREZ
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEE CURLE
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DORA GOMEZ
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALERIE ROSS
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NINA JONES
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAYLA MCCURDY
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VERONICA LEDEZMA
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONSTANCE GRECO
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER KING
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALECIA MOORE
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORA HALL
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHERINE KERRIGAN
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIBEL ALVEREZ
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON BRACE
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNIELLE WEBER
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMETRIS WILSON
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMANTHA KACK
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA JIMENEZ
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE WILSON
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALMA MAYORGA
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WENDY ESPARZA
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIERRA SCOTT
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATHER LOCHNER
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBIN DOUGLAS
Represented By: Gregory J. Bubalo
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Katherine A. Dunnington
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER U.S. LLC
Represented By: Gary D. McConnell
Represented By: Katherine L. Pomerleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC
Represented By: Gary D. McConnell
Represented By: Katherine L. Pomerleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER PHARMA AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONCEPTUS SAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER ESSURE INC.
Represented By: Gary D. McConnell
Represented By: Katherine L. Pomerleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER CORPORATION
Represented By: Gary D. McConnell
Represented By: Katherine L. Pomerleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: Gary D. McConnell
Represented By: Katherine L. Pomerleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?